USA v. S S J Development Co L L C et al
Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: S S J Development Co L L C, James B Lee, III, Citizens National Bank N A and Twin Cities Development L P
Case Number: 5:2022cv05373
Filed: September 29, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Mark L Hornsby
Referring Judge: David C Joseph
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7403 Suit to Enforce Federal Tax Lien
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 1, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 23, 2022 Filing 18 NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding: #17 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim Plaintiff's Complaint. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (crt,Thomas, T)
November 23, 2022 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim Plaintiff's Complaint by S S J Development Co L L C. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can Be Granted, #2 Proposed order Proposed Order for Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can Be Granted)(aty,Tarcza, Robert)
November 23, 2022 Filing 16 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by S S J Development Co L L C. (aty,Tarcza, Robert)
November 10, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to Twin Cities Development LP by USA (aty,Rill, Jeremy)
November 5, 2022 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Citizens National Bank N A. (aty,McCraw, Gray)
November 4, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #12 Answer to Complaint, sent to Fred A Rogers, III on behalf of Citizens National Bank N A. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 11/18/2022. (crt,Thomas, T)
November 4, 2022 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,, w/ certificate of service by Citizens National Bank N A.(Attorney Fred A Rogers, III added to party Citizens National Bank N A(pty:dft))(aty,Rogers, Fred)
November 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Enroll as Counsel. Added as counsel Robert E Tarcza for S S J Development Co L L C. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 11/1/2022. (crt,Keller, J)
October 31, 2022 Filing 10 CORRECTED MOTION for Robert E. Tarcza to Enroll as Counsel by S S J Development Co L L C. Motions referred to Mark L Hornsby. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 10/31/2022. (aty,Tarcza, Robert) Modified to edit text on 10/31/2022 (Thomas, T).
October 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Enroll as Counsel. Added as counsel Robert E Tarcza for S S J Development Co L L C, . Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 10/31/2022. (crt,Keller, J) (Keller, J). Modified on 10/31/2022 to add docket number and re-attach Order. (Keller, J). Modified to removal counsel from erroneously chosen defendants on 10/31/2022 (Thomas, T).
October 28, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION for Robert E Tarcza to Enroll as Counsel by S S J Development Co L L C, . Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 10/28/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(Attorney Robert E Tarcza added to party S S J Development Co L L C(pty:dft))(crt,Thomas, T)
October 19, 2022 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by USA. James B Lee, III waiver sent on 10/7/2022, answer due 12/6/2022. (aty,Rill, Jeremy)
October 13, 2022 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by USA. Twin Cities Development L P served on 10/13/2022, answer due 11/3/2022. (aty,Rill, Jeremy)
October 13, 2022 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by USA. Citizens National Bank N A served on 10/11/2022, answer due 11/1/2022. (aty,Rill, Jeremy)
October 11, 2022 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by USA. S S J Development Co L L C waiver sent on 10/7/2022, answer due 12/6/2022. (aty,Rill, Jeremy)
October 7, 2022 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1345. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 10/7/2022. (crt,Rider, M)
October 6, 2022 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Citizens National Bank N A, James B Lee, III, S S J Development Co L L C, Twin Cities Development L P. (crt,Thomas, T)
September 29, 2022 CASE Assigned to Judge David C Joseph and Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (crt,Thomas, T)
September 29, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Citizens National Bank N A, James B Lee, III, S S J Development Co L L C, Twin Cities Development L P (Filed on behalf of USA - Filing Fee not required) filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Proposed summons/writ to SSJ Development Co. L.L.C., #3 Proposed summons/writ to James B. Lee III, #4 Proposed summons/writ to Citizens National Bank, N.A., #5 Proposed summons/writ to Twin Cities Development, LP)(Attorney Jeremy Allen Rill added to party United States of America(pty:pla))(aty,Rill, Jeremy) (Attachment 2 replaced on 10/6/2022) (Thomas, T). (Attachment 3 replaced on 10/6/2022) (Thomas, T). (Attachment 4 replaced on 10/6/2022) (Thomas, T). (Attachment 5 replaced on 10/6/2022) (Thomas, T). Modified attachments to nonfillable forms and replaced on 10/6/2022 (Thomas, T).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. S S J Development Co L L C et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Jeremy Allen Rill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S S J Development Co L L C
Represented By: Robert E Tarcza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James B Lee, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citizens National Bank N A
Represented By: Fred A Rogers, III
Represented By: Gray Hayes McCraw, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Twin Cities Development L P
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?