Moore v. Mericles Towing L L C et al
Plaintiff: Cheryl Moore
Defendant: Mericles Towing L L C, AmGuard Insurance Co, Paccar Inc, Peterbilt of Louisiana and Peterbilt Motors Co
Case Number: 5:2022cv05715
Filed: October 14, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: S Maurice Hicks
Referring Judge: Mark L Hornsby
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #30 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney James T Busenlener for AmGuard Insurance Co. Attorney Nicholas Orlando Zotti terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 12/2/2022. (crt,Thomas, T)
December 1, 2022 Filing 30 Ex Parte MOTION to Substitute Attorney James T. Busenlener in place of Nicholas O. Zotti by AmGuard Insurance Co. Motions referred to Mark L Hornsby. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 12/1/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order Attorney Zotti Proposed Order for Withdrawal and Substitution)(aty,Zotti, Nicholas) Modified to correct event type and edit docket text on 12/2/2022 (Thomas, T).
December 1, 2022 Filing 29 RESPONSE to Motion re #21 MOTION to Remand filed by Paccar Inc. (aty,Zimmer, Scott)
December 1, 2022 Filing 28 NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding: #26 MOTION to Strike the Affidavit of Cheryl Moore. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (crt,Thomas, T)
December 1, 2022 Filing 27 RESPONSE to Motion re #21 MOTION to Remand filed by Mericles Towing L L C. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of James Mericle)(aty,Hemken, David)
December 1, 2022 Filing 26 MOTION to Strike the Affidavit of Cheryl Moore by Mericles Towing L L C. Motions referred to Mark L Hornsby. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 12/1/2022. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief)(aty,Hemken, David)
November 30, 2022 Filing 25 RESPONSE to Motion re #21 MOTION to Remand filed by AmGuard Insurance Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Petition for Wrongful Death and Survival Action)(aty,Zotti, Nicholas)
November 22, 2022 Filing 24 REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 First MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim Amguard Insurance Company filed by AmGuard Insurance Co. (aty,Zotti, Nicholas)
November 17, 2022 Filing 23 NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding: #21 MOTION to Remand . Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (crt,Bunting, M)
November 14, 2022 Filing 22 RESPONSE to Motion re #7 First MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim Amguard Insurance Company filed by Cheryl Moore. (aty,Ritch, Joseph)
November 14, 2022 Filing 21 MOTION to Remand with incorporated Memorandum by Cheryl Moore. Motions referred to Mark L Hornsby. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 11/14/2022. (aty,Ritch, Joseph) Modified docket text on 11/17/2022 (Bunting, M).
November 4, 2022 Filing 20 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Mericles Towing L L C. (aty,Hemken, David)
November 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #1 Notice of Removal. Mericle's Towing, LLC is granted an extension of time to file an answer until after the issue of improper joinder is resolved. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 11/4/2022. (crt,Keller, J)
November 1, 2022 Filing 18 ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY issued by the Clerk. In accordance with Standing Order 1.62, this matter is hereby reassigned. Case reassigned to Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr. Judge Donald E Walter no longer assigned to case. All future filings should bear the name of the new judge assignment. (crt,Alexander, E)
October 31, 2022 Filing 17 MINUTE ENTRY: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 455, the undersigned must be disqualified from participating in the above-captioned matter. Accordingly, this case is REFERRED to Chief Judge S. Maurice Hicks, Jr. for reassignment. Signed by Judge Donald E Walter on 10/31/2022. (crt,Thomas, T)
October 27, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #13 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer, sent to David Jonathan Hemken on behalf of Mericles Towing L L C. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 11/10/2022. (crt,Thomas, T)
October 27, 2022 Filing 15 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by AmGuard Insurance Co identifying Corporate Parent Berkshire Hathatway Inc for AmGuard Insurance Co. (aty,Zotti, Nicholas) Modified on 10/27/2022 (Thomas, T).
