USA v. McMichael et al
Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: James C McMichael and Red River Bank
Case Number: 5:2021cv01609
Filed: June 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Terry A Doughty
Referring Judge: S Maurice Hicks
2 Judge: Mark L Hornsby
3 Judge: Kayla D McClusky
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7401
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 4, 2021 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for process Red River Bank served on 7/26/21, Answer due 8/16/2021 filed by USA. (aty,Brownell, Aaron) Modified to add service date and answer due date on 8/4/2021 (Bunting, M).
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr recused. Case reassigned to Judge Terry A Doughty for all further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr on 6/15/2021. (crt,Bunting, M)
June 16, 2021 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY issued by the Clerk. In accordance with Standing Order 1.62, this matter is hereby reassigned. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky. Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby no longer assigned to case. All future filings should bear the name of the new judge assignment.(crt,Reeves, T)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Mark L. Hornsby is hereby recused from this case. Referred to Chief Judge for reassignment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 6/15/2021. (crt,Rider, M)
June 11, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to James C McMichael, Red River Bank. (crt,Bunting, M)
June 11, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against James C McMichael, Red River Bank (Filed on behalf of USA - Filing Fee not required) filed by United States. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Proposed summons/writ, #3 Proposed summons/writ, #4 Exhibit Notices of Federal Tax Lien(s))(Attorney Aaron Brownell added to party United States(pty:pla))(aty,Brownell, Aaron)
June 11, 2021 Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr and Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby added. (crt,Bunting, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. McMichael et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James C McMichael
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Red River Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Edwin Henry Byrd, IV
Represented By: Aaron Brownell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?