Fontenette v. Blue Marlin Services LLC et al

Plaintiff: John Fontenette
Defendant: Blue Marlin Services L L C, Apache Corp Offshore L L C and The Brave
Case Number: 6:2011cv00584
Filed: April 13, 2011
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Lafayette Office
County: Lafayette
Referring Judge: C Michael Hill
Presiding Judge: Tucker L Melancon
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 46:0688
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 10, 2012 77 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 68 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Cal Dive Offshore Contractors Inc, 69 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Apache Corp. Signed by Judge Tucker L Melancon on 8/10/12. (crt,Jordan, P)
May 30, 2012 64 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 52 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Blue Marlin Services L L C, 58 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Apache Corp, Cal Dive Offshore Contractors Inc. The Court grants defendants moti ons for partial summary judgment and dismisses plaintiffs claims against all defendants under the Jones Act and plaintiffs claim against Blue Marlin under the general maritime law. Signed by Judge Tucker L Melancon on 5/30/2012. (crt,Davenport, M)
November 3, 2011 37 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ADOPTING 34 Report and Recommendations, 24 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction filed by The Brave. ORDERED that the Motion to Dismiss filed by THE BRAVE [Rec. Doc. 24] forlack of in rem jurisdiction, is GRANTED, and this action is DISMISSED WITHOUTPREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Tucker L Melancon on 11/3/11. (crt,Jordan, P)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fontenette v. Blue Marlin Services LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Marlin Services L L C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apache Corp Offshore L L C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Brave
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Fontenette
Represented By: James Patrick MacManus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?