Vailes et al v. Fresenius Medical Care Louisiana Dialysis Group L L C
Plaintiff: Edward Vailes, Valerie Vailes and Thomas Vailes
Defendant: Fresenius Medical Care Louisiana Dialysis Group L L C, Bio Medical Applications of Louisiana L L C doing business as North Shreveport Dialysis Center also known as Fresenius Kidney Care North Shreveport, Fresenius Medical Care Louisiana Dialysis Group L L C doing business as Fresenius Kidney Care North Shreveport and Fresenius Kidney Care North Shreveport
Case Number: 5:2021cv02247
Filed: July 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth E Foote
Referring Judge: Mark L Hornsby
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 1/23/2023 at 9:00 AM in Shreveport, Courtroom 2 before Judge Elizabeth E Foote. Pretrial Conference set for 12/15/2022 at 1:30 PM in chambers before Judge Elizabeth E Foote. Pretrial Order due by 12/8/2022. Plaintiffs Witness List due by 2/24/2022. Defendants witness list is due seven(7) days after receipt of plaintiffs list. Plaintiffs Expert Info/Reports due by 5/24/2022. Defendants Expert Info/Reports due by 6/24/2022. Discovery deadline 4/24/2022. Compel discovery 4/24/2022. Expert Depositions due by 7/24/2022. Dispositive Motions due by 8/24/2022. Daubert Motions due by 8/15/2022. Conference/Meeting of counsel to prepare pretrial order to be held by 11/3/2022. Motions in Limine due by 12/1/2022. Trial Brief/Pretrial Submissions due by 1/13/2023. Electronic Exhibits due by 1/13/2023. Trial Depositions due by 1/13/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 9/17/2021. (crt,Keller, J)
September 17, 2021 Filing 24 MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby: Telephone SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 9/17/2021. Due to the large number of healthcare providers to be deposed, the parties requested an extended schedule. (crt,Keller, J)
September 16, 2021 Filing 23 ANSWER to #21 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Bio Medical Applications of Louisiana L L C, Fresenius Medical Care Louisiana Dialysis Group L L C.(aty,Lambert, Amy)
September 9, 2021 Filing 22 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Bio Medical Applications of Louisiana L L C. (crt,Bunting, M)
September 9, 2021 Filing 21 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Bio Medical Applications of Louisiana L L C filed by Edward Vailes, Thomas Vailes, Valerie Vailes.(crt,Bunting, M)
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #18 Motion to Amend/Correct Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 9/8/2021. (crt,Bunting, M)
September 8, 2021 Filing 19 ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY: The telephone Scheduling Conference originally set for 9/13/21 has been reset for 9/17/2021 at 10:30 AM. Dial-in instructions will be emailed to all counsel of record. Trial counsel for each party must participate. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 9/8/2021. (crt,Rider, M)
September 7, 2021 Filing 18 Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct with consent Corrective Document by Edward Vailes, Thomas Vailes, Valerie Vailes. Motions referred to Mark L Hornsby. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 9/7/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order, #2 Proposed pleading)(aty,Kosmitis, Georgia)
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Bond. Signed by Judge Elizabeth E Foote on 9/7/2021. (Attachments: #1 Bond) (crt,Bunting, M)
September 7, 2021 Filing 16 JOINT RULE 26(f) Report by Bio Medical Applications of Louisiana L L C, Edward Vailes, Thomas Vailes, Valerie Vailes. (aty,Kosmitis, Georgia) Modified filers on 9/7/2021 (Bunting, M).
September 7, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Deficiency to Georgia P Kosmitis on behalf of Edward Vailes, Thomas Vailes, Valerie Vailes regarding #14 Amended Complaint,. Reason: Leave of court is required for the filing of this amended pleading. If this filing is one to which a responsive pleading is required, leave of court is required to file 21 days after service of the response or a motion under Rule 12(b)(e)(3) or (f). Other amendments require consent or leave of court. Please refer to Fed.R.Civ.P. 15(a) for further information regarding requirements for amendment of pleadings. (crt,Bunting, M)
September 3, 2021 Filing 14 DOCUMENT RESUBMITTED IN ITS ENTIRETY - FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Bio Medical Applications of Louisiana L L C, Fresenius Medical Care Louisiana Dialysis Group L L C filed by Edward Vailes, Thomas Vailes, Valerie Vailes.(aty,Kosmitis, Georgia) Modified to reflect deficient status on 9/7/2021 (Bunting, M). Modified to reflect resubmitted on 9/7/2021 (Bunting, M). See #18 .
