Ringbauer et al v. Hebert et al
Plaintiff: Debora Buczek, John Clemens and Bill Ringbauer
Defendant: Sid Hebert, John Carter, Scott Clostio, Channing Credeur, Marion Borel, Ryan Turner, Paul Venable, Brett Broussard, Ron Durand, Mike Lasalle, Randy Bouillion, Brandon Hebert, Sheriff of Iberia Parish, Jay Shatlock and Arthur Elmer
Case Number: 6:2008cv00115
Filed: January 28, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Office: Lafayette Office
County: Iberia
Presiding Judge: C Michael Hill
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 3, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 3, 2011 Filing 106 MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable: Mail sent to John Clemens, 525 E Main, New Iberia, LA 70560, re: #105 Order on Motion to Dismiss returned marked: Return to Sender, Attempted not known, Unable to forward. (crt,Kennedy, T)
February 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER granting #104 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge C Michael Hill on 02/23/2011. (crt,Davenport, M)
February 22, 2011 Filing 104 MOTION to Dismiss by Debora Buczek, Sid Hebert, Bill Ringbauer. (Attachments: #1 Text of proposed order)(aty,Henke, Kenneth)
January 12, 2011 Filing 103 MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable: Mail sent to John Clemens, 525 E Main, New Iberia, LA 70560, re: #102 Judgment of Dismissal returned marked: Return to Sender - Insufficient Address - Unable to Forward. (crt,Kennedy, T)
January 4, 2011 Filing 102 60 DAY JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Magistrate Judge C Michael Hill on 01/04/2011. (crt,Davenport, M)
December 29, 2010 Filing 101 PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS by Marion Borel, Randy Bouillion, Brett Broussard, Debora Buczek, John Carter, Scott Clostio, Ron Durand, Arthur Elmer, Brandon Hebert, Sid Hebert, Mike Lasalle, Bill Ringbauer, Jay Shatlock, Ryan Turner, Paul Venable. (aty,Burgess, L)
December 29, 2010 Filing 100 PROPOSED JURY INTERROGATORIES/VERDICT by Marion Borel, Randy Bouillion, Brett Broussard, Debora Buczek, John Carter, Scott Clostio, Ron Durand, Arthur Elmer, Brandon Hebert, Sid Hebert, Mike Lasalle, Bill Ringbauer, Jay Shatlock, Ryan Turner, Paul Venable. (aty,Burgess, L)
December 29, 2010 Filing 99 PROPOSED PRETRIAL ORDER by Marion Borel, Randy Bouillion, Brett Broussard, Debora Buczek, John Carter, Scott Clostio, Ron Durand, Arthur Elmer, Brandon Hebert, Sid Hebert, Mike Lasalle, Bill Ringbauer, Jay Shatlock, Ryan Turner, Paul Venable. (aty,Burgess, L)
December 27, 2010 Filing 98 MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable: Mail sent to John Clemens, 525 E Main, New Iberia, LA 70560, re: #96 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment Motion Hearing returned marked: Return to Sender - Attempted - Not Known - Unable to Forward. (crt,Kennedy, T)
December 20, 2010 Filing 97 MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable: Mail sent to John Clemens, 525 E Main, New Iberia, LA 70560, re: #94 Order on Motion for Leave to File returned marked: Return to Sender - Attempted - Not Known - Unable to Forward. (crt,Alexander, E)
December 15, 2010 Filing 96 MINUTES OF COURT for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge C Michael Hill on 12/15/2010. Granting in part and taking under advisement in part #85 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by John Carter, Arthur Elmer, Jay Shatlock, Scott Clostio, Ron Durand, Brandon Hebert, Marion Borel, Ryan Turner, Sid Hebert, Brett Broussard, Randy Bouillion, Mike Lasalle, Paul Venable. (Court Reporter: LaRae Bourque) (crt,Davenport, M)
December 10, 2010 Filing 95 REPLY to Response to Motion re #85 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Sid Hebert. (crt,Kennedy, T)
December 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER granting #93 Motion for Leave to File Reply. Signed by Magistrate Judge C Michael Hill on 12/10/2010. (crt,Kennedy, T)
December 9, 2010 Filing 93 MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition with consent by Sid Hebert. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment, #2 Text of proposed order)(aty,Henke, Kenneth)
December 7, 2010 Filing 92 MANUAL ATTACHMENT received from L Clayton Burgess on behalf of Debora Buczek, Bill Ringbauer regarding #91 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion. The original manual attachments will be maintained in the division of the presiding judge, until expiration of appeal delays. (crt,Gregory, C)
December 6, 2010 Filing 91 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #85 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Debora Buczek, Bill Ringbauer. (Attachments: #1 Statement of material facts, #2 Table of Contents, #3 Table of Authorities, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B (Notice of Manual Attachment), #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit E)(aty,Burgess, L)
