Summers Concrete Contracting Inc v. Hanson Aggregates L L C et al
Plaintiff: Summers Concrete Contracting, Inc. and Summers Concrete Contracting Inc
Defendant: Lehigh Hanson, Inc., Hanover Aggregates, LLC, Lehigh Hanson Inc and Hanson Aggregates L L C
Case Number: 5:2019cv01251
Filed: September 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth E Foote
Referring Judge: Mark L Hornsby
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER: Bench Trial set for 1/25/2021 at 9:00 AM in Shreveport, Courtroom 2 before Judge Elizabeth E Foote. Pretrial Conference set for 12/17/2020 at 10:30 AM in chambers before Judge Elizabeth E Foote. Pretrial Order due by 12/10/2020. Joinder of Parties and Amendment of Pleadings due by 2/28/2020. Plaintiffs Witness List due by 2/15/2020. Defendant's witness list is due seven (7) days after receipt of plaintiff's list. Plaintiffs Expert Info/Reports due by 5/29/2020. Defendants Expert Info/Reports due by 6/30/2020. Discovery deadline 5/29/2020. Compel discovery 5/29/2020. Expert Depositions due by 7/31/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 8/31/2020. Daubert Motions due by 8/21/2020. Proposed Pretrial Order inserts and exhibits exchanged by 11/5/2020. Conference/Meeting of counsel to prepare pretrial order to be held by 11/19/2020. Motions in Limine due by 12/3/2020. Trial Brief/Pretrial Submissions due by 12/21/2020. Electronic Exhibits due by 1/19/2021. Trial Depositions due by 1/19/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 11/21/2019. (crt,Keller, J)
November 21, 2019 Filing 12 MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 11/21/2019. (crt,Keller, J)
November 13, 2019 Filing 11 RULE 26(f) Report by Hanson Aggregates L L C, Lehigh Hanson Inc, Summers Concrete Contracting Inc. (aty,Arceneaux, M) Modified on 11/13/2019 to add filer. (Crick, S).
October 30, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER by Hanson Aggregates L L C, Lehigh Hanson Inc . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit)(aty,Arceneaux, M)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 11/21/2019 10:30 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. Rule 26 Conference between parties to take place before 11/6/2019. Initial Disclosures exchanged by 11/13/2019. Rule 26 Report due by 11/13/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 10/4/2019. (crt,Keller, J)
October 2, 2019 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent, Heidelberg Cement A G, for Lehigh Hanson Inc and identifying Corporate Parents, H B M A Holdings L L C, H N A Investments, Essex N A Holdings, Hanson Devon Designated Activity Co for Hanson Aggregates L L C by Hanson Aggregates L L C, Lehigh Hanson Inc. (aty,Arceneaux, M) Modified on 10/2/2019 to modify docket text. (Crick, S).
October 2, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Hanson Aggregates L L C, Lehigh Hanson Inc.(aty,Arceneaux, M)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM ORDER. The court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to 28 USC 1332. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 9/30/2019. (crt,Crick, S)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 REMOVAL ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 9/30/2019. (crt,Crick, S)
September 25, 2019 Filing 4 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M)
September 25, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal, sent to Charles Taunton Melville, M Thomas Arceneaux on behalf of Hanover Aggregates, LLC, Lehigh Hanson, Inc.. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 10/9/2019. (crt,Thigpen, M)
September 25, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge Elizabeth E Foote and Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (crt,Thigpen, M)
September 25, 2019 STATE COURT Service Returned Executed. Lehigh Hanson, Inc. answer due 10/2/2019. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: (THE PDF IMAGE CAN BE FOUND IN ATTACHMENT #1 OF DOCUMENT #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL). (crt,Thigpen, M)
September 25, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Hanover Aggregates, LLC, Lehigh Hanson, Inc.. (aty,Arceneaux, M)
September 25, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 26th JDC Bossier Parish, Case Number C-160355 (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-4058516) filed by Lehigh Hanson, Inc., Hanover Aggregates, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A State Court Pleadings)(Attorney M Thomas Arceneaux added to party Hanover Aggregates, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney M Thomas Arceneaux added to party Lehigh Hanson, Inc.(pty:dft))(aty,Arceneaux, M) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/25/2019: #2 Proposed order) (Thigpen, M).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Summers Concrete Contracting Inc v. Hanson Aggregates L L C et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lehigh Hanson, Inc.
Represented By: M Thomas Arceneaux
Represented By: Charles Taunton Melville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hanover Aggregates, LLC
Represented By: M Thomas Arceneaux
Represented By: Charles Taunton Melville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lehigh Hanson Inc
Represented By: M Thomas Arceneaux
Represented By: Charles Taunton Melville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hanson Aggregates L L C
Represented By: M Thomas Arceneaux
Represented By: Charles Taunton Melville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Summers Concrete Contracting, Inc.
Represented By: John Oliver Hayter, III
Represented By: Lauren Hayter Reynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Summers Concrete Contracting Inc
Represented By: John Oliver Hayter, III
Represented By: Lauren Hayter Reynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?