Collins v. R T Tutt Enterprises L L C et al
Plaintiff: Angelia Collins
Defendant: R T Tutt Enterprises doing business as T W Transport, Trisura Specialty Insurance Co and Dustin Berry
Case Number: 5:2021cv04328
Filed: December 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: S Maurice Hicks
Referring Judge: Mark L Hornsby
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2022 Filing 15 RULE 26(f) Report by R T Tutt Enterprises, Trisura Specialty Insurance Co, Dustin Berry, Angelia Collins. (aty,Musgrave, Richard) Modified on 2/7/2022 to add filers (Miletello, A).
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Enroll as Counsel. Added as counsel Brandon Trey Morris, Elizabeth Ann Hancock, Justin Carey Dewett, Joseph Chancellor Nerren, Joshua Lynn Powell, John Allen Davis, Christian Redmon for Angelia Collins. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 1/10/2022. (crt,Keller, J)
January 7, 2022 Filing 13 MOTION for B. Trey Morris, Elizabeth A. Hancock, Justin C. Dewett, J Chancellor Nerren, Josh L. Powell, John A. Davis, and Christian Redmon to Enroll as Counsel by Angelia Collins. Motions referred to Mark L Hornsby. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 1/7/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Nolen, Meghan)
January 6, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Compliance by R T Tutt Enterprises, Trisura Specialty Insurance Co re #1 Notice of Removal, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(aty,Musgrave, Richard)
January 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 2/14/2022 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. Rule 26 Conference between parties to take place before 1/31/2022. Initial Disclosures exchanged by 2/7/2022. Rule 26 Report due by 2/7/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 1/5/2022. (crt,Keller, J)
January 4, 2022 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Dustin Berry.(Attorney Richard Todd Musgrave added to party Dustin Berry(pty:dft))(aty,Musgrave, Richard)
January 3, 2022 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1332. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion.The court will hold a scheduling conference after Mr. Berry has been served and he files an answer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 1/3/2022. (crt,Rider, M)
December 22, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by R T Tutt Enterprises, Trisura Specialty Insurance Co.(aty,Musgrave, Richard)
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 12/17/2021. (crt,Keller, J)
December 17, 2021 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Trisura Specialty Insurance Co identifying Trisura Group Ltd for Trisura Specialty Insurance Co. (aty,Musgrave, Richard) Modified docket text on 12/20/2021 (Miletello, A).
December 17, 2021 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by R T Tutt Enterprises. (aty,Musgrave, Richard)
December 17, 2021 Filing 4 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER. Referred to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 12/17/2021. (crt,Miletello, A)
December 17, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal sent to Richard Todd Musgrave on behalf of R T Tutt Enterprises and Trisura Specialty Insurance Co. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 1/3/2022. (crt,Miletello, A)
December 16, 2021 CASE Assigned to Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr and Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (crt,Miletello, A)
December 16, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by R T Tutt Enterprises, LLC DBA T W Transport, Trisura Specialty Insurance Company. (aty,Musgrave, Richard)
December 16, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 1st JDC Caddo Parish, Case Number 633806 (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-4931671) filed by Trisura Specialty Insurance Co, R T Tutt Enterprises L L C. (Attachments: #1 Re-submitted at Doc #2 - Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Attorney Richard Todd Musgrave added to party R T Tutt Enterprises L L C(pty:dft), Trisura Specialty Insurance Co (pty:dft))(aty,Musgrave, Richard) Modified docket text on 12/16/2021 (Miletello, A).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Collins v. R T Tutt Enterprises L L C et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angelia Collins
Represented By: Meghan Marie Nolen
Represented By: Brandon Trey Morris
Represented By: Christian Redmon
Represented By: Elizabeth Ann Hancock
Represented By: John Allen Davis
Represented By: Joseph Chancellor Nerren
Represented By: Joshua Lynn Powell
Represented By: Justin Carey Dewett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R T Tutt Enterprises doing business as T W Transport
Represented By: Richard Todd Musgrave
Represented By: Amanda Huling Aucoin
Represented By: Magen Whitney Detillieu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trisura Specialty Insurance Co
Represented By: Richard Todd Musgrave
Represented By: Amanda Huling Aucoin
Represented By: Magen Whitney Detillieu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dustin Berry
Represented By: Richard Todd Musgrave
Represented By: Amanda Huling Aucoin
Represented By: Magen Whitney Detillieu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?