Cormier et al vs. Lafayette City-Parish Consolidated Government et al
Plaintiff: Joseph Bowman Cormier and Mary Ann Henry Cormier
Defendant: Lafayette City-Parish Consolidated Government, City Police of Lafayette, City Prosecutors Office of Lafayette, Earl Picard, Timothy Picard, Gary J. Haynes, Shane M Mouton, Nolvey Stelly, Heather Martin and Chase Guidry
Case Number: 6:2009cv00703
Filed: April 28, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Office: Lafayette Office
County: Lafayette
Presiding Judge:
Presiding Judge: Rebecca F Doherty
Presiding Judge: Mildred E Methvin
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 149 MEMORANDUM RULING granting in part and denying in part 145 Motion for Bill of Costs. The motion is granted to the extent that the Court has reviewed the Clerk of Court's taxation of costs, but the motion is denied to the extent that the p laintiff seeks to alter the Clerks taxation of costs. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that costs are taxed for the defendants Earl Picard and Timothy Picard and against the plaintiff, Joseph Bowman Cormier, in the amount of $855.00. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 10/22/2013. (crt,Dauterive, C)
August 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 138 MEMORANDUM RULING...The Court concludes that Mr. Cormier has not proven the elements of his § 1983 claim, has not proven the elements of his defamation claim, and has not proven the existence of a conspiracy to abridge his constitutional rights or to defame him. Therefore, Mr. Cormier is not entitled to recover any damages from the defendants.Judgment in favor of defendants Timothy Picard and Earl Nickey Picard will be entered. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 8/12/13. (crt,Jordan, Paula)
November 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 105 Motion for Certification of Court Rulings on Motions for Summary Judgment for Interlocutory and/or Final Appeal. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this case be STAYED until such time as theCourt of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit resolves the appeal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 11/22/2011. (crt,Dauterive, C)
November 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 102 RULING ON MOTION re 73 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Nolvey Stelly, Heather Martin, Chase Guidry, Shane M Mouton, Gary J Haynes, Lafayette City-Parish Consolidated Government IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 11/08/11. (crt,Guidry, C)
October 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 99 MEMORANDUM RULING re 75 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Shane M Mouton, Gary J Haynes, Lafayette City-Parish Consolidated Government. The motion is granted in part and denied in part. Claims against the defendants Shane M. Mouton and Gary J. Haynes are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 10/28/2011. (crt,Davenport, M)
August 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 69 RULING ON MOTION denying 53 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 8/10/2011. (crt,Dauterive, C)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cormier et al vs. Lafayette City-Parish Consolidated Government et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Bowman Cormier
Represented By: Kathleen E Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Ann Henry Cormier
Represented By: Kathleen E Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lafayette City-Parish Consolidated Government
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City Police of Lafayette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City Prosecutors Office of Lafayette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Earl Picard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Picard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary J. Haynes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shane M Mouton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nolvey Stelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heather Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chase Guidry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?