Rasco v. Wells et al
Plaintiff: Charles A Rasco
Defendant: Shaunte Wells and Washington & Wells Attorneys at Law
Case Number: 5:2025cv00145
Filed: February 6, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: S Maurice Hicks
Referring Judge: Mark L Hornsby
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 5 JUDGMENT adopting #3 Report and Recommendation. IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff's complaint is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr on 3/7/2025. (crt,Keifer, K)
February 20, 2025 Filing 4 OBJECTION to #3 Report and Recommendations by Charles A Rasco. Response to Objection to R&R due by 3/6/2025. (crt,Thomas, T)
February 13, 2025 Filing 3 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #1 Complaint filed by Charles A Rasco. IT IS RECOMMENDED that Plaintiff's complaint be dismissed without prejudice for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Objections to R&R due by 2/27/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 2/13/2025. (crt,Keller, J)
February 10, 2025 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Washington & Wells Attorneys at Law, Shaunte Wells. (crt,Thomas, T)
February 10, 2025 CASE Assigned to Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr and Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (crt,Thomas, T)
February 6, 2025 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Washington & Wells Attorneys at Law, Shaunte Wells (Receipt number 500003661, filing fee $405) filed by Charles A Rasco. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit)(crt,Bowman, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rasco v. Wells et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles A Rasco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shaunte Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington & Wells Attorneys at Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?