Executive Strategies Corp v. Sabre Industries Inc
Plaintiff: Executive Strategies Corporation and Executive Strategies Corp
Defendant: Sabre Industries Inc
Case Number: 5:2020cv01067
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth E Foote
Referring Judge: Mark L Hornsby
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #13 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Reply Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Stay Arbitration filed by Executive Strategies Corp. (aty,Coleman, Ronald)
October 8, 2020 Filing 17 REPLY to Response to Motion re #13 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Sabre Industries Inc. (aty,Egan, Gillian)
September 30, 2020 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #13 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Memorandum in Support re #6 Plaintiff's Motion to Stay Arbitration filed by Executive Strategies Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Original Petition, #2 Exhibit B - Arbitration Demand, #3 Exhibit C - Agreement)(aty,Coleman, Ronald) Modified to add docket entry relationship on 10/1/2020 (Bunting, M).
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: Settlement Conference set for 10/23/2020 at 9:30 AM by video conference before Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 9/25/2020. (crt,Leday, A)
September 18, 2020 NOTICE of Corrective Action regarding #14 Notice of Motion Setting. Action taken: Disregard notice of motion setting issued 9/18/2020, record doc #14 . Briefing deadlines and page limitations set per the Minutes of court, record document #12 , as to #13 Motion to Dismiss, Motion to Compel. (crt,Keifer, K)
September 18, 2020 Filing 14 (VACATED) NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding: #13 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint MOTION to Compel Arbitration. Motions referred to Judge Elizabeth E Foote. (crt,Bunting, M) Modified on 9/21/2020 to reflect vacated, briefing deadlines previously issued per #12 Minutes (Keifer, K).
September 17, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint, MOTION to Compel Arbitration (Motion Ripe Deadline set for 9/17/2020.) by Sabre Industries Inc. Motions referred to Mark L Hornsby. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Exhibit Decl. of Tim Rossetti, #3 Exhibit Decl. of Catherine Cano)(aty,Egan, Gillian)
September 3, 2020 Filing 12 MINUTES for proceedings held before Judge Elizabeth E Foote: STATUS CONFERENCE held on 9/3/2020. By 9/17/2020, Sabre shall file its motion to compel. The memorandum in support of this motion shall both support Sabre's motion to compel and oppose Executive Strategies' pending motion, record doc. #6 . The page limit for this memorandum is 25 pages. By 10/1/2020, Executive Strategies shall file its opposition to Sabre's motion to compel. This memorandum has a 25-page limit and will also serve as a reply to Sabre's opposition to Executive Strategies' pending motion. Sabre's response shall be filed by 10/8/2020 and has a 10-page limit. Executive Strategies shall file a response that is no longer than 10 pages by 10/15/2020. See pdf for further briefing instructions. Signed by Judge Elizabeth E. Foote on 9/3/2020. (crt,Keifer, K)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant Sabre Industries, Inc.s time in which to answer is held in abeyance until such time as determined by the Court. Signed by Judge Elizabeth E Foote on 9/1/2020. (crt,Keifer, K)
September 1, 2020 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Executive Strategies Corp. (aty,Coleman, Ronald)
August 31, 2020 Motions Transferred regarding #9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer with opposition . Motions referred to Judge Elizabeth E Foote. (crt,Bunting, M)
August 31, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer with opposition by Sabre Industries Inc. Motions referred to Mark L Hornsby. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 8/31/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Egan, Gillian)
August 26, 2020 Filing 8 MINUTE ENTRY: District Judge Status Conference RESET for 9/3/2020 11:00 AM by phone before Judge Elizabeth E Foote. Signed by Judge Elizabeth E Foote on 8/26/2020. (crt,Bray, K)
August 19, 2020 Set Hearing: District Judge Status Conference set for 8/27/2020 at 1:30 PM by phone before Judge Elizabeth E Foote. (crt,Keifer, K)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMORANDUM ORDER denying #6 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. The Court hereby SETS a telephone status conference for 8/27/2020 at 1:30 p.m. to determine a briefing and hearing schedule for the resolution of the remaining issues raised by Plaintiff's motion. Call-in information will be emailed to counsel. Signed by Judge Elizabeth E Foote on 8/19/2020. (crt,Keifer, K)
August 18, 2020 Motions Transferred regarding #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Permanent Injunction MOTION to Stay Arbitration. Motions referred to Judge Elizabeth E Foote. (crt,Jones, P)
August 18, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Motion Ripe Deadline set for 8/18/2020.), MOTION for Permanent Injunction , MOTION to Stay Arbitration (Motion Ripe Deadline set for 8/18/2020.) by Executive Strategies Corp. Motions referred to Mark L Hornsby. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Supporting Affidavit, #3 Proposed order, #4 Exhibit A - Agreement, #5 Exhibit B - Petition, #6 Exhibit C - Consulting Agreement, #7 Exhibit D - Sabre Demand, #8 Exhibit E - Arbitration Demand, #9 Exhibit F - AAA Notice, #10 Exhibit G - State Court Proposed Motion)(aty,Coleman, Ronald) Modified on 8/18/2020 to edit text (Jones, P).
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 8/18/2020. (crt,Keller, J)
August 18, 2020 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Sabre Industries Inc identifying Corporate Parent K S B R Holdings Corp for Sabre Industries Inc. (aty,Egan, Gillian)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 8/18/2020. (crt,Bunting, M)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal, sent to Gillian G W Egan on behalf of Sabre Industries Inc. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 9/1/2020. (crt,Bunting, M)
August 17, 2020 Judge Elizabeth E Foote and Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby added. (crt,Bunting, M)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 26th JDC Bossier Parish, Case Number 162805 (Filing fee $400, receipt number ALAWDC-4360151) filed by Sabre Industries Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Ex. 1 - State Court Petition, #3 Ex. 2 - State Court Record, #4 Ex. 3 - Declaration of Lisa Harrison, #5 Ex. 4 - List of Counsel, #6 Ex. 5 - List of State Court Documents, #7 Ex. 6 - Certificate of Counsel)(Attorney Gillian G W Egan added to party Sabre Industries Inc(pty:dft))(aty,Egan, Gillian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Executive Strategies Corp v. Sabre Industries Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sabre Industries Inc
Represented By: Gillian G W Egan
Represented By: Susan F Desmond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Executive Strategies Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Executive Strategies Corp
Represented By: Lee H Ayres
Represented By: Ronald Chaz Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?