Benoit v. Neustrom et al

Plaintiff: Michael James Benoit
Defendant: Michael W Neustrom and Rob Reardon
Case Number: 6:2010cv01110
Filed: July 9, 2010
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Lafayette Office
County: Lafayette
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 14, 2013 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 75 Motion to Authorize Creation of Trust Pursuant to The Omnibus Budget Reconciliation Act of 1993 and to Authorize Transfer of Settlement Proceeds to Trust; granting 75 Motion to Appoint Custodian. Sheila Benoit appointed as Trustee of the "Michael Benoit Special Needs Trust." Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 05/14/13. (crt,Yocum, M)
April 17, 2013 74 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS OF FACT, CONCLUSIONS OF LAW, AND ORDERS granting in part and denying in part 69 Motion for Declaratory Judgment as stated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 04/17/13. (crt,Yocum, M)
August 25, 2011 46 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART as to Motion to Dismiss 28 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 8/25/11. (crt,Brazell, G)
January 10, 2011 11 Opinion or Order of the Court RULE 7(a) HEIGHTENED PLEADING REVIEW. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 1/10/11. (crt,Smith, C)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Benoit v. Neustrom et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael W Neustrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rob Reardon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael James Benoit
Represented By: Rebekah R Huggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?