Baxter v. Social Security
Plaintiff: Crystal Baxter
Defendant: U S Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 5:2020cv01549
Filed: December 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth E Foote
Referring Judge: Mark L Hornsby
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2021 Filing 10 SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER issued. Transcript due 3/29/2021. (crt,Bunting, M)
January 14, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed in Social Security Case by Crystal Baxter. U S Commissioner of Social Security served on 12/28/2020, answer due 3/29/2021; Office of General Counsel Social Security Administration served on 12/28/2020, answer due 3/29/2021. Service made upon: U S Attorney;U S Attorney General;Commissioner of SSA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Envelope)(crt,Bunting, M)
January 14, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Additional Medical Information by Crystal Baxter (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope)(crt,Bunting, M)
January 14, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Change of Address by Crystal Baxter (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(crt,Bunting, M) Modified to correct file date on 1/15/2021 (Bunting, M).
December 21, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of of Consent to Receive Notice and Service Electronically by Crystal Baxter (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(crt,Bunting, M)
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEMORANDUM ORDER: This order is issued to explain to Plaintiff the obligations that must be met to obtain a decision from the court. Once Plaintiff files evidence of service, the Clerk of Court will issue a Scheduling Order and a Deadlines Worksheet. Plaintiff must keep the court informed of a current address. If Plaintiff should have a change in address, Plaintiff must notify the Clerk of Court in writing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 12/10/2020. (crt,Miletello, A)
December 9, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to US Attorney, US Attorney General and Comm of Social Security. (crt,Bunting, M)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 12/9/2020. (crt,Bunting, M)
December 4, 2020 Judge Elizabeth E Foote and Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby added. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (crt,Bunting, M)
December 4, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Crystal Baxter. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 12/4/2020. (crt,Chavis, J) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/9/2020: #1 Proposed order) (Bunting, M).
December 4, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against U S Commissioner of Social Security filed by Crystal Baxter. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Second Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibits)(crt,Chavis, J)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baxter v. Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U S Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crystal Baxter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?