Scroggins v. Southwestern Electric Power Co
Plaintiff: Donald C Scroggins
Defendant: Southwestern Electric Power Co
Case Number: 5:2024cv01568
Filed: November 13, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: S Maurice Hicks
Referring Judge: Mark L Hornsby
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEMORANDUM ORDER : Plaintiff must complete service and file evidence of service within 90 days of the filing of his complaint, which will be February 11, 2025. Failure to do so may result in dismissal of this civil action. Plaintiff must keep the court informed of his current address. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 12/10/2024. (crt,Keifer, K)
December 5, 2024 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Southwestern Electric Power Co. (crt,Crick, S)
December 4, 2024 Filing 3 CORRECTIVE DOCUMENT entitled Signature Page filed by Donald C Scroggins regarding #1 Complaint. (crt,Crick, S)
November 15, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE of Deficiency to Donald C Scroggins regarding #1 Complaint. Reason: Documents filed by a party not represented by counsel must be personally signed by the party. (crt,Miletello, A)
November 13, 2024 CASE Assigned to Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr and Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (crt,Miletello, A)
November 13, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Southwestern Electric Power Co (Receipt number 500003364, filing fee $405) filed by Donald C Scroggins. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Envelope)(crt,Bowman, A) Modified on 11/15/2024 to reflect as deficient (Miletello, A). Modified on 12/5/2024 to indicate #3 Corrected Signature Page submitted. (Crick, S).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scroggins v. Southwestern Electric Power Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald C Scroggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southwestern Electric Power Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?