Brown v. Pouncy et al
Plaintiff: Jarius Brown
Defendant: Javarrea Pouncy, John Doe #1 and John Doe #2
Case Number: 5:2021cv03415
Filed: September 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth E Foote
Referring Judge: Mark L Hornsby
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #2 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Michael X Imbroscio for Jarius Brown. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 9/30/2021. (crt,Thomas, T)
September 29, 2021 Filing 8 CORRECTIVE DOCUMENT entitled Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission filed by Jarius Brown regarding #2 MOTION for Michael X. Imbroscio to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-4832114) . (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Snider, Megan)
September 29, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #2 MOTION for Michael X. Imbroscio to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-4832114). Motion Ripe Deadline set for 9/24/2021. (crt,Thomas, T)
September 28, 2021 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1331. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 9/28/2021. (crt,Rider, M)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Nora Sam Ahmed for Jarius Brown. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 9/27/2021. (crt,Keller, J)
September 27, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Deficiency to Megan E Snider on behalf of Jarius Brown regarding #2 MOTION for Michael X. Imbroscio to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-4832114). Reason: Applying attorney must sign. No s/ signature accepted. (crt,Thomas, T)
September 24, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Javarrea Pouncy. (crt,Miletello, A)
September 24, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Nora S. Ahmed to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-4832185) by Jarius Brown. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 9/24/2021. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing, #2 Declaration of Nora Ahmed, #3 Proposed order)(aty,Snider, Megan)
September 24, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Michael X. Imbroscio to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-4832114) by Jarius Brown. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 9/24/2021. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Snider, Megan) Modified to reflect deficient status on 9/27/2021 (Thomas, T). Modified to remove deficient status and indicate doc #8 has applying counsel's signature on 9/29/2021 (Thomas, T).
September 24, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Javarrea Pouncy, John Doe #1, John Doe #2 with Jury Demand (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-4832080) filed by Jarius Brown. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Proposed summons/writ)(Attorney Megan E Snider added to party Jarius Brown(pty:pla))(aty,Snider, Megan) Modified docket text on 9/24/2021 (Miletello, A).
September 24, 2021 CASE Assigned to Judge Elizabeth E Foote and Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (crt,Miletello, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Pouncy et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jarius Brown
Represented By: Megan E Snider
Represented By: Michael X Imbroscio
Represented By: Nora Sam Ahmed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Javarrea Pouncy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?