October 27, 2022 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer with consent sought but not yet obtained by Mericles Towing L L C. Motions referred to Mark L Hornsby. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 10/27/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Hemken, David)
October 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MEMORANDUM ORDER: If Plaintiff contests the assertions that Mericles, AmGuard, and Peterbilt of Louisiana, LLC were improperly joined, she must file a motion to remand, supported by a memorandum, by November 14, 2022 and explain why there is a reasonable basis to predict that state law would allow Plaintiff to recover against any of those defendants. If Plaintiff files a motion to remand, it will be noticed for briefing so that Paccar can respond and attempt to meet its burden on the improper joinder issue. If Plaintiff does not file a motion to remand by the deadline and challenge the improper joinder plea, the court will consider Plaintiff to concede the point, and all claims against Mericles, AmGuard, and Peterbilt of Louisiana, LLC will be dismissed without prejudice, and the case will proceed toward a scheduling order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 10/26/2022. (crt,Thomas, T)
October 26, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines: Compliance Deadline set for 11/14/2022. (crt,Thomas, T)
October 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 10/26/2022. (crt,Keller, J)
October 26, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #7 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, sent to Nicholas Orlando Zotti on behalf of AmGuard Insurance Co. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 11/9/2022. (crt,Thomas, T)
October 25, 2022 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by AmGuard Insurance Co.(aty,Zotti, Nicholas)
October 25, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding: #7 First MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim Amguard Insurance Company, #4 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim Peterbilt Motors Company. Motions referred to Judge Donald E Walter. (crt,Thomas, T)
October 25, 2022 Filing 8 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 10/25/2022. (crt,Thomas, T)
October 24, 2022 Filing 7 First MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim Amguard Insurance Company by AmGuard Insurance Co. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief Attorney Zotti's Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss Amguard Insurance Company)(Attorney Nicholas Orlando Zotti added to party AmGuard Insurance Co(pty:dft))(aty,Zotti, Nicholas)
October 21, 2022 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Peterbilt of Louisiana . (aty,Zimmer, Scott) Modified on 10/24/2022 (Thomas, T).
October 21, 2022 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Paccar Inc identifying Other Affiliate Peterbilt Motors Co for Paccar Inc. (aty,Zimmer, Scott) Modified on 10/24/2022 (Thomas, T).
October 21, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim Peterbilt Motors Company by Paccar Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Text of proposed order)(aty,Zimmer, Scott)
October 21, 2022 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Peterbilt of Louisiana.(Attorney Scott L Zimmer added to party Peterbilt of Louisiana(pty:dft))(aty,Zimmer, Scott)
October 21, 2022 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Paccar Inc.(aty,Zimmer, Scott)
October 14, 2022 CASE Assigned to Judge Donald E Walter and Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (crt,Thomas, T)
October 14, 2022 STATE COURT Service Returned Executed. Mericles Towing L L C answer due 10/21/2022. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: The PDF image can be found within Attachment #2 of document #1 Notice of Removal. (crt,Thomas, T)
October 14, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 1st JDC Caddo Parish, Case Number 639362 with Jury Demand; (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-5327429) filed by Paccar Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 State court petition Exhibit A Petition and State Court Filings, #3 Exhibit B Declaration of Paccar Inc, #4 Exhibit C Declaration of Amguard Insurance, #5 Exhibit D Declaration of Peterbilt of Louisiana, #6 Exhibit E Declaration of Mericle's Towing)(Attorney Scott L Zimmer added to party Paccar Inc(pty:dft))(aty,Zimmer, Scott) Modified on 10/25/2022 (Thomas, T).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moore v. Mericles Towing L L C et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheryl Moore
Represented By: Chris L Bowman
Represented By: Joseph Eric Ritch
Represented By: Thomas Taylor Townsend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mericles Towing L L C
Represented By: David Jonathan Hemken
Represented By: Ashleigh Brooke Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmGuard Insurance Co
Represented By: James T Busenlener
Represented By: Nicholas Orlando Zotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paccar Inc
Represented By: Scott L Zimmer
Represented By: Megan L Reinkemeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peterbilt of Louisiana
Represented By: Scott L Zimmer
Represented By: Megan L Reinkemeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peterbilt Motors Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?