Guidry et al v. Chevron U S A Inc

Plaintiff: Branden Guidry
Case Number: 6:2010cv00868
Filed: May 27, 2010
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Lafayette Office
County: Lafayette
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 43:1331 General Maritime/OCSLA
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 28, 2011 159 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, FINDINGS OF FACT, CONCLUSIONS OF LAW granting in part and denying in part 139 Motion for Declaratory Judgment; granting 158 Motion to Intervene. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 12/28/2011. (crt,Kennedy, T)
August 18, 2011 98 Opinion or Order of the Court Memorandum Ruling and Judgment granting 81 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Danos & Curole Marine Contractors, L.L.C.Signed by Judge Tucker L Melancon on August 18, 2011. (crt,Bacon, C)
August 8, 2011 92 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 68 MOTION for Summary Judgment To Dismiss Complaint of Intervention filed by Branden Guidry, Terra Nicole Richard Guidry. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 8/8/11. (crt,Jordan, P)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guidry et al v. Chevron U S A Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Branden Guidry
Represented By: Paul Jerome Guilliot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?