McCall v. Caddo Parish
Plaintiff: DeMarcus C McCall, Jr
Defendant: Caddo Parish, D Jackson, Ben Raymond and Amy Mueller
Case Number: 5:2020cv01095
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth E Foote
Referring Judge: Mark L Hornsby
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MEMORANDUM ORDER: Directing plaintiff to amend complaint. Pro Se Response due by 11/16/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 10/15/2020. (crt,Haik, K)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER denying #3 Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 9/23/2020. (crt,Haik, K)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 9/23/2020. (crt,Haik, K) Modified to correct file date on 9/24/2020 (Haik, K).
September 18, 2020 Filing 6 COMPLAINT against Ben Raymond, Amy Mueller, D Jackson filed by DeMarcus C McCall, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(crt,Haik, K)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEMORANDUM ORDER: Plaintiff failed to submit documents on approved forms. ( Pro Se Deadline to comply with deficiency set for 9/25/2020). Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 8/26/2020. (Attachments: #1 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint)(crt,Thomas, T)
August 25, 2020 Filing 4 PROPOSED MEMORANDUM ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 8/25/2020. (crt,Devillier, W)
August 19, 2020 CASE Assigned to Judge Elizabeth E Foote and Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (crt,Devillier, W)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Default Judgment by DeMarcus C McCall, Jr. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 8/19/2020. (crt,Adams, K)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by DeMarcus C McCall, Jr. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 8/19/2020. (crt,Adams, K) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/22/2020: #1 Proposed order) (Haik, K).
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 DEFICIENT COMPLAINT against Caddo Parish filed by DeMarcus C McCall, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(crt,Adams, K). Complaint not on approved form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCall v. Caddo Parish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DeMarcus C McCall, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caddo Parish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ben Raymond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy Mueller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?