November 23, 2010 Filing 90 MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable: Mail sent to John Clemens, 525 E Main, New Iberia, LA 70560, re: #88 Order on Motion to Enroll as Counsel returned marked: Return to Sender - Insufficient Address, Unable to Forward. (crt,Kennedy, T)
November 22, 2010 Filing 89 MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable: Mail sent to John Clemens, 525 E Main, New Iberia, LA 70560, re: #86 Notice of Motion Setting (with oral argument) returned marked: Return to Sender, attempted not known, unable to forward. (crt,Kennedy, T)
November 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER granting #87 Motion to Enroll as Counsel. Added as counsel George Orvis Luce for Marion Borel,George Orvis Luce for Randy Bouillion,George Orvis Luce for Brett Broussard,George Orvis Luce for John Carter,George Orvis Luce for Scott Clostio,George Orvis Luce for Ron Durand,George Orvis Luce for Arthur Elmer,George Orvis Luce for Brandon Hebert,George Orvis Luce for Sid Hebert,George Orvis Luce for Mike Lasalle,George Orvis Luce for Jay Shatlock,George Orvis Luce for Ryan Turner,George Orvis Luce for Paul Venable. Signed by Magistrate Judge C Michael Hill on 11/18/2010. (crt,Kennedy, T)
November 17, 2010 Filing 87 MOTION for George O. Luce to Enroll as Counsel by Sid Hebert, Marion Borel, Randy Bouillion, Brett Broussard, John Carter, Scott Clostio, Ron Durand, Arthur Elmer, Brandon Hebert, Mike Lasalle, Jay Shatlock, Ryan Turner, Paul Venable. (Attachments: #1 Text of proposed order)(aty,Henke, Kenneth) Modified filer on 11/18/2010 (Kennedy, T).
November 17, 2010 Filing 86 NOTICE of Motion Setting with oral argument regarding: #85 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Motion day set for 12/15/2010 10:00 AM in Lafayette, Courtroom 6 before Magistrate Judge C Michael Hill. (crt,Kennedy, T)
November 16, 2010 Filing 85 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Sid Hebert, Ron Durand, Randy Bouillion, Marion Borel, John Carter, Scott Clostio , Mike Lasalle, Brett Broussard , Paul Venable , Ryan Turner, Arthur Elmer, Jay Shatlock , Brandon Hebert . (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Exhibits, #3 Exhibits, #4 Exhibits, #5 Statement of material facts, #6 Text of proposed order)(aty,Henke, Kenneth) Modified filers on 11/17/2010. (Kennedy, T)
July 6, 2010 Filing 84 MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable: Mail sent to John Clemens, 525 E Main, New Iberia, LA 70560, re: #82 Order, Set Hearings, #83 Scheduling Order - Hill, returned marked: Insufficient address, unable to forward. (Attachments: #1 #83) (crt,Kennedy, T)
June 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 83 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 2/7/2011 09:30 AM in Lafayette, Courtroom 6 before Magistrate Judge C Michael Hill. Pretrial Conference set for 1/5/2011 10:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge C Michael Hill. Joinder of Parties and Amendment of Pleadings due by 9/7/2010. Plaintiffs Expert Info/Reports due by 10/12/2010. Discovery due by 10/7/2010. Defendants Expert Info/Reports due by 11/12/2010. Discovery II due by 11/16/2010. Dispositive Motions due by 11/16/2010. Daubert Motions due by 11/16/2010. Motions in Limine due by 12/16/2010. Conference/Meeting of counsel to prepare pretrial order to be held by 12/16/2010. Expert Depositions due by 12/16/2010. Pretrial Order due by 12/29/2010. Trial Brief/Pretrial Submissions due by 12/29/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge C Michael Hill on 6/30/10. (Attachments: #1 Attachments to scheduling order)(crt,Roaix, G)
June 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER SETTING TRIAL Jury Trial set for 2/7/2011 09:30 AM in Lafayette, Courtroom 6 before Magistrate Judge C Michael Hill. Pretrial Conference set for 1/5/2011 10:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge C Michael Hill. The Clerk of Court is directed to issue a new Scheduling Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge C Michael Hill on 08-115. (crt,Roaix, G)
June 29, 2010 Filing 81 MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable: Mail sent to John Clemens, 525 E Main, New Iberia, LA 70560, re: #79 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge returned marked: Insufficient address, unable to forward. (crt,Kennedy, T)
June 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge C Michael Hill for trial. Judge Tucker L Melancon no longer assigned to case as presiding judge. Signed by Judge Tucker L Melancon on 6/21/10. (crt,Kennedy, T)
