J M K 5 Texas City L L C et al v. AmRisc L P et al
Plaintiff: JMK5 Texas City LLC, JMK5 Shreveport LLC, J M K 5 Texas City L L C and J M K 5 Shreveport L L C
Defendant: AmRisc L L C, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London, HDI Global Specialty SE, Indian Harbor Insurance Co, QBE Specialty Insurance Company, Steadfast Insurance Co, United Specialty Insurance Co, Lexington Insurance Co, Safety Specialty Insurance Co, Old Republic Union Insurance Co, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London Severally Subscribing to Certificate No AMR-63101-02 and Q B E Specialty Insurance Co
Counter Claimant: General Security Indemnity Co of Arizona, H D I Global Specialty S E and Gneral Security Indemnity Co of Arizona
Case Number: 5:2022cv01041
Filed: April 20, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth E Foote
Referring Judge: S Maurice Hicks
2 Judge: Mark L Hornsby
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09 U.S.C. ยง 1 U.S. Arbitration Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 24, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 24, 2022 Filing 18 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by J M K 5 Shreveport L L C. (aty,Casten, Theodore)
May 24, 2022 Filing 17 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by J M K 5 Texas City L L C. (aty,Casten, Theodore)
May 16, 2022 Filing 16 ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY issued by the Clerk. In accordance with Standing Order 1.62, this matter is hereby reassigned. Case reassigned to Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr. Judge Elizabeth E Foote no longer assigned to case. All future filings should bear the name of the new judge assignment. (crt,Alexander, E)
May 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Referred to Chief Judge for reassignment. Signed by Judge Elizabeth E Foote on 5/13/2022. (crt,Reeves, T)
May 13, 2022 Filing 14 RESPONSE to Motion re #3 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings MOTION to Stay filed by J M K 5 Shreveport L L C, J M K 5 Texas City L L C. (aty,Casten, Theodore)
May 12, 2022 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London Severally Subscribing to Certificate No AMR-63101-02, General Security Indemnity Co of Arizona, H D I Global Specialty S E, Indian Harbor Insurance Co, Lexington Insurance Co, Old Republic Union Insurance Co, Q B E Specialty Insurance Co, Safety Specialty Insurance Co, Steadfast Insurance Co, United Specialty Insurance Co identifying Corporate Parents Hannover Re, H D I Global S E, Talanx Group for H D I Global Specialty S E; Corporate Parents, Q B E Atlantic L L C, Q B E Investments (North America) Inc, Q B E Insurance Holdings Pty Ltd, Other Affiliate Q B E Holdings Inc for Q B E Specialty Insurance Co; Corporate Parents, American International Group Inc, A I G Property Casualty U S Inc, A I G Property Casualty Inc for Lexington Insurance Co; Corporate Parents, Safety National Casualty Corp, Tokyo Marine Holdings Inc for Safety Specialty Insurance Co; Corporate Parents, Zurich Insurance Co Ltd, Zurich Insurance Group Ltd, Other Affiliates, Zurich American Insurance Co, Zurich Holding Co of America Inc for Steadfast Insurance Co; Corporate Parent State National Insurance Co Inc for United Specialty Insurance Co; Corporate Parent Old Republic International Corp for Old Republic Union Insurance Co; Corporate Parents, American International Group Inc, Fairfax Financial Holdings Ltd, Axis Capital Holdings Ltd, Tokio Marine Holdings Inc, Enstar Group Ltd, Hannover Re, Hiscox Ltd, Talanx A G, Sompo Holdings Inc, Kenmare Holdings Ltd, Brit Insurance Holdings Ltd, Argenta Holdings Ltd, Hannover Ruck S E, Haftpflichtverband der Deutschen Industrie V a G, Asta Capital Ltd, Beazley Furlonge Holdings Ltd, Exor Nederland N V, Beasley p l c, Q B E Insurance, Lancashire Holdings Ltd, Shelbourne Group Ltd, Cathedral Capital Holdings Ltd, Tokio Marine & Nichido Insurance Co Ltd, Other Affiliates, Talbot Underwriting Ltd, Brit Syndicates Ltd, Beazley Furlonge Ltd, Q B E Underwriting Ltd, Brit U W Ltd, Vanguard Group, Argenta Syndicate Management Ltd, Tokio Marine Kiln Syndicates Ltd, Asta Managing Agency Ltd, S G L No 1 Ltd, T Rowe Price, Apollo Syndicate Management Ltd, Apollo Partners L L P, D C B Ibeson, S A C White, Hiscox Syndicates Ltd, Catlin Syndicate Ltd, Inter Hannover (No 1) Ltd, PartnerRe Corporate Ltd, PartnerRe Ltd, S C O R Underwriting Ltd, S A Meacock & Co Ltd, Lancashire Syndicates Ltd, Catlin Underwriters Agencies Ltd, Canopius Managing Agents Ltd, Axis Corporate Capital U K Ltd, Axis Corporate Capital U K II Ltd for Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London; Corporate Parent S C O R Reinsurance Co Inc for General Security Indemnity Co of Arizona; Corporate Parents, X L Bermuda Ltd (Bermuda), X L I T Ltd (Cayman), X L Group Ltd (Bermuda), Exel Holding Ltd (Cayman), X L Specialty Insurance Co, X L Reinsurance America Inc (New York), X L America Inc (Delaware) for Indian Harbor Insurance Co. (aty,Rew, Phillip) Modified on 5/12/2022 to modify docket text. (Crick, S).
