Bohannon v. Kansas City Southern Railway Co
Plaintiff: Dustin Bohannon
Defendant: The Kansas City Southern Railway Company and Kansas City Southern Railway Co
Case Number: 5:2021cv00805
Filed: March 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth E Foote
Referring Judge: Kayla D McClusky
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45 U.S.C. ยง 51
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 24, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Vacation for Bristol Baxley by Dustin Bohannon (aty,Baxley, Bristol)
May 24, 2021 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY: At the request of counsel, the Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference that previously was set for June 23, is hereby continued until July 22, 2021, at 10:30 AM, by telephone, before Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky. Plaintiff's counsel shall initiate the call to include all parties and the court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky on 5/24/2021. (crt,Barkley, B)
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 6/23/2021 at 1:30 PM by phone before Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky. Rule 26 Conference between parties to take place before 6/9/2021. Initial Disclosures exchanged by 6/16/2021. Rule 26 Report due by 6/16/2021.. (crt,Leday, A)
May 20, 2021 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1331. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky on 5/20/2021. (jud,McClusky, Kayla)
April 19, 2021 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Kansas City Southern Railway Co identifying Corporate Parent Kansas City Southern Railway Co for Kansas City Southern Railway Co. (aty,Gilliam, Bobby)
April 19, 2021 Filing 3 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Kansas City Southern Railway Co.(Attorney Bobby S Gilliam added to party Kansas City Southern Railway Co(pty:dft))(aty,Gilliam, Bobby)
March 29, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Kansas City Southern Railway Co. (crt,Thomas, T)
March 26, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kansas City Southern Railway Co with Jury Demand (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-4620512) filed by Dustin Bohannon. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Bristol Alan Baxley added to party Dustin Bohannon(pty:pla))(aty,Baxley, Bristol) Modified on 3/26/2021 to modify docket text. (Crick, S).
March 26, 2021 CASE Assigned to Judge Elizabeth E Foote and Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky. (crt,Crick, S)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bohannon v. Kansas City Southern Railway Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Kansas City Southern Railway Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kansas City Southern Railway Co
Represented By: Holly C Allen
Represented By: Paul Michael Davis, Jr
Represented By: Bobby S Gilliam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dustin Bohannon
Represented By: Bristol Alan Baxley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?