June 17, 2010 Filing 78 CONSENT to Trial Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Marion Borel, Randy Bouillion, Brett Broussard, Debora Buczek, John Carter, Scott Clostio, Ron Durand, Arthur Elmer, Brandon Hebert, Sid Hebert, Mike Lasalle, Bill Ringbauer, Jay Shatlock, Ryan Turner, Paul Venable. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order of Reference)(crt,Alexander, E)
June 14, 2010 Filing 80 MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable: Mail sent to John Clemens, 525 E Main, New Iberia, LA 70560, re: #76 Judgment returned marked: Attempted not known - Unable to forward. (crt,Kennedy, T)
June 10, 2010 Filing 77 MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable: Mail sent to John Clemens, 525 E Main, New Iberia, LA 70560, re: #75 Minute Entry, #73 Order, Set Hearings, #70 Order Allowing Rule 26 Report, #74 Status Conference returned marked: Insufficient address, unable to forward. (Attachments: #1 Return for document #73, (2) Return for document #74, (3) Return for document #75) (crt,Kennedy, T)
June 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 76 JUDGMENT : ORDERED that the claims of John Clemens be DISMISSED WITHOUTPREJUDICE pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 41(b) and Rule 41.3W, Local Rules for the Western District of Louisiana. Signed by Judge Tucker L Melancon on 6/4/10. (crt,Kennedy, T)
June 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 75 MINUTE ENTRY: A review of the record reflects that John Clemens (Clemens) has failed to participate in these proceedings. Based on Clemens failure to keep the court apprised of an address change in accordance with LR 41.3W and Judge Melanons previous order, the undersigned recommends to Judge Melanon that Clemens claims be dismissed. The Clerk is ORDERED to send a copy of this minute entry to Judge Melanon. Signed by Magistrate Judge C Michael Hill on 6/2/10. (crt,Kennedy, T)
June 2, 2010 Filing 74 MINUTES OF RULE 16 CONFERENCE AND ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge C Michael Hill: STATUS CONFERENCE held on 6/2/2010. (crt,Roaix, G)
May 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER RESETTING RULE 16 CONFERENCE Rule 16 Conference reset for 6/2/2010 10:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge C Michael Hill. Signed by Magistrate Judge C Michael Hill on 5/24/10. (crt,Roaix, G)
May 7, 2010 Filing 72 MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable: Mail sent to John Clemens, 525 E Main, New Iberia, LA 70560, re: #69 Order, Set Hearings returned marked: Insufficient address, unable to forward. (crt,Kennedy, T)
May 7, 2010 Filing 71 RULE 26(f) Report by Marion Borel, Randy Bouillion, Brett Broussard, Debora Buczek, John Carter, John Clemens, Scott Clostio, Channing Credeur, Ron Durand, Arthur Elmer, Brandon Hebert, Sid Hebert, Mike Lasalle, Bill Ringbauer, Jay Shatlock, Ryan Turner, Paul Venable. (crt,Roaix, G)
May 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER: Having reviewed the Rule 26(f) Report and determined it to be complete, IT IS ORDERED that the Clerk of Court file it in the record. Signed by Magistrate Judge C Michael Hill on 5/6/10. (crt,Roaix, G)
April 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER : Rule 16 Conference set for 6/3/2010 11:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge C Michael Hill. At least one attorney for each party shall attend the conference. The attorney attending the conference shall have authority to enter into stipulations and to make admissions regarding all matters involved in this litigation. Signed by Magistrate Judge C Michael Hill on 4/30/10. (crt,Kennedy, T)
March 19, 2010 Filing 68 MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable: Mail sent to John Clemens, 525 E Main, New Iberia, LA 70560 re: #67 Scheduling Order returned marked: Not deliverable as addressed, unable to forward. (crt,Smith, C)
March 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 67 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 3/21/2011 09:30 AM in Lafayette, Courtroom 3 before Judge Tucker L Melancon. Pretrial Conference set for 2/16/2011 02:30 PM in Chambers before Judge Tucker L Melancon. Initial Disclosure due by 4/2/2010. Rule 26 Conference between parties to take place before 4/16/2010. Rule 26 Report due by 4/30/2010. Joinder of Parties and Amendment of Pleadings due by 8/20/2010. Plaintiffs Expert Info/Reports due by 8/20/2010. Discovery due by 9/20/2010. Defendants Expert Info/Reports due by 9/29/2010. Expert Depositions due by 11/8/2010. Dispositive Motions due by 11/18/2010. Daubert Motions due by 12/28/2010. Motions in Limine due by 1/18/2011. Conference/Meeting of counsel to prepare pretrial order to be held by 1/18/2011. Trial Depositions due by 1/18/2011. Pretrial Order due by 2/7/2011. Signed by Chris Smith on 3/12/10. (Attachments: #1 Attachments to scheduling order, #2 Attachments to scheduling order)(crt,Smith, C) Modified on 3/12/2010 to edit text (Smith, C).
