USA v. T L Services Inc et al
Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: Travelers Casualty & Surety Co of America and T L Services Inc
Case Number: 5:2020cv00218
Filed: February 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: S Maurice Hicks
Referring Judge: Mark L Hornsby
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40 U.S.C. ยง 3131
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 30, 2020 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by USA identifying Other Affiliate Rembco Geotechnical Contractors Inc for USA. (aty,Richeson, Stuart) Modified on 3/30/2020 to modify docket text (MiletelloSld, A).
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, T L Services Inc answer due 4/17/2020; Travelers Casualty & Surety Co of America answer due 4/17/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 3/19/2020. (crt,Jones, P)
March 18, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement sent to Robert Kennedy, Jr on behalf of T L Services Inc, Travelers Casualty & Surety Co of America. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 4/1/2020. (crt,MiletelloSld, A)
March 18, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, with consent by T L Services Inc, Travelers Casualty & Surety Co of America. Motions referred to Mark L Hornsby. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 3/18/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(Attorney Robert Kennedy, Jr added to party T L Services Inc(pty:dft) and Travelers Casualty & Surety Co of America(pty:dft))(aty,Kennedy, Robert) Modified on 3/18/2020 to modify docket text (MiletelloSld, A).
March 17, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by USA. T L Services Inc served on 3/5/2020, answer due 3/26/2020. (aty,Richeson, Stuart)
March 3, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by USA. Travelers Casualty & Surety Co of America served on 2/27/2020, answer due 3/19/2020. (aty,Richeson, Stuart)
February 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER transferring matter to the Shreveport Division and for reassignment to appropriate judge and magistrate judge. Signed by Judge Dee D Drell on 2/21/2020. (crt,Reeves, T)
February 21, 2020 DIVISIONAL TRANSFER of Old Case Number 1:20-cv-218 from Alexandria Division to Shreveport Division. New Case Number 5:20-cv-00218. Case assigned to Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr and Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (crt,Reeves, T)
February 21, 2020 NOTICE of Corrective Action regarding #4 Case Management Order - Judge Drell. Action taken: Modified to reflect not applicable to this case since case transferred to Shreveport division. (crt,Reeves, T)
February 20, 2020 Filing 4 NOT APPLICABLE TO THIS CASE SINCE TRANSFERRED TO SHREVEPORT DIVISION: CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER No 1 for cases assigned to Judge Dee D Drell sent to counsel of record. (Plan of Work - Compliance Deadline set for 4/18/2020.)(crt,Roaix, G) Modified to reflect not applicable to case on 2/24/2020 (Reeves, T).
February 20, 2020 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1331. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 2/20/2020. (jud,Perez-Montes, Joseph)
February 19, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to T L Services Inc and Travelers Casualty & Surety Co of America. (crt,Dauterive, C)
February 18, 2020 CASE Assigned to Judge Dee D Drell and Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (crt,Dauterive, C)
February 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against T L Services Inc and Travelers Casualty & Surety Co of America (Filed on behalf of USA - Filing Fee not required) filed by USA (for the use and benefit of Rembco Geotechnical Contractors Inc) (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Stuart G Richeson added to party Rmbco Geotechnical Contractors, Inc.(pty:pla))(aty,Richeson, Stuart) Modified on 2/19/2020 to edit text (Dauterive, C).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. T L Services Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Casualty & Surety Co of America
Represented By: Robert Kennedy, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T L Services Inc
Represented By: Robert Kennedy, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Stuart G Richeson
Represented By: Lillian Marie Grappe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?