Jackson v. Willis et al
Plaintiff: TreVeon Jackson
Defendant: P Eichelbuger, L Randale, Z Thomas and J Willis
Case Number: 5:2024cv01041
Filed: August 5, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: S Maurice Hicks
Referring Judge: Mark L Hornsby
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2024 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Z Thomas, J Willis filed by TreVeon Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(crt,Haik, K)
August 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MEMORANDUM ORDER directing plaintiff to amend the complaint. Pro Se Response due by 9/27/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 8/28/2024. (crt,Devillier, W)
August 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MEMORANDUM ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. No initial filing fee due. Further ordered that plaintiff make payments of 20 percent of income for preceding month until $350.00 has been paid in full. Clerk manually noticed Prison Accounts Officer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 8/15/2024. (crt,Devillier, W)
August 5, 2024 CASE Assigned to Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr and Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (crt,Devillier, W)
August 5, 2024 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by TreVeon Jackson. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 8/5/2024. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(crt,Williams, G) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/14/2024: #2 Proposed order) (Devillier, W).
August 5, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against P Eichelbuger, L Randale, Z Thomas, J Willis filed by TreVeon Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Envelope, #4 Envelope)(crt,Williams, G)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. Willis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P Eichelbuger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L Randale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Z Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Willis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TreVeon Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?