Akers v. Shaw Environmental Inc et al
Plaintiff: Ronald Akers
Defendant: Shaw Environmental Inc and Shaw Environmental & Infrastructure Inc
Case Number: 6:2009cv00915
Filed: June 3, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Office: Lafayette Office
County: Lafayette
Presiding Judge:
Presiding Judge: Rebecca F Doherty
Presiding Judge: Mildred E Methvin
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:1333 Admiralty
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 53 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 4/7/2011. (crt,Kennedy, T)
March 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 52 MEMORANDUM RULING AND ORDER granting 48 Motion to Compel against Ronald Akers. Plaintiff shall fully respond to all of the propounded discovery requests as ordered herein with 10 days from the date of this Order. An affidavit of attorneys fees and expenses incurred in filing the motion shall be submitted as a Motion for Attorneys Fees within 14 days of the date of this Order. Plaintiff shall have 7 days to respond, after which time the matter will be considered submitted for decision.; grantin g 49 Motion to Compel against David McGrath. McGrath shall fully respond to interrogatory numbers 10, 11, and 12 and requests for production numbers 5, 6, and 7 within 10 days of the date of this Order. An affidavit of attorneys fees and expenses i ncurred in filing the motion shallbe submitted as a Motion for Attorneys Fees within 14 days of the date of this Order. Plaintiff shall have 7 days to respond, after which time the matter will be considered submitted for decision. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 3/14/2011. (crt,Kennedy, T)
August 31, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 43 JUDGMENT ADOPTING 41 Report and Recommendations 12 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Shaw Environmental Inc, Shaw Environmental & Infrastructure Inc is DENIED. Signed by Judge Rebecca F Doherty on 08/31/10. (crt,Guidry, C)
January 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MINUTE ENTRY: re 12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Rule 12(b)(1) for Lack of Subject Matter filed by Shaw Environmental Inc, Shaw Environmental & Infrastructure Inc. IT IS ORDERED that the decision on defendants' motion to dismiss is DEFERRED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs' be allowed until 2/1/2010 to conduct Discovery related solely to the issue of subject matter jurisdiction. Any supplemental brief shall be filed by plaintiffs on or before 2/15/2010. Any response by defendants shall be filed on or before 2/22/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 01/07/10. (crt,Yocum, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Akers v. Shaw Environmental Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Akers
Represented By: Joseph R Joy, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shaw Environmental Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shaw Environmental & Infrastructure Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?