Diamond Services Corp v. Oceanografia S A De C V

Plaintiff: Diamond Services Corp
Defendant: Oceanografia S A De C V
Case Number: 6:2010cv00177
Filed: February 8, 2010
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Lafayette Office
County: St. Mary
0 Judge:
Presiding Judge: Rebecca F Doherty
Referring Judge: C Michael Hill
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333 Admiralty
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 19, 2014 184 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 177 MOTION for Default Judgment as to CON-Dive, LLC filed by Diamond Services Corp. IT IS ORDERED that the Motion for Default Judgment Doc. 177 filed by plaintiff Diamond Services Corp is DENIED. It is further ORDERED that the Clerk's Entry of Default Doc. 172 is hereby VACATED. Signed by Judge Rebecca F Doherty on 3/19/14. (crt,Kennedy, T)
January 24, 2013 156 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 152 MOTION to Set Aside Default (corrective document) filed by Oceanografia S A De C V, 140 MOTION for Default Judgment as to CON-Dive, LLC filed by Diamond Services Corp. Signed by Judge Rebecca F Doherty on 1/24/13. (crt,Kennedy, T)
March 15, 2011 64 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ADOPTING 59 Report and Recommendations. Accordingly, IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED 23 Motion to Dismiss filed by Candies Family Investments L L C, 19 Motion to Dismiss filed by Zurich American Insurance Co, 22 Motion to Dismiss filed by Otto Candies L L C are DENIED. Signed by Judge Rebecca F Doherty on 3/15/11. (crt,Guidry, C)
January 12, 2011 57 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING re 38 APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Judge filed by Zurich American Insurance Co, Otto Candies L L C, Candies Family Investments L L C. Signed by Judge Rebecca F Doherty on 1/12/2011. (crt,Alexander, E)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Diamond Services Corp v. Oceanografia S A De C V
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oceanografia S A De C V
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diamond Services Corp
Represented By: Bradley G Frizzell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?