Collins v. Louisiana Department of Public Safety and Corrections et al
Plaintiff: Joseph Lee Collins
Defendant: LA Dept of Public Safety & Corrections, Jerry Goodwin, Seth Sherman, David Wade Correctional Center and Chris Evans
Case Number: 5:2019cv01108
Filed: August 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth E Foote
Referring Judge: Mark L Hornsby
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Change of Address by Joseph Lee Collins. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(crt,ThomasSld, T)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM ORDER: Plaintiff failed to submit documents on approved forms. Plaintiff failed to submit filing fee or a completed IFP application. Pro Se Deadline to comply with deficiency set for 9/23/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 8/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint, #2 IFP Application)(crt,ThomasSld, T)
August 23, 2019 Filing 5 PROPOSED MEMORANDUM ORDER referred to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M)
August 22, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge Elizabeth E Foote and Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (crt,Thigpen, M)
August 22, 2019 Filing 4 DISTRICT CASE transferred in from District of Louisiana Middle; Case Number 3:19-cv-00458. Original file copy of transfer order and docket sheet received
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Transferring Case to the Western District of Louisiana. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 8/22/2019. (SWE) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 8/22/2019.]
July 15, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Statement of Account. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (EDC) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 8/22/2019.]
July 10, 2019 ***Set CASE REFERRED Flag (PPS) (EDC) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 8/22/2019.]
July 10, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Statement of Account by Joseph Lee Collins. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(EDC) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 8/22/2019.]
July 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against David Wade Correctional Center, Chris Evans, Jerry Goodwin, Louisiana Department of Public Safety and Corrections, Seth Sherman, filed by Joseph Lee Collins. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Exhibit, #3 envelope)(EDC) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 8/22/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Collins v. Louisiana Department of Public Safety and Corrections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Lee Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LA Dept of Public Safety & Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Goodwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seth Sherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Wade Correctional Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?