Bryant v. Herberts et al
Plaintiff: Glenda Bryant
Defendant: Transport Leasing/Contract Inc, Hudson Insurance Co, Edward L Herberts, Hudson Insurance Agency Inc, Transportation Leasing Corp, Hudson Insurance and X Y Z Insurance
Case Number: 5:2020cv01257
Filed: September 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Karen L Hayes
Referring Judge: S Maurice Hicks
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2020 Filing 9 RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER by Edward L Herberts, Hudson Insurance Co, Transportation Leasing Corp . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(aty,Clark, Layne)
October 7, 2020 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Hudson Insurance Co, Transportation Leasing Corp identifying Schilli Corp as Corporate Parent for Transportation Leasing Corp. (aty,Clark, Layne) Modified to add corporate parent on 10/7/2020 (Dunford, T).
September 30, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #6 Answer to Amended Complaint, sent to Layne A Clark, Jr on behalf of Transportation Leasing Corp. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 10/14/2020. (crt,Bunting, M)
September 30, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Amended Complaint, with Jury Demand by Edward L Herberts, Hudson Insurance Co, Transportation Leasing Corp.(Attorney Layne A Clark, Jr added to party Edward L Herberts(pty:dft), Attorney Layne A Clark, Jr added to party Transportation Leasing Corp(pty:dft))(aty,Clark, Layne)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 9/25/2020. (crt,Leday, A)
September 24, 2020 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Hudson Insurance Co. (aty,Clark, Layne)
September 24, 2020 Filing 3 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 9/24/2020. (crt,Mitchell, P)
September 24, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal, sent to Layne A Clark, Jr, Marjorie L Frazier on behalf of Hudson Insurance Co. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 10/8/2020. (crt,Mitchell, P)
September 23, 2020 CASE Assigned to Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr and Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. (crt,Mitchell, P)
September 23, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 39th JDC Red River Parish, Case Number 37650 (Filing fee $400, receipt number ALAWDC-4397686) filed by Hudson Insurance Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Attorney Layne A Clark, Jr added to party Hudson Insurance Co(pty:dft))(aty,Clark, Layne)
September 23, 2020 FIRST AMENDED AND SUPPLEMENTAL COMPLAINT against Hudson Insurance, Transportation Leasing Corp, X Y Z Insurance filed by Glenda Bryant in the 39th JDC, Parish of Red River. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: There is no PDF image with this entry. The PDF image can be found in Attachment #2 to Document #1 , Notice of Removal.(crt,Mitchell, P)
September 23, 2020 STATE COURT Service Returned Executed by Louisiana Long-Arm Statute. Hudson Insurance Agency Inc answer due 9/30/2020. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: There is no PDF image with this entry. The PDF image can be found in Attachment #3 to Document #1 , Notice of Removal. (crt,Mitchell, P)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bryant v. Herberts et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transport Leasing/Contract Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hudson Insurance Co
Represented By: Marjorie L Frazier
Represented By: Layne A Clark, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward L Herberts
Represented By: Layne A Clark, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hudson Insurance Agency Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transportation Leasing Corp
Represented By: Layne A Clark, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hudson Insurance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: X Y Z Insurance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glenda Bryant
Represented By: Lori C Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?