May 11, 2022 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by AmRisc L L C identifying Corporate Parent Truist Financial Corp, Other Affiliate Truist Bank, Other Affiliate Truist Insurance Holdings Inc for AmRisc L L C. (aty,Yanez, Leopoldo)
May 10, 2022 Filing 11 SECOND NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement, re: #5 Notice of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement, sent to Phillip J Rew on behalf of Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London Severally Subscribing to Certificate No AMR-63101-02, General Security Indemnity Co of Arizona, H D I Global Specialty S E, Indian Harbor Insurance Co, Lexington Insurance Co, Old Republic Union Insurance Co, Q B E Specialty Insurance Co, Safety Specialty Insurance Co, Steadfast Insurance Co, United Specialty Insurance Co. Show Cause Response due by 5/24/2022. (crt,Mitchell, P)
April 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal pending Ruling on Docket No. 3 filed by AmRisc L L C. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that AmRisc, LLC is allowed until 10 days from the datethis Court issues an order on the motion to compel arbitration and stay proceedings [Dkt. No. 3] to respond to Plaintiffs Complaint as Amended. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 4/28/2022. (crt,Crick, S)
April 27, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer sent to Leopoldo J Yanez on behalf of AmRisc L L C. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 5/11/2022. (crt,Crick, S)
April 27, 2022 Filing 8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal,, with consent pending Ruling on Docket No. 3 by AmRisc L L C. Motions referred to Mark L Hornsby. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 4/27/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Yanez, Leopoldo)
April 22, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding: #3 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings MOTION to Stay. Motions referred to Judge Elizabeth E Foote. (crt,Crick, S)
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 4/21/2022. (crt,Crick, S)
April 20, 2022 Motions Transferred regarding #3 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings MOTION to Stay. Motions referred to Judge Elizabeth E Foote. (crt,Crick, S)
April 20, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal,, #2 Answer to Complaint,Counterclaim, sent to Phillip J Rew on behalf of Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London Severally Subscribing to Certificate No AMR-63101-02, General Security Insurance Co of Arizona, H D I Global Specialty S E, Indian Harbor Insurance Co, Lexington Insurance Co, Old Republic Union Insurance Co, Q B E Specialty Insurance Company, Safety Specialty Insurance Co, Steadfast Insurance Co, United Specialty Insurance Co. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 5/4/2022. (crt,Crick, S)
April 20, 2022 Filing 4 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 4/20/2022. (crt,Crick, S)
April 20, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings by Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London, General Security Indemnity Co of Arizona, H D I Global Specialty S E, Indian Harbor Insurance Co, Lexington Insurance Co, Old Republic Union Insurance Co, Q B E Specialty Insurance Co, Safety Specialty Insurance Co, Steadfast Insurance Co, United Specialty Insurance Co. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 4/20/2022. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Table of Authorities, #3 Exhibit 1 - case law, #4 Proposed order)(aty,Rew, Phillip) Modified on 4/20/2022 to modify docket text. (Crick, S). Added MOTION to Stay on 4/20/2022 (Crick, S).
April 20, 2022 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against J M K 5 Shreveport L L C, J M K 5 Texas City L L C by Indian Harbor Insurance Co, General Security Indemnity Co of Arizona, Lexington Insurance Co, Steadfast Insurance Co, Old Republic Union Insurance Co, Q B E Specialty Insurance Co, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London Severally Subscribing to Certificate No AMR-63101-02, United Specialty Insurance Co, Safety Specialty Insurance Co, H D I Global Specialty S E. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - policy excerpt, #2 Exhibit 2 - Policy)(Attorney Phillip J Rew added to party General Security Indemnity Co of Arizona(pty:dft), Indian Harbor Insurance Co(pty:dft), Lexington Insurance Co(pty:dft), Old Republic Union Insurance Co(pty:dft), Q B E Specialty Insurance Co(pty:dft), Safety Specialty Insurance Co(pty:dft), Steadfast Insurance Co(pty:dft), United Specialty Insurance Co(pty:dft))(aty,Rew, Phillip) Modified on 4/20/2022 to modify docket text. (Crick, S).
