Hoover v. Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Co et al
Plaintiff: Ryan Irwin Hoover
Defendant: Globe Life And Accident Insurance Company, National Fire Insurance Company of Hartford, Globe Life Insurance Agency, Inc., Frederick W. Hadayia, C N A Insurance Co, Globe Life Insurance Co, Frederick W Hadayia, Globe Life & Accident Insurance Co, Globe Life Insurance Agency Inc, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Co and National Fire Insurance Co of Hartford
Case Number: 5:2020cv00937
Filed: July 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Mark L Hornsby
Referring Judge: Donald E Walter
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MEMORANDUM ORDER: All requirements of Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) are hereby waived in this case, including the conference of the parties and the report to the Court. The parties are directed to serve their initial disclosures within 30 days and promptly begin any necessary discovery and motion practice. A scheduling order will be issued by the Court setting the matter for trial in due course. Signed by Judge Donald E Walter on 9/17/2020. (crt,Bray, K)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Enroll as Counsel. Added as additional counsel Brandon Trey Morris, Elizabeth Ann Hancock, Justin Carey Dewett, Joseph Chancellor Nerren, John Allen Davis for Ryan Irwin Hoover. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 8/31/2020. (crt,Keller, J)
August 31, 2020 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1332. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 8/31/2020. (crt,Rider, M)
August 28, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for B.Trey Morris, Elizabeth A. Hancock, Justin C. Dewett, J. Chancellor Nerren, and John Davis to Enroll as Counsel by Ryan Irwin Hoover. Motions referred to Mark L Hornsby. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 8/28/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Powell, Joshua)
July 30, 2020 Filing 7 RESPONSE to Motion re #5 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby filed by Globe Life & Accident Insurance Co. (aty,Butterfield, David)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MEMORANDUM ORDER, C N A Insurance Co terminated, without prejudice, (Compliance Deadline set for 8/24/2020 for plaintiff to file Motion to Remand.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 7/29/2020. (crt,Jones, P)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 7/29/2020. (crt,Keifer, K)
July 28, 2020 Filing 5 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 7/28/2020. (crt,Jones, P)
July 28, 2020 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Globe Life & Accident Insurance Co, National Fire Insurance Co of Hartford. (crt,Jones, P)
July 28, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Deficiency to David Finley Butterfield on behalf of Globe Life & Accident Insurance Co, National Fire Insurance Co of Hartford regarding #1 Notice of Removal. Reason: No Civil Cover Sheet. (crt,Jones, P)
July 27, 2020 REMARK: A duplicate charge was incurred during the filing of the #1 Notice of Removal. A refund of the initial payment of $400.00, ALAWDC-4333020, has been processed in pay.gov this date. Counsel is advised to verify the refund on their statement. (crt,McInnis, S)
July 24, 2020 CASE Assigned to Judge Donald E Walter and Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (crt,Jones, P)
July 24, 2020 STATE COURT Service Returned Executed. C N A Insurance Co answer due 7/31/2020. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: SEE PDF ATTACHMENT #2 TO DOCUMENT #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL. (crt,Jones, P)
July 24, 2020 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Globe Life Insurance Co, Frederick W Hadayia, National Fire Insurance Co of Hartford filed by Ryan Irwin Hoover. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: PDF ATTACHED AS #2 TO DOCUMENT #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL.(crt,Jones, P)
July 24, 2020 Filing 2 ANSWER to Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Globe Life And Accident Insurance Agency Inc, Frederick W Hadayia, National Fire Insurance Co of Hartford, Globe Life and Accident Insurance Co "incorrectly named as Globe Life Insurance Co".(aty,Butterfield, David) Modified on 7/27/2020 to add filers and correct erroneously named party (Jones, P).
July 24, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 1st JDC Caddo Parish, Case Number 623178 with Jury Demand; (Filing fee $400, receipt number ALAWDC-4333140) filed by National Fire Insurance Co of Hartford, Globe Life And Accident Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Defense Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit B to Defense Notice of Removal)(Attorney David Finley Butterfield added to party Globe Life And Accident Insurance Company(pty:dft))(aty,Butterfield, David) (Attachment 1 replaced on 7/27/2020) (Jones, P). (Attachment 2 replaced on 7/27/2020) (Jones, P). Modified on 7/27/2020 to edit text, replace documents, correct filers (Jones, P). Modified on 7/28/2020 to indicate deficiency (Jones, P). Modified on 7/28/2020 to remove deficiency as Civil Cover Sheet filed as Document #4 (Jones, P).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hoover v. Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Co et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Globe Life And Accident Insurance Company
Represented By: David Finley Butterfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Fire Insurance Company of Hartford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Globe Life Insurance Agency, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frederick W. Hadayia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C N A Insurance Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Globe Life Insurance Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frederick W Hadayia
Represented By: David Finley Butterfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Globe Life & Accident Insurance Co
Represented By: David Finley Butterfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Globe Life Insurance Agency Inc
Represented By: David Finley Butterfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Fire Insurance Co of Hartford
Represented By: David Finley Butterfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Irwin Hoover
Represented By: Elizabeth Ann Hancock
Represented By: Joshua Lynn Powell
Represented By: Justin Carey Dewett
Represented By: John Allen Davis
Represented By: Brandon Trey Morris
Represented By: Joseph Chancellor Nerren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?