Liberty Mutual Group Inc v. Mayes
Plaintiff: Liberty Mutual Group Inc
Defendant: Linus Mayes
Case Number: 5:2020cv00967
Filed: July 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Karen L Hayes
Referring Judge: Donald E Walter
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2020 Filing 17 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. IT IS RECOMMENDED that the motion be DENIED. Objections to R&R due by 9/29/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 9/15/2020. (crt,Leday, A)
September 14, 2020 Filing 16 RESPONSE to Mayes' Recommendations for Umpire and in Support of Liberty Mutual Group's Umpire Recommendations by Liberty Mutual Group Inc re #15 Response (NOT Motions), #9 Response (NOT Motions) . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - CVs of Crawford, Fried and Lochridge, #2 Exhibit B - Irwin Resume' on LinkedIn, #3 Exhibit C - Irwin Depo Excerpt, #4 Exhibit D - Fried website, #5 Exhibit E - Lochridge website, #6 Exhibit F - Petition (Liberty Personal Ins. Co.v. Corbitt Pub. Adjusting))(aty,Barrasso, Judy)
September 7, 2020 Filing 15 RESPONSE Recommendations for Umpire by Linus Mayes re #9 Response (NOT Motions) . (aty,Moss, Trent)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #12 Motion to Expedite consideration of #7 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 9/4/2020. (crt,Crawford, A)
September 3, 2020 Motions Transferred regarding #12 Ex Parte MOTION to Expedite consideration of #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. (crt,Bray, K)
September 2, 2020 Motions Transferred regarding #12 Ex Parte MOTION to Expedite consideration of #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Motions referred to Judge Donald E Walter. (crt,Bunting, M)
September 2, 2020 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition to Defendant's #7 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction by Liberty Mutual Group Inc. (aty,Barrasso, Judy) Modified to add docket entry relationship on 9/2/2020 (Bunting, M).
September 2, 2020 Filing 12 Ex Parte MOTION to Expedite consideration of #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Liberty Mutual Group Inc. Motions referred to Karen L Hayes. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 9/2/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order to Motion for Expedited Consideration)(aty,Barrasso, Judy)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY: As #7 Motion to Dismiss has been referred to Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes, please note that the briefing schedule in #8 Notice of Motion Setting shall remain the same. It is hereby Ordered that all courtesy copies shall be directed to Magistrate Judge Hayes at hayes_motions@lawd.uscourts.gov, 201 Jackson Street, Ste 307, Monroe LA 71201. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 9/1/2020. (crt,Leday, A) Modified on 9/1/2020 to edit text (Leday, A).
September 1, 2020 Motions Transferred regarding #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. (crt,Bray, K)
August 27, 2020 Filing 10 MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes: STATUS CONFERENCE held on 8/27/2020, Counsel for Liberty Mutual intends to file a quick response to Mr. Mayes' 12(b)(1) motion, and to request expedited consideration for same. In the meanwhile, counsel for Mr. Mayes was ordered to file his list of suggested Umpires, along with his objections to Liberty Mutual's suggested umpires, within 10 days. Liberty Mutual is to file its objections to Mr. Mayes' suggested Umpires within one week thereafter. ( First Compliance Deadline set for 9/8/2020., Second Compliance Deadline set for 9/14/2020.). (jud,Hayes, Karen)
August 27, 2020 Filing 9 RECOMMENDATIONS FOR UMPIRE by Liberty Mutual Group Inc. (aty,Barrasso, Judy) Modified on 8/27/2020 to modify docket text (Whidden, C).
August 26, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Motion Setting without oral argument regarding: #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Motions referred to Judge Donald E Walter. Motion day set for 10/9/2020 before Judge Donald E Walter. (crt,Bunting, M)
August 26, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Linus Mayes. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief)(aty,Moss, Trent)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #1 Complaint. Linus Mayes answer due 8/26/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 8/21/2020. (crt,Leday, A)
August 20, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer with consent by Linus Mayes. Motions referred to Karen L Hayes. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 8/20/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(Attorney Trent Jared Moss added to party Linus Mayes(pty:dft))(aty,Moss, Trent)
August 20, 2020 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY: At the request of counsel, a Magistrate Judge Status Conference is set for 8/27/2020, at 01:30 PM, via telephone, before Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. Counsel for plaintiff shall circulate call-in information for the conference to all other parties and the court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 8/20/2020. (crt,Barkley, B)
July 30, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Liberty Mutual Group Inc. Linus Mayes served on 7/30/2020, answer due 8/20/2020. (aty,Barrasso, Judy)
July 30, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Linus Mayes. (crt,Crick, S)
July 30, 2020 REMARK: A duplicate charge was incurred during the filing of the #1 Complaint. A refund of the initial payment of $400.00, ALAWDC-4338149, has been processed in pay.gov this date. Counsel is advised to verify the refund on their statement. (crt,McInnis, S)
July 29, 2020 CASE Assigned to Judge Donald E Walter and Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. (crt,Crick, S)
July 29, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Linus Mayes (Filing fee $400, receipt number ALAWDC-4338155) filed by Liberty Mutual Group Inc. (Attachments: #1 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #2 Exhibit A - Insurance Policy, #3 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Judy Y Barrasso added to party Liberty Mutual Group Inc(pty:pla))(aty,Barrasso, Judy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Liberty Mutual Group Inc v. Mayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linus Mayes
Represented By: Trent Jared Moss
Represented By: Galen M Hair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Liberty Mutual Group Inc
Represented By: Judy Y Barrasso
Represented By: Madison A Sharko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?