Case name not on file

Case Number: 6:2010cv01487
Filed: September 24, 2010
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Lafayette Office
County: Acadia
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 17, 2012 41 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 39 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Extreme Energy Services L L C. IT IS ORDERED that the instant motion is hereby GRANTED, and Extreme Energy is entitled to summary judgment in its favor on its open account claim, a s well as its claims for legal interest and attorneys' fees, against Gator Energy. Considering the foregoing, it is ordered that judgment in the amount of $200,876.53 is granted to Extreme Energy, plus legal interest from the date the amou nt was due pursuant to Article 200 of the Louisiana Civil Code, and reasonable attorneys' fees pursuant to La. Rev. Stat. Section 9:2781(A) and (E)(2). IT IS ORDERED that the Court's Ruling on this matter is dispositive of all claims remaining in the case. Therefore, the parties shall submit a Final Judgment, approved as to form, within ten (10) days of the date of this Ruling. Signed by Judge Rebecca F Doherty on 5/17/12. (crt,Guidry, C)
February 16, 2012 31 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 28 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Extreme Energy Services L L C. Signed by Judge Rebecca F Doherty on 2/16/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(crt,Kennedy, T)
July 12, 2011 25 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ADOPTING 13 Motion to Stay filed by Gator Energy Services L L C, 13 Motion to Dismiss filed by Gator Energy Services L L C, 24 Report and Recommendations. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that defendant, Gator Energy Operating, LLC's motion to stay or dismiss this lawsuit 13 is DENIED, consistent with the report and recommendation. Signed by Judge Rebecca F Doherty on 7/12/11. (crt,Guidry, C)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case:
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?