Khamoush et al v. Mayorkas et al
Plaintiff: Nima Seyed Khamoush and Samira Jahangirzadeharekhlou
Defendant: Alejandro Mayorkas, Tracy Renaud and Merrick Garland
Case Number: 5:2021cv03690
Filed: October 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 0701
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2021 Filing 14 DISTRICT CASE transferred in from District of District of Columbia; Case Number 1:21-cv-01239. Original file copy of transfer order and docket sheet received
October 8, 2021 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM OPINION granting Defendants' Consent Motion to Transfer and Extend Time. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 10/08/2021. (lcrc2) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/19/2021.]
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #8 Defendants' Consent Motion to Transfer and Extend Time. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 10/08/2021. (lcrc2) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/19/2021.]
October 8, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Transfer due by 10/8/2021. (zgdf) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/19/2021.]
October 8, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Transfer due by 10/18/2021. (zgdf) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/19/2021.]
August 31, 2021 Filing 11 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS served on 8/26/2021; TRACY RENAUD served on 8/26/2021 (Jeelani, Hashim) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/19/2021.]
August 31, 2021 Filing 10 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 08/23/2021. (Jeelani, Hashim) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/19/2021.]
August 31, 2021 Filing 9 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/20/2021. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/19/2021. (Jeelani, Hashim) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/19/2021.]
August 23, 2021 Filing 8 Consent MOTION to Transfer Case to the Western District of Louisiana, Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint by MERRICK GARLAND, ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS, TRACY RENAUD. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Walker, Johnny) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/19/2021.]
August 23, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Johnny Hillary Walker, III on behalf of All Defendants (Walker, Johnny) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/19/2021.]
August 16, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Reissued Electronically as to MERRICK GARLAND, ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS, TRACY RENAUD, and U.S. Attorney. (ztth) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/19/2021.]
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of #5 Plaintiffs' Response to Order to Show Cause, it is hereby ORDERED that #3 Order to Show Cause is DISCHARGED. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiffs are to effect service on all Defendants on or before September 15, 2021. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 8/16/2021. (lcrc2) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/19/2021.]
August 14, 2021 Filing 5 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by NIMA SEYED KHAMOUSH, SAMIRA JAHANGIRZADEHAREKHLOU re #3 Order filed by NIMA SEYED KHAMOUSH, SAMIRA JAHANGIRZADEHAREKHLOU. (Jeelani, Hashim) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/19/2021.]
August 14, 2021 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by NIMA SEYED KHAMOUSH, SAMIRA JAHANGIRZADEHAREKHLOU. (Attachments: #1 Summons summons att gen, #2 Summons summons mayorkas, #3 Summons SUMMONS Renaud)(Jeelani, Hashim) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/19/2021.]
August 12, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to Show Cause due by 9/10/2021. (tj) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/19/2021.]
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 8/11/2021. (lcrc2) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/19/2021.]
May 6, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to MERRICK B. GARLAND, ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS, TRACY RENAUD, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/19/2021.]
May 6, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MERRICK B. GARLAND, ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS, TRACY RENAUD ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8429154) filed by NIMA SEYED KHAMOUSH, SAMIRA JAHANGIRZADEHAREKHLOU. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EXHIBIT A, #2 Exhibit EXHIBIT B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet CIVIL COVER, #4 Summons SUMMONS ATT GEN, #5 Summons SUMMONS US ATT, #6 Summons SUMMONS MAYORKAS, #7 Summons SUMMONS RENAUD)(Jeelani, Hashim) Modified on 5/6/2021 to correct docket entry text (zsb).[Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/19/2021.]
May 6, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (zsb) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/19/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Khamoush et al v. Mayorkas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nima Seyed Khamoush
Represented By: Hashim G. Jeelani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samira Jahangirzadeharekhlou
Represented By: Hashim G. Jeelani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alejandro Mayorkas
Represented By: Johnny Hillary Walker, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tracy Renaud
Represented By: Johnny Hillary Walker, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merrick Garland
Represented By: Johnny Hillary Walker, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?