Jacobs et al v. Martin Marietta Materials Inc et al
Plaintiff: Johnathan Jacobs, Tammy Jacobs and Brad Jacobs
Defendant: Martin Marietta Materials Inc and Powderly Transportation Inc
Case Number: 5:2024cv01294
Filed: September 23, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Terry A Doughty
Referring Judge: Mark L Hornsby
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2024 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brad Jacobs, Johnathan Jacobs, Tammy Jacobs. Powderly Transportation Inc served on 10/10/2024, answer due 10/31/2024. (aty,Jackson, Patrick)
October 11, 2024 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brad Jacobs, Johnathan Jacobs, Tammy Jacobs. Martin Marietta Materials Inc served on 10/10/2024, answer due 10/31/2024. (aty,Jackson, Patrick)
September 26, 2024 Filing 4 DIVERSITY JURISDICTION DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Brad Jacobs, Johnathan Jacobs, Tammy Jacobs (Attorney Joseph Kyle McCotter added to party Johnathan Jacobs(pty:pla)). (aty,McCotter, Joseph)
September 25, 2024 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Martin Marietta Materials Inc, Powderly Transportation Inc. (crt,Crick, S)
September 25, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE of Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Complaint sent to Patrick R Jackson on behalf of Brad Jacobs, Johnathan Jacobs, Tammy Jacobs. Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement due by 10/9/2024. (crt,Crick, S)
September 23, 2024 CASE Assigned to Judge Terry A Doughty and Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (crt,Crick, S)
September 23, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Martin Marietta Materials, Inc., Powderly Transportation, Inc. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $405, receipt number ALAWDC-6065407) filed by Jeremiah Jacobs, Brad Jacobs, Johnathan Jacobs, Tammy Jacobs. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement)(Attorney Patrick R Jackson added to party Brad Jacobs(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick R Jackson added to party Jeremiah Jacobs(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick R Jackson added to party Johnathan Jacobs(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick R Jackson added to party Tammy Jacobs(pty:pla))(aty,Jackson, Patrick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jacobs et al v. Martin Marietta Materials Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnathan Jacobs
Represented By: Joseph Kyle McCotter
Represented By: Patrick R Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammy Jacobs
Represented By: Joseph Kyle McCotter
Represented By: Patrick R Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brad Jacobs
Represented By: Joseph Kyle McCotter
Represented By: Patrick R Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin Marietta Materials Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Powderly Transportation Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?