Stockton et al v. L G Electronics U S A et al
Plaintiff: William Stockton, Allstate Insurance Company and Allstate Insurance Co
Defendant: Best Buy Stores, LP, LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc., L G Electronics U S A Inc and Best Buy Stores L P
Case Number: 5:2020cv00438
Filed: April 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Karen L Hayes
Referring Judge: Donald E Walter
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 1, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Best Buy Stores L P.(aty,Lawrence, John)
April 22, 2020 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Best Buy Stores L P identifying Corporate Parents B B C Property Co, B B C Investment Co for Best Buy Stores L P (aty,Lawrence, John) Modified on 4/22/2020 to modify docket text (MiletelloSld, A).
April 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of William D Mahoney for William Stockton. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 4/17/2020. (crt,Leday, A)
April 16, 2020 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Allstate Insurance Co identifying Corporate Parent Allstate Corp, Corporate Parent Allstate Insurance Holdings L L C for Allstate Insurance Co. (aty,Pipes, William)
April 16, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for William D. Mahoney to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-4237520) by William Stockton, Allstate Insurance Co. Motions referred to Karen L Hayes. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 4/16/2020. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Pipes, William) Modified on 4/16/2020 to add filers and modify docket text (MiletelloSld, A).
April 14, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by L G Electronics U S A Inc.(aty,Frohn, David)
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 4/9/2020. (crt,Leday, A)
April 8, 2020 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by L G Electronics U S A Inc identifying Corporate Parent L G Electronics Inc for L G Electronics U S A Inc. (aty,Frohn, David) Modified on 4/8/2020 to modify docket text. (MiletelloSld, A).
April 8, 2020 Filing 4 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 4/8/2020. (crt,Thigpen, M)
April 8, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal, sent to David Patrick Curlin, John S Lawrence, Jr on behalf of Best Buy Stores L P. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 4/22/2020. (crt,Thigpen, M)
April 7, 2020 CASE Assigned to Judge Donald E Walter and Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. (crt,Thigpen, M)
April 7, 2020 CONSENT TO REMOVAL by L G Electronics U S A Inc. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: (THE PDF IMAGE CAN BE FOUND IN ATTACHMENT #2 OF DOCUMENT #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL). (crt,Thigpen, M)
April 7, 2020 STATE COURT Service Returned Executed. Best Buy Stores L P, L G Electronics U S A Inc answer due 4/14/2020. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: (THE PDF IMAGE CAN BE FOUND IN ATTACHMENTS # 7 & 8 OF DOCUMENT #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL). (crt,Thigpen, M)
April 7, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Compliance re #1 Notice of Removal by Best Buy Stores, LP (aty,Lawrence, John) Modified on 4/8/2020 to modify docket text (MiletelloSld, A).
April 7, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 1st JDC Parish of Caddo, Case Number 621,884 with Jury Demand; (Filing fee $400, receipt number ALAWDC-4229678) filed by Best Buy Stores, LP. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Proposed pleading Consent to Removal, #3 Proposed pleading List of Attorneys, #4 Proposed pleading List of State Court Pleadings, #5 Proposed pleading Notice of Removal to Adverse Parties, #6 Proposed pleading Removal Certificate, #7 State court notice of filing, #8 State court citation Best Buy, #9 State court citation LG Electronics)(Attorney John S Lawrence, Jr added to party Best Buy Stores, LP(pty:dft))(aty,Lawrence, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stockton et al v. L G Electronics U S A et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Best Buy Stores, LP
Represented By: John S Lawrence, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L G Electronics U S A Inc
Represented By: Natasha Amber Corb
Represented By: David R Frohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Best Buy Stores L P
Represented By: David Patrick Curlin
Represented By: John S Lawrence, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Stockton
Represented By: William Ransom Pipes
Represented By: William D Mahoney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allstate Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allstate Insurance Co
Represented By: William Ransom Pipes
Represented By: William D Mahoney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?