Spring v. Whittington et al
Plaintiff: Joseph Wesley Spring
Defendant: Julian Whittington, Lt Jacobs and John Bell Edwards
Case Number: 5:2022cv02905
Filed: August 18, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: S Maurice Hicks
Referring Judge: Mark L Hornsby
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEMORANDUM ORDER: Plaintiff failed to submit documents on approved forms.Plaintiff submitted an IFP application not completed by an authorized Accounts Officer. ( Pro Se Deadline to comply with deficiency set for 9/21/2022). Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 8/22/2022. (Attachments: #1 2241 form, #2 Page 6 of ifp form)(crt,Haik, K)
August 22, 2022 Filing 4 REQUEST from Joseph Wesley Spring for bossier parish clerk of court address and forms to file a complaint. Clerk mailed copywork letter providing the address, 1983 form, and 1915 form, legal notice on 08/22/2022. (Public entry, but no electronic notice.) (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (crt,Williams, G)
August 19, 2022 Filing 3 PROPOSED MEMORANDUM ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 8/19/2022. (crt,Devillier, W)
August 18, 2022 Filing 2 DEFICIENT MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Joseph Wesley Spring. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 8/18/2022. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(crt,Lemoine, N). Need certification regarding prison account.
August 18, 2022 Filing 1 DEFICIENT PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Joseph Wesley Spring. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Envelope)(crt,Lemoine, N). Petition not on approved form. (Attachment 1 replaced on 8/19/2022) (Lemoine, N).
August 18, 2022 CASE Assigned to Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr and Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (crt,Devillier, W)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spring v. Whittington et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Wesley Spring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julian Whittington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Bell Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?