April 20, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 1st JDC Caddo Parish, Case Number 635295 (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-5074682) filed by Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London Severally Subscribing to Certificate No AMR-63101-02, H D I Global Specialty S E. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings, #3 Exhibit B - Arbitration Clause, #4 Exhibit C - Policy, #5 Exhibit D - Consents)(Attorney Phillip J Rew added to party Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London(pty:dft), Attorney Phillip J Rew added to party HDI Global Specialty SE(pty:dft))(aty,Rew, Phillip) Modified on 4/20/2022 to modify docket text. (Crick, S).
April 20, 2022 CASE Assigned to Judge Elizabeth E Foote and Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (crt,Crick, S)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: J M K 5 Texas City L L C et al v. AmRisc L P et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JMK5 Texas City LLC
Represented By: Theodore J Casten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JMK5 Shreveport LLC
Represented By: Theodore J Casten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J M K 5 Texas City L L C
Represented By: Theodore J Casten
Represented By: Patrick Thomas Wiggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J M K 5 Shreveport L L C
Represented By: Theodore J Casten
Represented By: Patrick Thomas Wiggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmRisc L L C
Represented By: Leopoldo J Yanez
Represented By: Nancy Scott Degan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London
Represented By: Phillip J Rew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HDI Global Specialty SE
Represented By: Phillip J Rew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indian Harbor Insurance Co
Represented By: Phillip J Rew
Represented By: Bruce R Hoefer, Jr
Represented By: D Russell Holwadel
Represented By: Heather England Reznik
Represented By: Kyle Matthew Truxillo
Represented By: Richard R Stedman, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QBE Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Phillip J Rew
Represented By: Bruce R Hoefer, Jr
Represented By: D Russell Holwadel
Represented By: Heather England Reznik
Represented By: Kyle Matthew Truxillo
Represented By: Richard R Stedman, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steadfast Insurance Co
Represented By: Phillip J Rew
Represented By: Bruce R Hoefer, Jr
Represented By: D Russell Holwadel
Represented By: Heather England Reznik
Represented By: Kyle Matthew Truxillo
Represented By: Richard R Stedman, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Specialty Insurance Co
Represented By: Phillip J Rew
Represented By: Bruce R Hoefer, Jr
Represented By: D Russell Holwadel
Represented By: Heather England Reznik
Represented By: Kyle Matthew Truxillo
Represented By: Richard R Stedman, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lexington Insurance Co
Represented By: Phillip J Rew
Represented By: Bruce R Hoefer, Jr
Represented By: D Russell Holwadel
Represented By: Heather England Reznik
Represented By: Kyle Matthew Truxillo
Represented By: Richard R Stedman, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safety Specialty Insurance Co
Represented By: Phillip J Rew
Represented By: Bruce R Hoefer, Jr
Represented By: D Russell Holwadel
Represented By: Heather England Reznik
Represented By: Kyle Matthew Truxillo
Represented By: Richard R Stedman, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Old Republic Union Insurance Co
Represented By: Phillip J Rew
Represented By: Bruce R Hoefer, Jr
Represented By: D Russell Holwadel
Represented By: Heather England Reznik
Represented By: Kyle Matthew Truxillo
Represented By: Richard R Stedman, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London Severally Subscribing to Certificate No AMR-63101-02
Represented By: Phillip J Rew
Represented By: Bruce R Hoefer, Jr
Represented By: D Russell Holwadel
Represented By: Heather England Reznik
Represented By: Kyle Matthew Truxillo
Represented By: Richard R Stedman, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Q B E Specialty Insurance Co
Represented By: Bruce R Hoefer, Jr
Represented By: D Russell Holwadel
Represented By: Kyle Matthew Truxillo
Represented By: Richard R Stedman, II
Represented By: Phillip J Rew
Represented By: Heather England Reznik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: General Security Indemnity Co of Arizona
Represented By: Bruce R Hoefer, Jr
Represented By: D Russell Holwadel
Represented By: Kyle Matthew Truxillo
Represented By: Richard R Stedman, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: H D I Global Specialty S E
Represented By: Bruce R Hoefer, Jr
Represented By: D Russell Holwadel
Represented By: Kyle Matthew Truxillo
Represented By: Richard R Stedman, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Gneral Security Indemnity Co of Arizona
Represented By: Bruce R Hoefer, Jr
Represented By: D Russell Holwadel
Represented By: Kyle Matthew Truxillo
Represented By: Richard R Stedman, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?