Williams v. United Specialty Insurance Co et al
Plaintiff: Mary Williams
Defendant: United Specialty Insurance Co, Rite Time Transport Inc and Rajesh Kumar
Case Number: 5:2021cv04115
Filed: December 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: S Maurice Hicks
Referring Judge: Mark L Hornsby
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 15, 2021 Filing 9 RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER by Rajesh Kumar, Rite Time Transport Inc, United Specialty Insurance Co . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(aty,Williams, Douglas)
December 15, 2021 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Rite Time Transport Inc. (aty,Williams, Douglas)
December 15, 2021 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent State National Insurance Co by United Specialty Insurance Co. (aty,Williams, Douglas) Modified on 12/15/2021 (Thomas, T).
December 6, 2021 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1332. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 12/6/2021. (crt,Rider, M)
December 2, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by United Specialty Insurance Co.(aty,Williams, Douglas)
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 12/2/2021. (crt,Keller, J)
December 2, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal, sent to Alexa Nicole Candelora on behalf of Rite Time Transport Inc, United Specialty Insurance Co. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 12/16/2021. (crt,Thomas, T)
December 2, 2021 Filing 2 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 12/2/2021. (crt,Thomas, T)
December 1, 2021 STATE COURT Service Returned Executed. United Specialty Insurance Co answer due 12/8/2021. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: The PDF image can be found within Attachment #1 of document #1 Notice of Removal. (crt,Thomas, T)
December 1, 2021 CASE Assigned to Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr and Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (crt,Thomas, T)
December 1, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Caddo, Case Number 633414 (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-4912477) filed by United Specialty Insurance, Co., Rajesh Kumar, Rite Time Transport, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Alexa Nicole Candelora added to party Rajesh Kumar(pty:dft), Attorney Alexa Nicole Candelora added to party Rite Time Transport, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Alexa Nicole Candelora added to party United Specialty Insurance, Co.(pty:dft))(aty,Candelora, Alexa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. United Specialty Insurance Co et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Williams
Represented By: Patrick O Jefferson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Specialty Insurance Co
Represented By: Alexa Nicole Candelora
Represented By: Douglas Kent Williams
Represented By: Christopher D Billings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Time Transport Inc
Represented By: Alexa Nicole Candelora
Represented By: Douglas Kent Williams
Represented By: Christopher D Billings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rajesh Kumar
Represented By: Alexa Nicole Candelora
Represented By: Douglas Kent Williams
Represented By: Christopher D Billings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?