McKnight v. Goodwin et al
Plaintiff: Orlando McKnight
Defendant: Maj Young, Captain Kimbol, Johnie Adkins, M/Sgt Mott, Jerry Goodwin and Lt Col Malcom
Case Number: 5:2020cv01090
Filed: August 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: S Maurice Hicks
Referring Judge: Mark L Hornsby
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2020 Filing 13 EXHIBIT entitled "Exhibit L" re 1 Complaint, #7 Complaint by Orlando McKnight. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(crt,Haik, K)
October 5, 2020 Motions Transferred regarding #12 MOTION for Order to Show Cause, MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (crt,Haik, K)
October 5, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Order to Show Cause, MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Motion Ripe Deadline set for 10/5/2020.) by Orlando McKnight. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Envelope)(crt,Haik, K)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Initial Partial Filing Fee due in the amount of $4.79. It is further ordered that plaintiff make payments of 20 percent of income for preceding month until $350.00 has been paid in full. Clerk manually noticed Prison Accounts Officer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 9/23/2020. (crt,Haik, K)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER denying #9 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 9/23/2020. (crt,Haik, K)
September 18, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Orlando McKnight. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 9/18/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Envelope)(crt,Haik, K)
September 18, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Orlando McKnight. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 9/18/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Envelope)(crt,Haik, K) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/22/2020: #3 Proposed order) (Haik, K).
September 18, 2020 Filing 7 COMPLAINT against Orlando McKnight with Jury Demand filed by Orlando McKnight. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Envelope)(crt,Haik, K)
September 17, 2020 Filing 6 LETTER from Plaintiff to the Court regarding Administrative Remedy Procedures. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (crt,Thomas, T)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEMORANDUM ORDER: Plaintiff failed to submit documents on approved forms.Plaintiff failed to submit filing fee or a completed IFP application. ( Pro Se Deadline to comply with deficiency set for 9/24/2020). Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 8/25/2020. (Attachments: #1 1983 form, #2 ifp form)(crt,Haik, K)
August 24, 2020 Filing 4 PROPOSED MEMORANDUM ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 8/24/2020. (crt,Devillier, W)
August 20, 2020 CASE Assigned to Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr and Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (crt,Devillier, W)
August 20, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for Transfer by Orlando McKnight. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY to capture motion relief requested within pdf of Doc 1 Complaint. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 8/20/2020. (crt,Devillier, W) Modified to assign document number on 8/24/2020 (Devillier, W).
August 20, 2020 Filing 3 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued as to Johnie Adkins, Jerry Goodwin, Kimbol, Malcom, Mott, Young, submitted by Orlando McKnight. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(crt,Chavis, J)
August 20, 2020 Filing 2 DEFICIENT MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Orlando McKnight. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 8/20/2020. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(crt,Chavis, J). Motion/Application not on current approved form; need certification regarding prison account.
August 20, 2020 Filing 1 DEFICIENT COMPLAINT against Johnie Adkins, Jerry Goodwin, Kimbol, Malcom, Mott, Young with Jury Demand filed by Orlando McKnight. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Envelope)(crt,Chavis, J). Complaint not on approved form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McKnight v. Goodwin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maj Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Kimbol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnie Adkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M/Sgt Mott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Goodwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt Col Malcom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Orlando McKnight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?