Richard v. Anadarko Petroleum Corp et al

Plaintiff: Raylin Richard
Defendant: Anadarko Petroleum Corp, Dolphin Drilling Ltd, Hunting Energy Services Inc and Smith International Inc
Case Number: 6:2011cv00083
Filed: January 25, 2011
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Lafayette Office
County: Lafayette
Presiding Judge: Rebecca F Doherty
Referring Judge: C Michael Hill
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 15, 2015 397 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING re 393 Bench Trial - Begun. Signed by Chief Judge Dee D Drell on 12/15/2015. (crt,Bunting, M) Modified on to correct docket text 12/15/2015 (Bunting, M).
December 2, 2015 386 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 265 MOTION for Summary Judgment Regarding Drilling Rig Exclusion filed by Valiant Insurance Co, 266 MOTION for Summary Judgment Regarding OES's Claims Against Valiant for Contractual Liability Coverage filed by Valiant Insurance Co, 321 MOTION to Strike 281 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, filed by Valiant Insurance Co, 264 MOTION for Summary Judgment Regarding Additional Insured Coverage filed by Valiant Insurance Co, 295 MOTION to Strike 291 Supplemental Memorandum in Support of Motion (Exhibit A - R.Doc. 291-1) filed by Offshore Energy Services Inc. Signed by Chief Judge Dee D Drell on 12/02/15. (crt,Tice, Y)
October 28, 2015 336 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING re 263 MOTION for Summary Judgment re Amended Cross Claim of OES filed by Liberty Mutual Insurance Co. Signed by Chief Judge Dee D Drell on 10/28/15. (crt,Tice, Y)
March 24, 2015 242 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 222 MOTION for Reconsideration re 125 Memorandum Ruling, 126 Order filed by Dolphin Drilling Ltd, Smith International Inc, Offshore Energy Services Inc, 211 MOTION for Reconsideration re 125 Memorandum Ru ling and Request for Reformation filed by Anadarko Petroleum Corp, 200 MOTION for Summary Judgment Against Dolphin Drilling Ltd and Smith International Inc on Counterclaim filed by Liberty Mutual Insurance Co. Signed by Chief Judge Dee D Drell on 3/24/15. (crt,Bunting, M)
March 17, 2014 175 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING re 133 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Hunting Energy Services Inc. Signed by Chief Judge Dee D Drell on 3/17/14. (crt,Roaix, G)
June 21, 2013 125 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 91 MOTION for Summary Judgment against Offshore Energy Services on Cross Claim filed by Liberty Mutual Insurance Co, 105 MOTION for Reconsideration re 87 Memorandum Ruling, filed by Anadarko Petroleum Corp is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Rebecca F Doherty on June 21, 2013. (crt,Bacon, C)
October 2, 2012 87 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING granting 60 MOTION for Summary Judgment, granting 81 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum, granting 82 MOTION for Leave to File To Exceed Page Limitation filed by Liberty Mutual Insurance Co. Signed by Judge Rebecca F Doherty on 10/2/2012. (crt,Dauterive, C)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richard v. Anadarko Petroleum Corp et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raylin Richard
Represented By: Aaron J Allen
Represented By: Miles A Matt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anadarko Petroleum Corp
Represented By: Thomas A Rayer, Jr
Represented By: Thomas J Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dolphin Drilling Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hunting Energy Services Inc
Represented By: Carl W Robicheaux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith International Inc
Represented By: Tobin J Eason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?