Haynes et al v. Chubb & Son Inc et al
Plaintiff: Minette Defrance Haynes and James Haynes
Defendant: Great Northern Insurance Co, Chubb Custom Insurance Co, Chubb Group of Insurance Companies, Federal Insurance Co, Chubb National Insurance Co, Chubb Indemnity Insurance Co, Chubb & Son Inc and Ace Insurance Co of the Midwest
Case Number: 5:2020cv00636
Filed: May 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: S Maurice Hicks
Referring Judge: Mark L Hornsby
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MEMORANDUM ORDER. The court makes a preliminary finding that subject matter exists pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1332. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. A scheduling conference will be set in due course. See Memorandum Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 6/23/2020. (crt,Keller, J)
June 17, 2020 Filing 15 ANSWER to #10 Amended Complaint by Ace Insurance Co of the Midwest.(aty,Engelhardt, Leah)
June 12, 2020 Filing 14 AMENDED Notice of Removal to #1 Notice of Removal in response to #7 Memorandum Order by Ace Insurance Co of the Midwest. (aty,Engelhardt, Leah) Modified on 6/12/2020 to create docket entry relationship and modify docket text (Miletello, A).
June 12, 2020 Filing 13 RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER by Ace Insurance Co of the Midwest . (aty,Engelhardt, Leah)
June 3, 2020 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ace Insurance Co of the Midwest identifying Corporate Parent Chubb INA Holdings Inc., Corporate Parent Chubb Group Holdings Inc., Corporate Parent Chubb Limited, Corporate Parent ACE Property and Casualty Insurance Co., Corporate Parent INA Holdings, Corporate Parent INA Financial Corporation, Corporate Parent INA Corporation for Ace Insurance Co of the Midwest (Attorney Leah Nunn Engelhardt added to party Ace Insurance Co of the Midwest(pty:dft)). (aty,Engelhardt, Leah)
June 2, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ace Insurance Co of the Midwest. (crt,Jones, P)
June 2, 2020 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Ace Insurance Co of the Midwest with Jury Demand filed by Minette Defrance Haynes, James Haynes.(crt,Jones, P)
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Amend Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 6/2/2020. (crt,Jones, P)
June 1, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #8 MOTION to Amend Complaint.(Motion Ripe Deadline set for 6/1/2020.), Motions Transferred regarding #8 MOTION to Amend Complaint. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (crt,Jones, P)
June 1, 2020 Filing 8 Motion to Amend Complaint with consent filed by Minette Defrance Haynes, James Haynes. (Attachments: #1 Proposed pleading, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Pitre, Madison) Modified on 6/1/2020 to capture more accurate event and edit text (Jones, P).
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMORANDUM ORDER. The removing defendants will be allowed until June 12, 2020 to file an amended notice of removal and attempt to meet their burden. See Memorandum Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 5/26/2020. (crt,Keller, J)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Chubb & Son Inc answer due 6/17/2020; Chubb Custom Insurance Co answer due 6/17/2020; Chubb Group of Insurance Companies answer due 6/17/2020; Chubb Indemnity Insurance Co answer due 6/17/2020; Chubb National Insurance Co answer due 6/17/2020; Federal Insurance Co answer due 6/17/2020; Great Northern Insurance Co answer due 6/17/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 5/26/2020. (crt,Jones, P)
May 22, 2020 Filing 5 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal,,, with consent by Chubb & Son Inc, Chubb Custom Insurance Co, Chubb Group of Insurance Companies, Chubb Indemnity Insurance Co, Chubb National Insurance Co, Federal Insurance Co, Great Northern Insurance Co. Motions referred to Mark L Hornsby. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 5/22/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Engelhardt, Leah)
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 5/21/2020. (crt,Jones, P)
May 20, 2020 Filing 3 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 5/20/2020. (crt,Thigpen, M)
May 20, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal sent to Leah Nunn Engelhardt, Thomas Harrison Prince on behalf of Chubb & Son Inc, Chubb Custom Insurance Co, Chubb Group of Insurance Companies, Chubb Indemnity Insurance Co, Chubb National Insurance Co, Federal Insurance Co, Great Northern Insurance Co. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 6/3/2020. (crt,Thigpen, M)
May 20, 2020 CASE Assigned to Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr and Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (crt,Thigpen, M)
May 20, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 1st JDC Caddo Parish, Case Number 623-305 (Filing fee $400, receipt number ALAWDC-4268891) filed by Chubb Custom Insurance Co, Chubb & Son Inc, Chubb National Insurance Co, Federal Insurance Co, Chubb Indemnity Insurance Co, Great Northern Insurance Co, Chubb Group of Insurance Companies. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Pleadings, #2 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Leah Nunn Engelhardt added to party Chubb & Son Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Leah Nunn Engelhardt added to party Chubb Custom Insurance Co(pty:dft), Attorney Leah Nunn Engelhardt added to party Chubb Group of Insurance Companies(pty:dft), Attorney Leah Nunn Engelhardt added to party Chubb Indemnity Insurance Co(pty:dft), Attorney Leah Nunn Engelhardt added to party Chubb National Insurance Co(pty:dft), Attorney Leah Nunn Engelhardt added to party Federal Insurance Co(pty:dft), Attorney Leah Nunn Engelhardt added to party Great Northern Insurance Co(pty:dft))(aty,Engelhardt, Leah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Haynes et al v. Chubb & Son Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great Northern Insurance Co
Represented By: Thomas Harrison Prince
Represented By: Leah Nunn Engelhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chubb Custom Insurance Co
Represented By: Thomas Harrison Prince
Represented By: Leah Nunn Engelhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chubb Group of Insurance Companies
Represented By: Thomas Harrison Prince
Represented By: Leah Nunn Engelhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Insurance Co
Represented By: Thomas Harrison Prince
Represented By: Leah Nunn Engelhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chubb National Insurance Co
Represented By: Thomas Harrison Prince
Represented By: Leah Nunn Engelhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chubb Indemnity Insurance Co
Represented By: Thomas Harrison Prince
Represented By: Leah Nunn Engelhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chubb & Son Inc
Represented By: Thomas Harrison Prince
Represented By: Leah Nunn Engelhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ace Insurance Co of the Midwest
Represented By: Thomas Harrison Prince
Represented By: Leah Nunn Engelhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Minette Defrance Haynes
Represented By: Galen M Hair
Represented By: Madison Carroll Pitre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Haynes
Represented By: Galen M Hair
Represented By: Madison Carroll Pitre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?