St Paul Fire & Marine Insurance Co v. Covington Co Inc et al
Plaintiff: St Paul Fire & Marine Insurance Co
Defendant: Delek Logistics Operating, LLC, Covington Co., Covington Co Inc and Delek Logistics Operating L L C
Case Number: 5:2020cv01458
Filed: November 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: S Maurice Hicks
Referring Judge: Mark L Hornsby
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2021 Filing 41 JUDGMENT granting #9 DelekLogistics Operating LLCs Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction. Delek LLCs alternative request to Stay inFavor of Pending State Action is hereby DENIED AS MOOT. The Clerk of Court isinstructed to close this case and all claims made are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUTPREJUDICE.Signed by Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr on 6/7/2021. (crt,McDonnell, D)
June 7, 2021 Filing 40 MEMORANDUM RULING re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Stay filed by Delek Logistics Operating L L C. Signed by Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr on 6/7/2021. (crt,McDonnell, D)
May 21, 2021 Filing 39 RESPONSE TO #34 Supplemental Memorandum re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Delek Logistics Operating L L C. (crt,Miletello, A)
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting #37 Motion for Leave to File Response. Signed by Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr on 5/21/2021. (crt,Miletello, A)
May 21, 2021 Motions Transferred regarding #37 MOTION for Leave to File Response to #34 Supplemental Memorandum. Motions referred to Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr. (crt,Miletello, A)
May 20, 2021 Filing 37 MOTION for Leave to File Response to #34 Supplemental Memorandum with consent by Delek Logistics Operating L L C. Motions referred to Mark L Hornsby. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 5/20/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed pleading, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Adams, W) Modified on 5/21/2021 to create docket entry relationship and modify docket text (Miletello, A).
May 14, 2021 Filing 36 SEALED DOCUMENT: Exhibit re #33 Supplemental Memorandum in Support of #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Delek Logistics Operating L L C. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(crt,Miletello, A)
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting #32 Motion to Seal Attached Document. Signed by Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr on 5/14/2021. (crt,Miletello, A)
May 14, 2021 Filing 34 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by St Paul Fire & Marine Insurance Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(aty,Elliott, Celeste) Modified on 5/14/2021 to more accurately describe pleading submitted and modify docket text (Miletello, A).
May 14, 2021 Filing 33 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM in Support re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Delek Logistics Operating L L C. (aty,Zentner, McLaurine) Modified on 5/14/2021 to modify docket text (Miletello, A).
May 13, 2021 Motions Transferred regarding #32 MOTION to Seal Attached Document. Motions referred to Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr. (crt,Miletello, A)
May 13, 2021 Filing 32 MOTION to Seal Attached Document by Delek Logistics Operating L L C. Motions referred to Mark L Hornsby. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 5/13/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Proposed order)(aty,Adams, W)
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 CONFIDENTIALITY AND PROTECTIVE ORDER. Note the court's modification to paragraph 12 re: Filing Under Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 5/3/2021. (crt,Miletello, A)
April 29, 2021 Filing 30 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Delek Logistics Operating L L C, St Paul Fire & Marine Insurance Co, Covington Co Inc. Motions referred to Mark L Hornsby. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 4/29/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Adams, W) Modified on 4/29/2021 to add filers (Miletello, A).
March 29, 2021 Filing 29 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings for Oral Argument - Motion to Dismiss (Rec. Doc. 9) held on 3/12/2021 before Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks Jr. Court Reporter/Transcriber Marie Moran Runyon, Telephone number (318)934-4756. Total pages: 56. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter. Redaction Request due 4/22/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/3/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/1/2021. (crt,Runyon, M)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER that limited jurisdictional discovery shall take place in this matter on the specific issue of the citizenship of the publicly traded members of Delek, LP. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that any and all disclosures shall attempt to protect the identities of these members as best as possible. The parties shall have SIXTY (60) DAYS to comply with this order and file any additional briefing that may be necessary for purposes of #9 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Signed by Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr on 3/15/2021. (crt,Miletello, A)
March 12, 2021 Filing 27 MINUTES for proceedings held before Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr: MOTION HEARING held on 3/12/2021 re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Stay filed by Delek Logistics Operating L L C. (Court Reporter: Marie Moran Runyon) (crt,McDonnell, D)
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #25 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Michael A Warley for Delek Logistics Operating L L C. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 3/3/2021. (crt,Miletello, A)
March 2, 2021 Filing 25 MOTION for Michael A. Warley to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-4591886) by Delek Logistics Operating L L C. Motions referred to Mark L Hornsby. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 3/2/2021. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing)(aty,Adams, W) Modified on 3/3/2021 to indicate Proposed order contained within motion (Miletello, A).
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #19 Motion for Hearing. Oral argument is set for 3/12/2021 at 10:00 AM in Shreveport, Courtroom 1 before Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks Jr.Signed by Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr on 2/9/2021. (crt,McDonnell, D)
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #22 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Tamara D Bruno for Delek Logistics Operating L L C. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 2/4/2021. (crt,Miletello, A)
February 3, 2021 Filing 22 MOTION for Tamara D. Bruno to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-4560834) by Delek Logistics Operating L L C. Motions referred to Mark L Hornsby. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 2/3/2021. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Adams, W)
January 25, 2021 Filing 21 REPLY to Response to Motion re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Stay filed by Delek Logistics Operating L L C. (aty,Adams, W)
January 13, 2021 Motions Transferred regarding #19 MOTION for Oral Argument re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, MOTION to Stay. Motions referred to Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr. (crt,Miletello, A)
January 13, 2021 Filing 20 PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT by St Paul Fire & Marine Insurance Co re #19 Motion for Hearing,. (aty,Elliott, Celeste)
January 12, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION for Oral Argument re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, MOTION to Stay by St Paul Fire & Marine Insurance Co. Motions referred to Mark L Hornsby. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 1/12/2021. (aty,Elliott, Celeste) Modified on 1/12/2021 to modify docket entry relationship and modify docket text (Miletello, A). Modified on 1/13/2021 to indicate #20 Proposed Order submitted separately (Miletello, A).
