Johnson v. O'Malley
Plaintiff: Christopher Allen Johnson
Defendant: Martin J O'Malley
Case Number: 5:2024cv00352
Filed: March 8, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Terry A Doughty
Referring Judge: Kayla D McClusky
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Elvi Jenkins on behalf of Martin J O'Malley (Attorney Elvi Jenkins added to party Martin J O'Malley(pty:dft)) (aty,Jenkins, Elvi)
March 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Daniel S Jones for Christopher Allen Johnson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky on 3/13/2024. (crt,Leday, A)
March 11, 2024 Filing 3 SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER issued. Transcript due 5/10/24. (crt,Bunting, M)
March 11, 2024 SERVICE of Complaint on the Commissioner of Social Security through the United States Attorney's Office by the Courts electronic case management system pursuant to the Supplemental Rules for Social Security actions Under 42 U.S.C. Section 405(g). Martin J O'Malley served on 3/11/2024, answer due 5/10/2024. (crt,Bunting, M)
March 8, 2024 CASE Assigned to Judge Terry A Doughty and Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky. (crt,Bunting, M)
March 8, 2024 Filing 2 MOTION for Daniel Jones to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-5879660) by Christopher Allen Johnson. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 3/8/2024. (Attachments: #1 Proposed exhibit Cert of Good Standing)(aty,Venkataraman, Vijay)
March 8, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $405, receipt number ALAWDC-5879655) filed by Christopher Allen Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Vijay Venkataraman added to party Christopher Allen Johnson(pty:pla))(aty,Venkataraman, Vijay) (Attachment 1 replaced on 3/11/2024) (Bunting, M).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Allen Johnson
Represented By: Vijay Venkataraman
Represented By: Daniel S Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin J O'Malley
Represented By: Elvi Jenkins
Represented By: Shannon Thornhill Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?