Robinson et al v. Shreveport et al
Plaintiff: Chico T Bell and Damon L Robinson
Defendant: Mark Ordoyne, Brandon Walker, Aaron Jaudon, David Francis, City of Shreveport, William Eisenhour, D'andre Jackson, Christopher McConnell and Treveion Brooks
Case Number: 5:2021cv00141
Filed: January 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Karen L Hayes
Referring Judge: S Maurice Hicks
2 Judge: Kayla D McClusky
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding: #4 MOTION to Dismiss For failure to State a Claim. Motions referred to Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr. (crt,Crick, S)
March 5, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Treveoin Brooks, William Eisenhour, David Francis, D'andre Jackson, Aaron Jaudon, Christopher McConnell, Mark Ordoyne, City of Shreveport, Brandon Walker. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Proposed order)(Attorney Edwin H Byrd, III added to party Treveion Brooks(pty:dft), William Eisenhour(pty:dft), David Francis(pty:dft), D'andre Jackson(pty:dft), Aaron Jaudon(pty:dft), Christopher McConnell(pty:dft), Mark Ordoyne(pty:dft), City of Shreveport(pty:dft), Brandon Walker(pty:dft))(aty,Byrd, Edwin) Modified on 3/8/2021 to modify docket text. (Crick, S).
February 23, 2021 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY issued by the Clerk. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky. Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes no longer assigned to case. Any pending motions and deadlines or hearings previously set before Magistrate Judge Hayes are hereby reset before Magistrate Judge McClusky. All future filings should bear the name of the new judge assignment. Approved by Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr on 2/23/2021. (crt,Reeves, T)
January 19, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Treveion Brooks, William Eisenhour, David Francis, D'andre Jackson, Aaron Jaudon, Christopher McConnell, Mark Ordoyne, City of Shreveport, Brandon Walker. (crt,Miletello, A)
January 19, 2021 CASE Assigned to Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr and Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. (crt,Miletello, A)
January 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against City of Shreveport, Treveion Brooks, William Eisenhour, D'andre Jackson, Aaron Jaudon, Mark Ordoyne, Brandon Walker, David Francis, Christopher McConnell with Jury Demand (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-4540746) filed by Damon Robinson, Chico T Bell. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Ernest Harold Gilliam, III added to party chico t bell(pty:pet))(aty,Gilliam, Ernest) Modified on 1/19/2021 to modify docket text (Miletello, A).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robinson et al v. Shreveport et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Ordoyne
Represented By: Edwin H Byrd, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon Walker
Represented By: Edwin H Byrd, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaron Jaudon
Represented By: Edwin H Byrd, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Francis
Represented By: Edwin H Byrd, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Shreveport
Represented By: Edwin H Byrd, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Eisenhour
Represented By: Edwin H Byrd, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D'andre Jackson
Represented By: Edwin H Byrd, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher McConnell
Represented By: Edwin H Byrd, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Treveion Brooks
Represented By: Edwin H Byrd, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chico T Bell
Represented By: Ernest Harold Gilliam, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Damon L Robinson
Represented By: Ernest Harold Gilliam, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?