September 14, 2009 Filing 66 MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable: John Clemens, 525 E Main, New Iberia LA 70560, re: #65 Judgment Adopting Report and Recommendations, returned marked: insufficient address - unable to forward. (crt,Williams, L)
September 4, 2009 Filing 65 JUDGMENT ADOPTING #60 Report and Recommendations DENYING IN PART AND GRANTING IN PART #48 Motion to Dismiss, filed by John Carter, Arthur Elmer, Jay Shatlock, Scott Clostio, Ron Durand, Brandon Hebert, Marion Borel, Ryan Turner, Sid Hebert, Brett Broussard, Randy Bouillion, Mike Lasalle and Paul Venable: 1) The motion is GRANTED on the official capacity claims against the Deputies, and those claims are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; 2) The motion is DENIED on the official capacity claim against Sheriff Hebert; and 3) The motion is DENIED on the individual capacity claims against the Deputies. Signed by Judge Tucker L Melancon on 9/4/09. (crt,Smith, C)
August 6, 2009 Filing 64 RESPONSE by Bill Ringbauer, Debora Buczek re #62 Objection to Report and Recommendations,. (aty,Burgess, L)
July 22, 2009 Filing 62 OBJECTION to #60 Report and Recommendations by Sid Hebert, Ron Durand, Randy Bouillion, Marion Borel, John Carter, Scott Clostio, Mike Lasalle, Brett Broussard, Paul Venable, Ryan Turner, Arthur Elmer, Jay Shatlock, Brandon Hebert. (aty,Henke, Kenneth)
July 20, 2009 Filing 63 MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable: John Clemens, 525 E Main, New Iberia LA 70560, re: #60 Report and Recommendations, returned marked: Insufficient address. (crt,Williams, L)
July 13, 2009 Filing 61 MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable: Mail sent to John Clemens, 525 E Main, New Iberia, LA 70560, re: #59 Motion Hearing, returned marked: Return to sender - Attempted - Not Known - Unable to Forward. (crt,Alexander, E)
July 13, 2009 Filing 60 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #48 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Claims Under Rule 12(b)(6) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Claims Under Rule 12(b)(6) filed by John Carter, Arthur Elmer, Jay Shatlock, Scott Clostio, Ron Durand, Brandon Hebert, Marion Borel, Ryan Turner, Sid Hebert, Brett Broussard, Randy Bouillion, Mike Lasalle, Paul Venable Objections to R&R due by 7/30/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge C Michael Hill on 7/13/09. (crt,Roaix, G)
June 17, 2009 Filing 59 MINUTES OF HEARING ON RULE 12(b)(6) MOTION TO DISMISS for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge C Michael Hill: MOTION HEARING held on 6/17/2009 re #48 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Claims Under Rule 12(b)(6) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Claims Under Rule 12(b)(6) filed by John Carter, Arthur Elmer, Jay Shatlock, Scott Clostio, Ron Durand, Brandon Hebert, Marion Borel, Ryan Turner, Sid Hebert, Brett Broussard, Randy Bouillion, Mike Lasalle, Paul Venable. (Court Reporter: Mary Thompson) (crt,Roaix, G)
June 11, 2009 Filing 58 MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable: John Clemens, 525 E Main, New Iberia LA 70560, re: #55 Order on Motion for Leave to File returned marked: Insufficient address. (crt,Williams, L)
June 11, 2009 Filing 57 MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable: John Clemen, 525 E Main, New Iberia, LA 70560, re: #54 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney returned marked: Insufficient address. (crt,Williams, L)
June 5, 2009 Filing 56 REPLY to Response to Motion re #48 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Claims Under Rule 12(b)(6) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Claims Under Rule 12(b)(6) filed by Sid Hebert, Ron Durand, Randy Bouillion, Marion Borel, John Carter, Scott Clostio, Mike Lasalle, Brett Broussard, Paul Venable, Ryan Turner, Arthur Elmer, Jay Shatlock, Brandon Hebert. (crt,Alexander, E)
June 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER granting #52 Motion for Leave to File Reply to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge C Michael Hill on 6/5/09. (crt,Alexander, E)
June 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting #44 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney L Clayton Burgess and Lauren Kay Ledet terminated. Signed by Judge Tucker L Melancon on 6/4/09. (crt,Alexander, E)
