Jackson et al v. Jones et al
Plaintiff: TAMIKA SMITH, LADARREN JACKSON, RODRIQUEZ SMITH and Tamika Williams Smith
Defendant: CITY OF SHREVEPORT, Mike Jones and Shreveport Police Dept
Case Number: 5:2019cv01205
Filed: September 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth E Foote
Referring Judge: Mark L Hornsby
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the deadline for Defendants to file an Answer and/or other responsive pleadings is extended to and until December 1, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 10/29/2019. (crt,Thomas, T)
October 29, 2019 NOTICE of Corrective Action to Nichole Marie Buckle on behalf of Mike Jones, City of Shreveport regarding #5 Sealed Document. Action taken: Modified to indicate Electronically Filed in Error. Document refiled in correct case by counsel. (crt,Thomas, T)
October 28, 2019 Filing 5 (ELECTRONICALLY FILED IN ERROR) SEALED DOCUMENT: Documents in Defendants' Possession by Mike Jones, City of Shreveport. (aty,Buckle, Nichole) Modified to indicate document electronically filed in error on 10/29/2019. Document refiled in correct case by counsel. (Thomas, T).
October 28, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, with consent by Mike Jones, City of Shreveport. Motions referred to Mark L Hornsby. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(Attorney Nichole Marie Buckle added to party Mike Jones(pty:dft), Attorney Nichole Marie Buckle added to party City of Shreveport(pty:dft), Attorney Nichole Marie Buckle added to party Shreveport Police Dept(pty:dft))(aty,Buckle, Nichole) Modified to correct filers on 10/29/2019 (Thomas, T).
September 17, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1331. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 9/17/2019. (crt,Stephens, M)
September 16, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Mike Jones, City of Shreveport, Shreveport Police Dept. (crt,ThomasSld, T)
September 13, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge Elizabeth E Foote and Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (crt,ThomasSld, T)
September 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mike Jones, Shreveport Police Dept, City of Shreveport with Jury Demand (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-4049173) filed by LaDarren Jackson, Tamika Williams Smith, Rodriquez Smith. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney James E Ross, Jr added to party LaDarren Jackson(pty:pla), Attorney James E Ross, Jr added to party Rodriquez Smith(pty:pla), Attorney James E Ross, Jr added to party Tamika Smith(pty:pla))(aty,Ross, James) Modified to edit docket text on 9/16/2019 (ThomasSld, T).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson et al v. Jones et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY OF SHREVEPORT
Represented By: Nichole Marie Buckle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Jones
Represented By: Nichole Marie Buckle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shreveport Police Dept
Represented By: Nichole Marie Buckle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TAMIKA SMITH
Represented By: James E Ross, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LADARREN JACKSON
Represented By: James E Ross, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RODRIQUEZ SMITH
Represented By: James E Ross, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tamika Williams Smith
Represented By: James E Ross, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?