January 12, 2021 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Stay filed by St Paul Fire & Marine Insurance Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit A continued, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(aty,Elliott, Celeste) Modified on 1/12/2021 to modify docket text (Miletello, A).
December 29, 2020 Filing 17 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Covington Co Inc. (aty,Jones, Pamela)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Stay. Responses due by 1/12/2021. Replies due by 1/25/2021. Signed by Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr on 12/18/2020. (crt,Miletello, A)
December 17, 2020 Motions Transferred regarding #15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Stay. Motions referred to Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr. (crt,Miletello, A)
December 17, 2020 Filing 15 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Stay with consent by St Paul Fire & Marine Insurance Co. Motions referred to Mark L Hornsby. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 12/17/2020. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of No Opposition, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Guichet, Joseph) Modified on 12/17/2020 to modify docket text (Miletello, A).
December 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint until 14 days following this Courts ruling on #9 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 12/16/2020. (crt,Miletello, A)
December 15, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #12 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer sent to Pamela R Jones on behalf of Covington Co Inc. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 12/29/2020. (crt,Miletello, A)
December 15, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, with consent sought but not yet obtained by Covington Co Inc. Motions referred to Mark L Hornsby. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 12/15/2020. (Attachments: #1 Text of proposed order)(Attorney Pamela R Jones added to party Covington Co Inc(pty:dft))(aty,Jones, Pamela)
December 14, 2020 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Delek Logistics Operating L L C identifying Corporate Parents, Delek Logistics Partners L P, Delek Logistics G P L L C, Delek U S Holdings Inc for Delek Logistics Operating L L C. (aty,Adams, W) Modified on 12/14/2020 to modify docket text (Miletello, A).
December 10, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding: #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Motion to Dismiss or Stay. Motions referred to Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr. (crt,Miletello, A)
December 10, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and MOTION to Stay by Delek Logistics Operating L L C. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Proposed order, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7)(Attorney W Michael Adams added to party Delek Logistics Operating L L C(pty:dft))(aty,Adams, W). Added MOTION to Stay on 12/10/2020 (Miletello, A).
December 1, 2020 NOTICE of Corrective Action to Celeste D Elliott on behalf of St Paul Fire & Marine Insurance Co regarding #8 Summons Returned Executed. Action taken: Docket text modified to reflect correct service date 11/24/2020 and answer due date 12/15/2020 as an incorrect service date was entered at the time of e-filing. (crt,Miletello, A)
December 1, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by St Paul Fire & Marine Insurance Co. Covington Co Inc served on 11/24/2020, answer due 12/15/2020. (aty,Elliott, Celeste) Modified on 12/1/2020 to correct service and answer deadlines (Miletello, A).
December 1, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by St Paul Fire & Marine Insurance Co. Delek Logistics Operating L L C served on 11/16/2020, answer due 12/7/2020. (aty,Elliott, Celeste)
November 19, 2020 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1332. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 11/19/2020. (crt,Rider, M)
November 18, 2020 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against Covington Co Inc, Delek Logistics Operating L L C filed by St Paul Fire & Marine Insurance Co.(aty,Elliott, Celeste)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MEMORANDUM ORDER: St. Paul is directed to file an amended complaint by 12/2/2020that specifically alleges its form of entity. Given the references in the cited decisions to St. Paul being a citizen of Minnesota rather than Connecticut, counsel should ensure that the factual allegations regarding St. Pauls citizenship are accurate. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 11/17/2020. (crt,Miletello, A)
November 17, 2020 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by St Paul Fire & Marine Insurance Co identifying Corporate Parent Travelers Companies Inc for St Paul Fire & Marine Insurance Co. (aty,Elliott, Celeste)
November 16, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Covington Co Inc, Delek Logistics Operating L L C. (crt,Miletello, A)
November 13, 2020 CASE Assigned to Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr and Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (crt,Miletello, A)
November 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT against Covington Co Inc, Delek Logistics Operating L L C (Filing fee $400, receipt number ALAWDC-4467749) filed by St Paul Fire & Marine Insurance Co. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Celeste D Elliott added to party St Paul Fire & Marine Insurance Co(pty:pla))(aty,Elliott, Celeste) Modified on 11/13/2020 to modify docket text (Miletello, A).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: St Paul Fire & Marine Insurance Co v. Covington Co Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: St Paul Fire & Marine Insurance Co
Represented By: Joseph P Guichet
Represented By: Celeste D Elliott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delek Logistics Operating, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Covington Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Covington Co Inc
Represented By: Philip E Downer, III
Represented By: Pamela R Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delek Logistics Operating L L C
Represented By: W Michael Adams
Represented By: McLaurine Hall Zentner
Represented By: Michael A Warley
Represented By: Tamara Dawn Bruno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?