Fuller v. Halliburton Energy Services Inc et al
Plaintiff: steven Fuller
Defendant: Halliburton Energy Services, Inc, John Eschberger and Halliburton Energy Services Inc
Case Number: 5:2019cv01383
Filed: October 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth E Foote
Referring Judge: Mark L Hornsby
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2019 Filing 12 MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 12/9/2019. The parties asked for a period of discovery on liability issues before other deadlines were set. Accordingly, fact discovery is open regarding liability and to determine whether any amendments to pleadings are necessary. Follow-up Status Conference set for 3/12/2020 10:00 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (crt,Keller, J)
November 26, 2019 Filing 11 RULE 26(f) Report by John Eschberger, Halliburton Energy Services Inc and Steven Fuller. (aty,Marshall, Ben) Modified on 11/27/2019 to add filer (Dauterive, C).
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Enroll as Counsel. Added as counsel Brandon Trey Morris,Meagan Elyse Shadinger,Elizabeth Ann Hancock,Joseph Chancellor Nerren for Steven Fuller. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 11/20/2019. (crt,Roaix, G)
November 19, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for B. Trey Morris, Meagan E. Shadinger, Elizabeth A. Hancock, J. Chancellor Nerren to Enroll as Counsel by Steven Fuller. Motions referred to Mark L Hornsby. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Dewett, Justin)
October 31, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER by John Eschberger, Halliburton Energy Services Inc . (aty,Marshall, Ben)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 12/9/2019 11:00 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. Rule 26 Conference between parties to take place by 11/25/2019. Rule 26 Case Management Report due by 12/2/2019. Initial Disclosures exchanged by 12/2/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 10/28/2019. (crt,Dauterive, C)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 10/25/2019. (crt,Dauterive, C)
October 25, 2019 Filing 4 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by John Eschberger, Halliburton Energy Services Inc. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY to capture jury demand included within 4 Answer. (crt,Williams, L) Modified on 10/25/2019 to add document number (Williams, L).
October 25, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1332. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 10/25/2019. (crt,Rider, M)
October 24, 2019 Filing 3 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M)
October 24, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge Elizabeth E Foote and Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (crt,Thigpen, M)
October 24, 2019 STATE COURT Service Returned Executed. Halliburton Energy Services, Inc John Eschberger answer due 10/31/2019. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: (THE PDF IMAGE CAN BE FOUND IN ATTACHMENT #4 OF DOCUMENT #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL). (crt,Thigpen, M)
October 24, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Halliburton Energy Services, Inc, John Eschberger. (aty,Marshall, Ben)
October 24, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 26th JDC, Case Number 160493 (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-4083314) filed by Halliburton Energy Services, Inc, John Eschberger. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit to Notice of Removal, #2 Civil cover sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 List of State Court Proceedings, #4 Exhibit Exhibits to List of State Court Proceedings)(Attorney Ben Marshall, Jr added to party Halliburton Energy Services, Inc(pty:selreq), Attorney Ben Marshall, Jr added to party John Eschberger(pty:selreq))(aty,Marshall, Ben)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fuller v. Halliburton Energy Services Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: steven Fuller
Represented By: Justin Carey Dewett
Represented By: Meagan Elyse Shadinger
Represented By: Brandon Trey Morris
Represented By: Elizabeth Ann Hancock
Represented By: Joseph Chancellor Nerren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Halliburton Energy Services, Inc
Represented By: Ben Marshall, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Eschberger
Represented By: Ben Marshall, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Halliburton Energy Services Inc
Represented By: Ben Marshall, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?