Ceasar v. Santander et al
Plaintiff: **Sanctioned/Barred* Ronnie R Ceasar
Defendant: Bob Giles, Santander, Santander Consumer U S A and Giles Nissan
Case Number: 5:2020cv01115
Filed: August 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: S Maurice Hicks
Referring Judge: Mark L Hornsby
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: Plaintiff has failed to pay the filing fees and costs as ordered by this Court in #10 Memorandum Order. ORDERED that #3 Complaint is hereby stricken from the record and this case closed. Signed by Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr on 9/29/2020. (crt,McDonnell, D)
September 28, 2020 Filing 11 PROPOSED ORDER re #3 Complaint, Referred to Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 9/28/2020. (crt,Mitchell, P)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MEMORANDUM ORDER: Ordered that Plaintiff pay fees and cost owed in 6:04-CV-00391 totaling $14,498.62 as well as the filing fees of $400.00 in this case within 30 days. Failure to pay the fees and costs will result in the complaint being stricken from the record and this case closed. Signed by Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr on 8/28/2020. (crt,McDonnell, D)
August 28, 2020 Filing 9 PROPOSED MEMORANDUM ORDER re #3 Complaint, Referred to Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 8/28/2020. (crt,Mitchell, P)
August 26, 2020 CASE Assigned to Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr and Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (crt,Thomas, T)
August 26, 2020 DIVISIONAL TRANSFER of Old Case Number 6:20-cv-1115 from Lafayette Division to Shreveport Division. New Case Number 5:20-cv-1115. (crt,Thomas, T)
August 26, 2020 Filing 8 DISTRICT CASE transferred in from District of Texas Northern; Case Number 3:20-cv-01065. Original file copy of transfer order and docket sheet received
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Transferring to Another District: Case transferred to Division of Western District of Louisiana. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Rebecca Rutherford on 8/26/2020) (axm) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/26/2020.]
May 18, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Motion To Proceed Without Payment UIA 1915 Act filed by Ronnie Ceasar. (hml) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/26/2020.]
May 15, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Ronnie Ceasar. (hml) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/26/2020.]
May 7, 2020 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:4. Thu May 7 10:13:41 CDT 2020 (crt) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/26/2020.]
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY AND ORDER: Ronnie Ceasar must address the following deficiency: The $400 fee has not been paid nor has a proper request to proceed in forma pauperis been submitted. Failure to comply with this order may lead to dismissal for failure to prosecute pursuant to FRCvP 41(b). Deadline to cure the deficiency is 30 days. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Rebecca Rutherford on 5/6/2020) (Attachments: #1 IFP Form) (mla) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/26/2020.]
April 29, 2020 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1, 2. Wed Apr 29 16:30:24 CDT 2020 (crt) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/26/2020.]
April 28, 2020 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Bob Giles, Giles Nissan, Santander Consumer USA, NFN Santender filed by Ronnie Ceasar. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (jmg) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/26/2020.]
April 28, 2020 Filing 2 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (jmg) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/26/2020.]
April 28, 2020 Filing 1 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Rutherford (see Special Order 3). Initiating documents received by mail. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (jmg) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/26/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ceasar v. Santander et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bob Giles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Santander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Santander Consumer U S A
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Giles Nissan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: **Sanctioned/Barred* Ronnie R Ceasar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?