Brown et al v. P M G O P C O - Washington L L C et al
Plaintiff: Jeremiah Green and Erica Brown
Defendant: PMG OPCO-Washington, LLC, Kourtney Brownlee and P M G O P C O - Washington L L C doing business as Booker T Washington Skilled Nursing & Rehabilitation
Case Number: 5:2021cv02406
Filed: August 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: S Maurice Hicks
Referring Judge: Mark L Hornsby
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2021 Filing 22 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority by Erica Brown, Jeremiah Green re #16 MOTION to Remand (aty,Salim, Robert)
September 22, 2021 Filing 21 RESPONSE to Motion re #16 MOTION to Remand filed by Kourtney Brownlee, P M G O P C O - Washington L L C. (aty,Raney, Ronald)
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Teresa Pike Tomlinson for Kourtney Brownlee, and P M G O P C O - Washington L L C. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 9/21/2021. (crt,Keller, J)
September 17, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION for Teresa Pike Tomlinson to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-4823021) by Kourtney Brownlee, P M G O P C O - Washington L L C. Motions referred to Mark L Hornsby. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 9/17/2021. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Raney, Ronald)
September 9, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding: #16 MOTION to Remand . Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (crt,Jones, P)
September 9, 2021 Filing 17 RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER by Kourtney Brownlee, P M G O P C O - Washington L L C . (aty,Raney, Ronald)
September 9, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION to Remand by Erica Brown, Jeremiah Green. Motions referred to Mark L Hornsby. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 9/9/2021. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief)(aty,Salim, Robert)
August 18, 2021 Filing 15 AMENDED MEMORANDUM in Support re #10 First MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Kourtney Brownlee, P M G O P C O - Washington L L C. (crt,Jones, P)
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #12 Motion to Amend Memorandum re: #10 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr on 8/18/2021. (crt,Jones, P)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ELECTRONIC ORDER: This case was removed based on an assertion of federal question under the PREP Act, and the defendant filed a motion to dismiss. Plaintiff intends to file a motion to remand that challenges subject matter jurisdiction. The court must resolve jurisdictional issues before it addresses the merits. Accordingly, and with the consent of counsel, the deadline to file opposition to any pending motion to dismiss is extended until 21 days after the district judge enters a decision on subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 8/17/2021. (crt,Rider, M)
August 17, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION to Amend/Correct with consent Memorandum by Kourtney Brownlee, P M G O P C O - Washington L L C. Motions referred to Mark L Hornsby. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 8/17/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Memorandum / Brief, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Raney, Ronald) Modified on 8/17/2021 to edit text (Jones, P).
August 17, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding: #10 First MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Motions referred to Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr. (crt,Jones, P)
August 17, 2021 Motions Transferred regarding #12 First MOTION to Amend/Correct with consent Memorandum. Motions referred to Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr. (crt,Jones, P)
August 16, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss, MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Kourtney Brownlee, P M G O P C O - Washington L L C. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief)(aty,Raney, Ronald). Added MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim, MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction on 8/17/2021 (Jones, P). Modified on 8/17/2021 to add events and edit text (Jones, P). Modified on 8/18/2021 to indicate SEE #15 Amended Memorandum (Jones, P).
August 12, 2021 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by P M G O P C O - Washington L L C identifying Corporate Parent SDB Holdings, LLC for P M G O P C O - Washington L L C. (aty,Raney, Ronald)
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ELECTRONIC ORDER. Case reassigned to Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr and Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. Judge Donald E Walter, Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky no longer assigned to case. All future filings should bear the name of the new judge assignment. Approved by Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr on 8/12/2021. (crt,Reeves, T)
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER of case requiring reassignment due to clerical error. Referred to Chief Judge for reassignment. Signed by Judge Donald E Walter on 8/11/2021. (crt,Jones, P)
August 10, 2021 Filing 6 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Kourtney Brownlee, P M G O P C O - Washington L L C. Amendment to #1 Notice of Removal,, Supplement. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit E)(aty,Raney, Ronald)
August 10, 2021 Filing 5 PROPOSED ORDER Referred to Judge Donald E Walter. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 8/10/2021. (crt,Jones, P)
August 10, 2021 Filing 4 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 8/10/2021. (crt,Jones, P)
August 10, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal, sent to Ronald E Raney on behalf of P M G O P C O - Washington L L C. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 8/24/2021. (crt,Jones, P)
August 10, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Kourtney Brownlee, P M G O P C O - Washington L L C. (aty,Raney, Ronald)
August 9, 2021 CASE Assigned to Judge Donald E Walter and Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky. (crt,Jones, P)
August 9, 2021 STATE COURT Service Returned Executed. Kourtney Brownlee answer due 8/16/2021; P M G O P C O - Washington L L C answer due 8/16/2021. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: PDF IMAGE CAN BE FOUND IN ATTACHMENT #3 TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL. (crt,Jones, P)
August 9, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 1st JDC Caddo Parish, Case Number 630075-B (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-4769106) filed by Kourtney Brownlee, P M G O P C O - Washington L L C. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Petition for Damages, #3 Citations of Service, #4 Jurisprudential Authority, #5 Affidavit of Kourtney Brownlee)(Attorney Ronald E Raney added to party Kourtney Brownlee, P M G O P C O - Washington L L C(pty:dft))(aty,Raney, Ronald) (Attachment 1 replaced on 8/10/2021) (Jones, P). Modified on 8/10/2021 to edit text (Jones, P). Modified on 8/10/2021 to indicate SEE #2 Civil Cover Sheet (Jones, P).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown et al v. P M G O P C O - Washington L L C et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremiah Green
Represented By: Ronald J Miciotto
Represented By: Robert E Piper, Jr
Represented By: Robert L Salim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erica Brown
Represented By: Ronald J Miciotto
Represented By: Robert E Piper, Jr
Represented By: Robert L Salim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PMG OPCO-Washington, LLC
Represented By: Ronald E Raney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kourtney Brownlee
Represented By: Ronald E Raney
Represented By: Teresa Pike Tomlinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P M G O P C O - Washington L L C doing business as Booker T Washington Skilled Nursing & Rehabilitation
Represented By: Ronald E Raney
Represented By: Teresa Pike Tomlinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?