June 4, 2009 Filing 53 MINUTES for proceedings held before Judge Tucker L Melancon: MOTION HEARING held on 6/4/2009 re #44 MOTION to Withdraw L. Clayton Burgess & Lauren K. Ledet as Attorney filed by John Clemens. (Court Reporter: LaRae Bourque) (crt,Jordan, Paula)
June 4, 2009 Motions Transferred regarding #52 MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss with consent sought but not obtained MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss with consent sought but not obtained. Motions referred to C Michael Hill. (crt,Williams, L)
June 4, 2009 Filing 52 MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss with consent sought but not obtained by Sid Hebert, Ron Durand, Randy Bouillion, Marion Borel, John Carter, Scott Clostio, Mike Lasalle, Brett Broussard, Paul Venable, Ryan Turner, Arthur Elmer, Jay Shatlock, Brandon Hebert. (Attachments: #1 Text of proposed order, #2 Proposed Reply Brief)(aty,Henke, Kenneth)
May 27, 2009 Filing 51 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #48 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Claims Under Rule 12(b)(6) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Claims Under Rule 12(b)(6) filed by Bill Ringbauer, Debora Buczek, John Clemens. (Attachments: #1 Table of Contents, #2 Table of Authorities)(aty,Burgess, L)
May 13, 2009 Filing 50 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Unexecuted re 47 Order. (crt,Williams, L)
May 12, 2009 Filing 49 NOTICE of Motion Setting with oral argument regarding: #48 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Claims Under Rule 12(b)(6). Motion day set for 6/17/2009 10:00 AM in Lafayette, Courtroom 6 before Magistrate Judge C Michael Hill. (crt,Alexander, E)
May 12, 2009 Filing 48 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Claims Under Rule 12(b)(6) by Sid Hebert, Ron Durand, Randy Bouillion, Marion Borel, John Carter, Scott Clostio, Mike Lasalle, Brett Broussard, Paul Venable, Ryan Turner, Arthur Elmer, Jay Shatlock, Brandon Hebert. Motions referred to C Michael Hill. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Text of proposed order)(aty,Henke, Kenneth)
May 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER denying #43 Proposed Plan of Work. Signed by Judge Tucker L Melancon on 05/01/09. (crt,Williams, L) Modified on 5/8/2009 to assign document number(Williams, L).
May 5, 2009 Filing 46 CORRECTIVE DOCUMENT entitled Order filed by Bill Ringbauer, Debora Buczek, Sid Hebert, John Clemens, Ron Durand, Randy Bouillion, Marion Borel, John Carter, Scott Clostio, Mike Lasalle, Brett Broussard, Paul Venable, Ryan Turner, Arthur Elmer, Jay Shatlock, Brandon Hebert regarding #45 Notice of Deficiency,,. (aty,Burgess, L)
May 1, 2009 Filing 45 NOTICE of Deficiency to L Clayton Burgess on behalf of Bill Ringbauer, Debora Buczek, Sid Hebert, John Clemens, Ron Durand, Randy Bouillion, Marion Borel, John Carter, Scott Clostio, Mike Lasalle, Brett Broussard, Paul Venable, Ryan Turner, Arthur Elmer, Jay Shatlock, Brandon Hebert regarding #43 DEFICIENT? Joint PROPOSED Plan of Work. Reason: Either no proposed order accompanied this motion or the proposed order was not on a separate page. Please see LR7.4.1W or LR58.1 for additional information. (crt,Williams, L)
April 29, 2009 Motions Transferred regarding #44 MOTION to Withdraw L. Clayton Burgess & Lauren K. Ledet as Attorney. Motions referred to Tucker L Melancon. (crt,Williams, L)
April 29, 2009 Filing 44 MOTION to Withdraw L. Clayton Burgess & Lauren K. Ledet as Attorney by John Clemens. Motions referred to C Michael Hill. (Attachments: #1 Text of proposed order)(aty,Burgess, L)
April 29, 2009 Filing 43 Joint PROPOSED Plan of Work by Bill Ringbauer, Debora Buczek, Sid Hebert, John Clemens, Ron Durand, Randy Bouillion, Marion Borel, John Carter, Scott Clostio, Mike Lasalle, Brett Broussard, Paul Venable, Ryan Turner, Arthur Elmer, Jay Shatlock, Brandon Hebert. (Attachments: #1 Signature Page)(aty,Burgess, L) Modified on 5/1/2009 to reflect submission as Deficient(Williams, L). Modified on 5/5/2009 to remove deficiency notation - See doc #46 Corrective Document entitled Proposed Order(Williams, L).
