Banks v. Walker et al
Plaintiff: Darrell Wesley Banks
Defendant: Lt Walker, Unknown Correctional Officers, ERT Cooper, Childress and Det Richardson
Case Number: 5:2023cv01700
Filed: November 27, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Jerry Edwards
Referring Judge: Mark L Hornsby
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MEMORANDUM ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Initial Partial Filing Fee due in the amount of $20.84. It is further ordered that plaintiff make payments of 20 percent of income for preceding month until $350.00 has been paid in full. Clerk manually noticed Prison Accounts Officer.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 1/18/2024. (crt,Devillier, W)
January 18, 2024 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Darrell Wesley Banks. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 1/18/2024. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(crt,Haik, K) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/18/2024: #2 Proposed order) (Haik, K).
January 10, 2024 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY issued by the Clerk. Case reassigned to District Judge Jerry Edwards, Jr. Judge Terry A Doughty no longer assigned to case. All future filings should bear the name of the new judge assignment. Approved by Judge Terry A Doughty on 1/10/2024. (crt,Kiper, C)
January 8, 2024 Filing 6 LETTER from Plaintiff to Court re confiscation of legal mail/legal materials. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (crt,Haik, K)
January 8, 2024 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Walker, Cooper, Childress, Richardson filed by Darrell Wesley Banks. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(crt,Haik, K)
December 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MEMORANDUM ORDER: Plaintiff failed to submit documents on approved forms.Plaintiff failed to submit filing fee or a completed IFP application. ( Pro Se Deadline to comply with deficiency set for 1/5/2024). Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 12/6/2023. (Attachments: #1 1983 Civil Rights form, #2 In Forma Pauperis form)(crt,Williams, K)
December 5, 2023 Filing 2 PROPOSED MEMORANDUM ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 12/5/2023. (crt,Devillier, W)
November 27, 2023 CASE Assigned to Judge Terry A Doughty and Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (crt,Devillier, W)
November 27, 2023 Filing 1 DEFICIENT COMPLAINT against Unknown Correctional Officers, Walker filed by Darrell Wesley Banks. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Envelope)(crt,Miletello, A) (Main Document 1 replaced to add case # on document on 11/30/2023) (Miletello, A). Complaint not on approved form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Banks v. Walker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darrell Wesley Banks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Correctional Officers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ERT Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Childress
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Det Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?