Leger v. Shreveport et al
Plaintiff: James Allen Leger
Defendant: Adrian Perkins and City of Shreveport
Case Number: 5:2020cv01207
Filed: September 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Terry A Doughty
Referring Judge: Karen L Hayes
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2020 Filing 7 MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable: Mail sent to James Allen Leger, 2984 Old Plain Dealing Rd, Plain Dealing, LA 71064, re: #6 Judgment re Report and Recommendations, Order on Report and Recommendations returned marked: Return to Sender, Refused, Unable to Forward. (crt,Bunting, M)
October 13, 2020 Filing 6 JUDGMENT adopting #5 Report and Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge dismissing this matter without prejudice, for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 10/13/2020. (crt,Crawford, A)
September 22, 2020 Filing 5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #1 Complaint. IT IS RECOMMENDED that Plaintiff's complaint be DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction. Objections to R&R due by 10/6/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 9/22/2020. (crt,Leday, A)
September 22, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Adrian Perkins, City of Shreveport. (crt,Leday, A)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 9/22/2020. (crt,Leday, A)
September 18, 2020 Judge Terry A Doughty and Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes added. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. (crt,Bunting, M)
September 18, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by James Allen Leger. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 9/18/2020. (crt,Adams, K) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/21/2020: #1 Proposed order) (Bunting, M).
September 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Adrian Perkins, City of Shreveport filed by James Allen Leger. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Envelope)(crt,Adams, K) (Main Document 1 replaced on 9/21/2020) (Bunting, M). (Attachment 1 replaced on 9/21/2020) (Bunting, M).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leger v. Shreveport et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adrian Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Shreveport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Allen Leger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?