April 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting #41 Joint/Voluntary Motion to Dismiss. Channing Credeur terminated. Signed by Judge Tucker L Melancon on 04/01/09. (crt,Williams, L)
March 31, 2009 Filing 41 Unopposed JOINT/VOLUNTARY MOTION to Dismiss DEPUTY CHANNING CREDEUR by Bill Ringbauer, Debora Buczek, John Clemens. (Attachments: #1 Text of proposed order, #2 Certificate)(aty,Burgess, L)
December 1, 2008 NOTICE of Corrective Action regarding #40 Answer to Amended Complaint. Action taken: Docket entry modified to remove jury demand from entry since jury demand was not contained within pleadings; court's docket sheet has been modified to remove reference. (crt,Williams, L)
December 1, 2008 Filing 40 ANSWER to #22 Amended Complaint by Ron Durand, Randy Bouillion, Marion Borel, John Carter, Scott Clostio, Mike Lasalle, Brett Broussard, Paul Venable, Ryan Turner, Arthur Elmer, Jay Shatlock, Brandon Hebert.(aty,Henke, Kenneth) Modified on 12/2/2008 to remove jury demand as the same was not written in the original Answer (Williams, L).
November 13, 2008 Filing 39 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bill Ringbauer, Debora Buczek, John Clemens. Ron Durand served on 10/12/2008, answer due 11/3/2008. (aty,Burgess, L)
November 13, 2008 Filing 38 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bill Ringbauer, Debora Buczek, John Clemens. Channing Credeur served on 10/12/2008, answer due 11/3/2008. (aty,Burgess, L)
November 13, 2008 Filing 37 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bill Ringbauer, Debora Buczek, John Clemens. John Carter served on 10/6/2008, answer due 10/27/2008. (aty,Burgess, L)
November 13, 2008 Filing 36 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bill Ringbauer, Debora Buczek, John Clemens. Scott Clostio served on 10/6/2008, answer due 10/27/2008. (aty,Burgess, L)
November 13, 2008 Filing 35 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bill Ringbauer, Debora Buczek, John Clemens. Arthur Elmer served on 10/6/2008, answer due 10/27/2008. (aty,Burgess, L)
November 13, 2008 Filing 34 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bill Ringbauer, Debora Buczek, John Clemens. Paul Venable served on 10/6/2008, answer due 10/27/2008. (aty,Burgess, L)
November 13, 2008 Filing 33 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bill Ringbauer, Debora Buczek, John Clemens. Jay Shatlock served on 10/6/2008, answer due 10/27/2008. (aty,Burgess, L)
November 13, 2008 Filing 32 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bill Ringbauer, Debora Buczek, John Clemens. Brandon Hebert served on 10/24/2008, answer due 11/13/2008. (aty,Burgess, L)
November 13, 2008 Filing 31 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bill Ringbauer, Debora Buczek, John Clemens. Brett Broussard served on 10/6/2008, answer due 10/27/2008. (aty,Burgess, L)
November 13, 2008 Filing 30 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bill Ringbauer, Debora Buczek, John Clemens. Randy Bouillion served on 10/6/2008, answer due 10/27/2008. (aty,Burgess, L)
November 13, 2008 Filing 29 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bill Ringbauer, Debora Buczek, John Clemens. Marion Borel served on 10/6/2008, answer due 10/27/2008. (aty,Burgess, L)
November 13, 2008 Filing 28 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bill Ringbauer, Debora Buczek, John Clemens. Mike Lasalle served on 10/6/2008, answer due 10/27/2008. (aty,Burgess, L)
November 13, 2008 Filing 27 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bill Ringbauer, Debora Buczek, John Clemens. Ryan Turner served on 10/6/2008, answer due 10/27/2008. (aty,Burgess, L)
October 1, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #25 Motion to Continue Trial. Signed by Judge Tucker L Melancon on 10/01/08. (crt,Williams, L)
September 22, 2008 Motions Transferred regarding #25 MOTION to Continue trial with consent. Motions referred to Tucker L Melancon. (crt,Williams, L)
September 22, 2008 Filing 25 MOTION to Continue trial with consent by Bill Ringbauer, Debora Buczek, John Clemens. Motions referred to C Michael Hill. (Attachments: #1 Certificate, #2 Text of proposed order)(aty,Burgess, L) Modified on 9/22/2008 to edit text (Williams, L).
