Flat River Farms L L C et al v. M R C Energy Co
Plaintiff: Frank J Raley, Gibbs Company, LLC, Northwest Louisiana Carters, LLC, Teresa L Raley, Flat River Farms, LLC, Northwest Louisiana Carters L L C, Flat River Farms L L C and Gibbs Co L L C
Defendant: MRC Energy Company and M R C Energy Co
Case Number: 5:2019cv01249
Filed: September 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth E Foote
Referring Judge: Mark L Hornsby
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MEMORANDUM ORDER re #6 Memorandum Order. Counsel are directed to review prior order, confer, and file a response to this order by 12/16/19 regarding the members of the LLCs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 11/20/2019. (crt,Roaix, G)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 1/11/2021 at 9:00 AM in Shreveport, Courtroom 2 before Judge Elizabeth E Foote. Pretrial Conference set for 12/10/2020 at 10:00 AM in chambers before Judge Elizabeth E Foote. Pretrial Order due by 12/3/2020. Joinder of Parties and Amendment of Pleadings due by 1/19/2020. Plaintiffs Witness List due by 4/1/2020. Defendants witness list is due seven (7) days after receipt of plaintiffs list. Plaintiffs Expert Info/Reports due by 6/19/2020. Defendants Expert Info/Reports due by 7/19/2020. Discovery deadline 6/19/2020. Compel discovery 6/19/2020. Expert Depositions due by 8/19/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 9/19/2020. Daubert Motions due by 9/9/2020. Proposed Pretrial Order inserts and exhibits exchanged by 10/29/2020. Conference/Meeting of counsel to prepare pretrial order to be held by 11/12/2020. Motions in Limine due by 11/20/2020. Trial Brief/Pretrial Submissions due by 1/4/2021. Electronic Exhibits due by 1/4/2021. Trial Depositions due by 12/14/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 11/18/2019. (crt,Keller, J)
November 18, 2019 Filing 13 MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 11/18/2019. (crt,Keller, J)
November 11, 2019 Filing 12 RULE 26(f) Case Management Report by M R C Energy Co, Flat River Farms L L C, Gibbs Co L L C, Northwest Louisiana Carters L L C, Frank J Raley, Teresa L Raley. (aty,Arceneaux, M) Modified on 11/11/2019 to add filers (Whidden, C).
October 30, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER by M R C Energy Co . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit)(aty,Arceneaux, M)
October 23, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #7 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Frank J Raley, Teresa L Raley.(aty,Carr, Bendel) Modified filers on 10/23/2019 (Dunford, T).
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 11/18/2019 10:30 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. Rule 26 Conference between parties to take place before 11/4/2019. Initial Disclosures exchanged by 11/11/2019. Rule 26 Report due by 11/11/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 10/4/2019. (crt,Keller, J)
October 2, 2019 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by M R C Energy Co identifying Corporate Parent Matador Resources Company for M R C Energy Co, M R C Energy Co. (aty,Arceneaux, M)
October 2, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by M R C Energy Co.(aty,Arceneaux, M)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM ORDER re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by M R C Energy Co. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 9/30/2019. (crt,Roaix, G)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 9/30/2019. (crt,Roaix, G)
September 26, 2019 Filing 4 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M)
September 26, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal, sent to Michael Earl Riddick, Charles Taunton Melville, M Thomas Arceneaux on behalf of M R C Energy Co. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 10/10/2019. (crt,Thigpen, M)
September 24, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge Elizabeth E Foote and Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (crt,Thigpen, M)
September 24, 2019 STATE COURT Service Returned Executed. M R C Energy Co answer due 10/2/2019. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: (THE PDF IMAGE CAN BE FOUND IN ATTACHMENT #1 OF DOCUMENT #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL). (crt,Thigpen, M)
September 24, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by MRC Energy Company. (aty,Arceneaux, M)
September 24, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 26th JDC Bossier Parish, Case Number C-160328 (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-4057917) filed by MRC Energy Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-suit record)(Attorney M Thomas Arceneaux added to party MRC Energy Company(pty:dft))(aty,Arceneaux, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Flat River Farms L L C et al v. M R C Energy Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank J Raley
Represented By: Bendel Lee Carr, Jr
Represented By: Chad E Sepulvado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gibbs Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Northwest Louisiana Carters, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa L Raley
Represented By: Bendel Lee Carr, Jr
Represented By: Chad E Sepulvado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Flat River Farms, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Northwest Louisiana Carters L L C
Represented By: Bendel Lee Carr, Jr
Represented By: Chad E Sepulvado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Flat River Farms L L C
Represented By: Bendel Lee Carr, Jr
Represented By: Chad E Sepulvado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gibbs Co L L C
Represented By: Bendel Lee Carr, Jr
Represented By: Chad E Sepulvado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MRC Energy Company
Represented By: M Thomas Arceneaux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M R C Energy Co
Represented By: M Thomas Arceneaux
Represented By: Michael Earl Riddick
Represented By: Charles Taunton Melville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?