Harris v. Cobb et al
Plaintiff: Florasteen Harris
Defendant: Jackalope Holdings, L.L.C., Progressive County Mutual Insurance Company, Dewey James Cobb, Progressive Casualty Insurance Co, Progressive County Mutual Insurance Co and Jackalope Holdings L L C
Case Number: 5:2020cv00060
Filed: January 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: S Maurice Hicks
Referring Judge: Mark L Hornsby
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 10/13/2020 at 9:30 AM in Shreveport, Courtroom 3 before Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. Pretrial Conference set for 8/13/2020 at 11:00 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. Pretrial Order due by 8/6/2020. Witness List due by 5/1/2020. Defendant's witness list is due seven (7) days after receipt of plaintiff's list. Discovery deadline 7/13/2020. Daubert Motions due by 9/3/2020. Proposed Pretrial Order inserts and exhibits exchanged by 7/2/2020. Conference/Meeting of counsel to prepare pretrial order to be held by 7/16/2020. Motions in Limine due by 7/30/2020. Trial Depositions due by 8/24/2020. Trial Brief/Pretrial Submissions due by 10/6/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 2/24/2020. (crt,Keller, J)
February 24, 2020 Filing 15 MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby: Telephone SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 2/24/2020. (crt,Keller, J)
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby for trial. Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr no longer assigned to case as presiding judge.. Signed by Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr on 1/22/2020. (crt,Crick, S)
January 21, 2020 Filing 13 PROPOSED ORDER OF REFERENCE Referred to Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (Attachments: #1 Consent Form Received on 01/21/2020)(crt,Crick, S)
January 20, 2020 NOTICE of Corrective Action to Ronald J Miciotto on behalf of Florasteen Harris regarding #12 MOTION for Disclosure of Rule 26 Initial Disclosures . Action taken: Counsel is reminded of Local Rule 26.5, FRCP5(d) and Standing Order 1.15; local and federal rules do not allow routine filing of discovery, including disclosures and subpoenas under Rule 26. No further action on part of counsel is required. (crt,Crick, S)
January 20, 2020 Filing 12 ELECTRONICALLY FILED IN ERROR. MOTION for Disclosure of Rule 26 Initial Disclosures by Florasteen Harris. Motions referred to Mark L Hornsby. (Attorney Ronald J Miciotto added to party Florasteen Harris(pty:pla))(aty,Miciotto, Ronald) Modified on 1/21/2020 to indicate electronically filed in error. (Crick, S).
January 20, 2020 Filing 11 RULE 26(f) Report by Dewey James Cobb, Jackalope Holdings L L C, Progressive County Mutual Insurance Co, Florasteen Harris. (aty,Spruiell, Franklin) Modified on 1/21/2020 to add filer. (Crick, S).
January 17, 2020 Filing 10 RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER by Dewey James Cobb, Jackalope Holdings L L C, Progressive County Mutual Insurance Co . (aty,Spruiell, Franklin)
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 2/20/2020 at 10:30 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. Rule 26 Conference between parties to take place before 2/6/2020. Initial Disclosures exchanged by 2/13/2020. Rule 26 Report due by 2/13/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 1/15/2020. (crt,Keller, J)
January 15, 2020 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1332. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 1/15/2020. (crt,Rider, M)
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 REMOVAL ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 1/15/2020. (crt,Crick, S)
January 14, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Dewey James Cobb, Jackalope Holdings L L C.(aty,Spruiell, Franklin) Modified on 1/15/2020 to modify docket text. (Crick, S).
January 14, 2020 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Jackalope Holdings L L C. (aty,Spruiell, Franklin) Modified on 1/15/2020 to modify docket text. (Crick, S).
January 14, 2020 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Progressive County Mutual Insurance Co identifying Corporate Parent, Progressive Casualty Insurance Co for Progressive County Mutual Insurance Co. (aty,Spruiell, Franklin) Modified on 1/15/2020 to modify docket text. (Crick, S).
January 14, 2020 Filing 3 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M)
January 14, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal, sent to Franklin H Spruiell, Jr on behalf of Jackalope Holdings, L.L.C., Progressive County Mutual Insurance Company. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 1/28/2020. (crt,Thigpen, M)
January 14, 2020 CASE Assigned to Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr and Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (crt,Thigpen, M)
January 14, 2020 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Progressive County Mutual Insurance Company. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: (THE PDF IMAGE CAN BE FOUND IN ATTACHMENT #2 OF DOCUMENT #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL). (crt,Thigpen, M)
January 14, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 1st JDC Caddo Parish, Case Number 619942-A with Jury Demand; (Filing fee $400, receipt number ALAWDC-4154105) filed by Progressive County Mutual Insurance Company, Jackalope Holdings, L.L.C., Dewey James Cobb. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit State Court Pleadings and Citations Ex. A, #3 Exhibit Email from Plaintiff's counsel to Frank H. Spruiell, Jr.Ex. B, #4 Exhibit Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal.Ex. C)(Attorney Franklin H Spruiell, Jr added to party Dewey James Cobb(pty:dft), Attorney Franklin H Spruiell, Jr added to party Jackalope Holdings, L.L.C.(pty:dft), Attorney Franklin H Spruiell, Jr added to party Progressive County Mutual Insurance Company(pty:dft))(aty,Spruiell, Franklin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris v. Cobb et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Florasteen Harris
Represented By: Justin Payton Smith
Represented By: Ronald J Miciotto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jackalope Holdings, L.L.C.
Represented By: Franklin H Spruiell, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive County Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Franklin H Spruiell, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dewey James Cobb
Represented By: Franklin H Spruiell, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Casualty Insurance Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive County Mutual Insurance Co
Represented By: Franklin H Spruiell, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jackalope Holdings L L C
Represented By: Franklin H Spruiell, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?