September 19, 2008 Filing 24 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ron Durand, Randy Bouillion, Marion Borel, John Carter, Scott Clostio, Mike Lasalle, Brett Broussard, Paul Venable, Ryan Turner, Arthur Elmer, Jay Shatlock, Channing Credeur, Brandon Hebert. (crt,Alexander, E)
September 18, 2008 Filing 23 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued as to Ron Durand, Randy Bouillion, Marion Borel, John Carter, Scott Clostio, Mike Lasalle, Brett Broussard, Paul Venable, Ryan Turner, Arthur Elmer, Jay Shatlock, Channing Credeur, Brandon Hebert, submitted by Bill Ringbauer, Debora Buczek, John Clemens. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons, #6 Proposed Summons, #7 Proposed Summons, #8 Proposed Summons, #9 Proposed Summons, #10 Proposed Summons, #11 Proposed Summons, #12 Proposed Summons)(aty,Burgess, L)
August 26, 2008 Filing 22 FIRST AMENDING COMPLAINT against Ron Durand, Randy Bouillion, Marion Borel, John Carter, Scott Clostio, Mike Lasalle, Brett Broussard, Paul Venable, Ryan Turner, Arthur Elmer, Jay Shatlock, Channing Credeur, Brandon Hebert, Sid Hebert filed by Bill Ringbauer, Debora Buczek, John Clemens.(crt,Williams, L)
August 26, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #20 Motion to Amend/Correct Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge C Michael Hill on 08/26/08. (crt,Williams, L)
August 25, 2008 Filing 20 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint with consent sought but not obtained by Bill Ringbauer, Debora Buczek. Motions referred to C Michael Hill. (Attachments: #1 Text of proposed order, #2 Proposed pleading, #3 Certificate)(aty,Burgess, L)
August 20, 2008 Filing 19 JUDGMENT denying #9 Motion to Dismiss; adopting Report and Recommendations re #16 Report and Recommendations.. Signed by Judge Tucker L Melancon on 8/20/08. (crt,Jordan, P)
July 17, 2008 Filing 16 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #9 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Claims filed by Sid Hebert Objections to R&R due by 8/4/2008. IT IS RECOMMENDED THAT motion be DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge C Michael Hill on 7/16/08. Sent copy of R&R to TLM & GR(crt,Jordan, P)
July 17, 2008 Filing 15 MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge C Michael Hill: denying #9 Motion to Dismiss; MOTION HEARING held on 7/17/2008 re #9 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Claims filed by Sid Hebert. Written reasons for the ruling shall issue. (crt,Jordan, P)
July 17, 2008 Filing 14 RULE 26(f) Report. (crt,Williams, L)
July 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Having reviewed the Rule 26(f) Report and determined it to be complete, IT IS ORDERED that the Clerk of Court file it in the record. Signed by Magistrate Judge C Michael Hill on 07/16/08. (crt,Williams, L)
July 12, 2008 Filing 18 REPLY to #9 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Claims filed by Sid Hebert. (crt,Williams, L)
July 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Leave to File Reply Memorandum. Signed by Magistrate Judge C Michael Hill on 07/12/08. (crt,Williams, L)
July 9, 2008 Motions Transferred regarding #12 MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Motions referred to C Michael Hill. (crt,Williams, L)
July 9, 2008 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by Sid Hebert. (Attachments: #1 Text of proposed order, #2 Proposed Reply Brief)(aty,Henke, Kenneth) Modified on 7/10/2008 to remove consent language not included within text of Main Document(Williams, L).