September 3, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for Bond by Edward Vailes, Thomas Vailes, Valerie Vailes. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 9/3/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order, #2 Exhibit Surety Bond)(aty,Kosmitis, Georgia)
August 19, 2021 Filing 12 RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER by Fresenius Medical Care Louisiana Dialysis Group L L C . (aty,Smith, Savannah)
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ELECTRONICALLY ISSUED IN ERROR - CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 1/22/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(crt,Bunting, M) Modified to reflect electronically issued in error on 8/16/2021 (Bunting, M).
August 16, 2021 Filing 10 SECOND NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement, re: #5 Notice of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement, sent to Amy C Lambert on behalf of Bio Medical Applications of Louisiana L L C. Show Cause Response due by 8/30/2021. (crt,Mitchell, P)
August 16, 2021 NOTICE of Corrective Action regarding #11 Order,. Action taken: Modified docket text to reflect electronically filed in error. (crt,Bunting, M)
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 9/13/2021 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. Rule 26 Conference between parties to take place before 8/30/2021. Initial Disclosures exchanged by 9/6/2021. Rule 26 Report due by 9/6/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 8/2/2021. (crt,Keller, J)
August 2, 2021 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1332. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 8/2/2021. (crt,Rider, M)
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 8/2/2021. (crt,Keller, J)
July 30, 2021 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Fresenius Medical Care Louisiana Dialysis Group L L C identifying Corporate Parent National Medical Care Inc, Corporate Parent Bio-Medical Applications of Louisiana L L C, Corporate Parent Fresenius Medical Care Holdings Inc, Corporate Parent Bio-Medical Applications of Maryland Inc, Corporate Parent Bio-Medical Applications Management Co Inc for Fresenius Medical Care Louisiana Dialysis Group L L C. (aty,Lambert, Amy)
July 30, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #2 Answer to Complaint, sent to Amy C Lambert on behalf of Bio Medical Applications of Louisiana L L C. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 8/13/2021. (crt,Bunting, M)
July 30, 2021 Filing 4 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 7/30/2021. (crt,Bunting, M)
July 30, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal, sent to Amy C Lambert on behalf of Fresenius Medical Care Louisiana Dialysis Group L L C. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 8/13/2021. (crt,Bunting, M)
July 30, 2021 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses by Fresenius Medical Care Louisiana Dialysis Group L L C.(aty,Lambert, Amy)
July 29, 2021 Judge Elizabeth E Foote and Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby added. (crt,Bunting, M)
July 29, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 1st JDC Caddo Parish, Case Number 631020 (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-4756661) filed by Fresenius Medical Care Louisiana Dialysis Group L L C. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit Ex. A, Certified Copy of 1st JDC Suit Record, #3 Exhibit Ex. B, Notice of Removal to State Court, #4 Exhibit Ex. C, Notice of Removal to Adverse Parties)(Attorney Amy C Lambert added to party Fresenius Medical Care Louisiana Dialysis Group L L C(pty:dft))(aty,Lambert, Amy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vailes et al v. Fresenius Medical Care Louisiana Dialysis Group L L C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Vailes
Represented By: Georgia P Kosmitis
Represented By: Avery Elizabeth Bond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valerie Vailes
Represented By: Georgia P Kosmitis
Represented By: Avery Elizabeth Bond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Vailes
Represented By: Georgia P Kosmitis
Represented By: Avery Elizabeth Bond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fresenius Medical Care Louisiana Dialysis Group L L C
Represented By: Amy C Lambert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bio Medical Applications of Louisiana L L C doing business as North Shreveport Dialysis Center also known as Fresenius Kidney Care North Shreveport
Represented By: Amy C Lambert
Represented By: L Adam Thames
Represented By: Savannah W Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fresenius Medical Care Louisiana Dialysis Group L L C doing business as Fresenius Kidney Care North Shreveport
Represented By: Amy C Lambert
Represented By: L Adam Thames
Represented By: Savannah W Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fresenius Kidney Care North Shreveport
Represented By: Amy C Lambert
Represented By: L Adam Thames
Represented By: Savannah W Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?