July 1, 2008 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Claims filed by Bill Ringbauer, Debora Buczek. (aty,Burgess, L)
June 18, 2008 Filing 10 NOTICE of Motion Setting with oral argument regarding: #9 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Claims. Motion day set for 7/16/2008 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge C Michael Hill. (crt,Williams, L)
June 17, 2008 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Claims by Sid Hebert. Motions referred to C Michael Hill. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief)(aty,Henke, Kenneth)
June 6, 2008 Filing 8 RESPONSE to Order by Bill Ringbauer, Debora Buczek re #7 Order,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(aty,Burgess, L)
May 20, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER IT IS ORDERED that the plaintiff file th a Fed. R. Civ. P. 7(a) reply to the qualified immunity defense pled by the defendant within twenty (20) days of receipt of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge C Michael Hill on 5/20/08. (crt,Roaix, G)
May 16, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 3/23/2009 09:30 AM in Lafayette, courtroom 3 before Judge Tucker L Melancon. Pretrial Conference set for 2/19/2009 03:00 PM in Chambers before Judge Tucker L Melancon. Initial Disclosure due by 6/6/2008. Rule 26 Conference between parties to take place before 6/20/2008. Rule 26 Report due by 7/7/2008. Joinder of Parties and Amendment of Pleadings due by 8/25/2008. Plaintiffs Expert Info/Reports due by 8/25/2008. Discovery due by 9/22/2008. Defendants Expert Info/Reports due by 10/2/2008. Expert Depositions due by 11/12/2008. Dispositive Motions due by 11/21/2008. Daubert Motions due by 12/31/2008. Motions in Limine due by 1/20/2009. Conference/Meeting of counsel to prepare pretrial order to be held by 1/20/2009. Trial Depositions due by 1/20/2009. Pretrial Order due by 2/9/2009.. Signed by Paula S. Jordan on 5/16/08. (Attachments: #1 Attachments to scheduling order, #2 Attachments to scheduling order)(crt,Jordan, P)
April 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Enroll as Co-Counsel. Added as co-counsel Kenneth M Henke for Sid Hebert. Signed by Magistrate Judge C Michael Hill on April 24, 2008. (crt,Dean, S)
April 22, 2008 Filing 4 MOTION for Kenneth M. Henke to Enroll as Counsel by Sid Hebert. Motions referred to C Michael Hill. (Attachments: #1 Text of proposed order)(aty,Henke, Kenneth)
March 7, 2008 Filing 3 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Sid Hebert.(aty,Montegut, Ryan)
February 1, 2008 FILING FEE: on behalf of Bill Ringbauer, Debora Buczek in the amount of $350.00, receipt number 54635010834 (crt,Luce, Tori)
January 28, 2008 CASE assigned to Judge Tucker L Melancon and Magistrate Judge C Michael Hill. (crt,Dunford, T)
January 28, 2008 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Sid Hebert. (crt,Thigpen, M)
January 28, 2008 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Sid Hebert with Jury Demand filed by Bill Ringbauer, Debora Buczek. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Civil cover sheet)(crt,Thigpen, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ringbauer et al v. Hebert et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sid Hebert
Represented By: George Orvis Luce
Represented By: Ryan Stephen Montegut
Represented By: Kenneth M Henke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Carter
Represented By: George Orvis Luce
Represented By: Kenneth M Henke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Clostio
Represented By: George Orvis Luce
Represented By: Kenneth M Henke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Channing Credeur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marion Borel
Represented By: George Orvis Luce
Represented By: Kenneth M Henke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Turner
Represented By: George Orvis Luce
Represented By: Kenneth M Henke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Venable
Represented By: George Orvis Luce
Represented By: Kenneth M Henke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brett Broussard
Represented By: George Orvis Luce
Represented By: Kenneth M Henke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Durand
Represented By: George Orvis Luce
Represented By: Kenneth M Henke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Lasalle
Represented By: George Orvis Luce
Represented By: Kenneth M Henke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Bouillion
Represented By: George Orvis Luce
Represented By: Kenneth M Henke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon Hebert
Represented By: George Orvis Luce
Represented By: Kenneth M Henke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff of Iberia Parish
Represented By: George Orvis Luce
Represented By: Ryan Stephen Montegut
Represented By: Kenneth M Henke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay Shatlock
Represented By: George Orvis Luce
Represented By: Kenneth M Henke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arthur Elmer
Represented By: George Orvis Luce
Represented By: Kenneth M Henke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debora Buczek
Represented By: L Clayton Burgess
Represented By: Lauren Ledet Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Clemens
Represented By: L Clayton Burgess
Represented By: Lauren Ledet Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bill Ringbauer
Represented By: L Clayton Burgess
Represented By: Lauren Ledet Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?