Diamond Services Corp v. British European & Overseas P & I Insurance et al

Plaintiff: Diamond Services Corp
Defendant: British European & Overseas P & I Insurance, International Insurance Co of Hanover Ltd, A G C S Marine Insurance Co, Catlin Insurance Co, Stiel Insurance Services of New Orleans Inc, Colemont Insurance Brokers of Texas L P, Lamorte Burns & Co Inc and Certain Solvent Underwriters at Lloyds London
Case Number: 6:2011cv00772
Filed: May 20, 2011
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Lafayette Office
County: St. Mary
Presiding Judge: Rebecca F Doherty
Referring Judge: C Michael Hill
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 23, 2014 157 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 127 Motion to Remand. This lawsuit is Remanded to the 16th Judicial District Court for St. Mary Parish,Louisiana. Signed by Magistrate Judge C Michael Hill on 6/20/2014. (crt,Dauterive, C)
February 26, 2014 132 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 125 Unopposed MOTION For Entry of Final Judgment re 124 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Catlin Insurance Co Inc, Certain Solvent Underwriters at Lloyds London and Firemans Fund Insurance Co. The motion is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Rebecca F Doherty on 2/26/2014. (crt,Dauterive, C)
February 24, 2014 129 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 125 Unopposed MOTION For Entry of Final Judgment re 124 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Catlin Insurance Co Inc, Certain Solvent Underwriters at Lloyds London, Firemans Fund Insurance Co. In light of the foregoing, Lloyd's motion for entry of final judgment 125 is DENIED. Signed by Judge Rebecca F Doherty on 2/24/14. (crt,Guidry, C)
September 24, 2013 123 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 91 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Certain Solvent Underwriters at Lloyds London, Catlin Insurance Co and 113 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Firemans Fund Insurance Co. Signed by Judge Rebecca F Doherty on 9/23/2013. (crt,Dauterive, C)
September 27, 2012 88 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 39 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Colemont Insurance Brokers of Texas Inc, 39 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim filed by Colemont Insurance Brokers of Texas Inc. Signed by Judge Rebecca F Doherty on 9/27/12. (crt,Guidry, C)
September 24, 2012 86 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING denying 25 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim filed by Stiel Insurance Services of New Orleans Inc. Signed by Judge Rebecca F Doherty on 9/20/2012. (crt,Dauterive, C)
July 25, 2012 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting Report and Recommendations and GRANTING 46 Motion to Stay and 46 Motion to Compel Arbitration. Signed by Judge Rebecca F Doherty on 7/24/2012. (crt,Reeves, T)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Diamond Services Corp v. British European & Overseas P & I Insurance et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diamond Services Corp
Represented By: Paulin J Laborde, Jr
Represented By: Jeanne M Laborde
Represented By: David C Laborde
Represented By: Bradley G Frizzell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: British European & Overseas P & I Insurance
Represented By: Brett P Fenasci
Represented By: Michael A McGlone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Insurance Co of Hanover Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A G C S Marine Insurance Co
Represented By: Kelly C Bogart
Represented By: Lawrence J Duplass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catlin Insurance Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stiel Insurance Services of New Orleans Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colemont Insurance Brokers of Texas L P
Represented By: Francis J Barry, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lamorte Burns & Co Inc
Represented By: Brett P Fenasci
Represented By: Michael A McGlone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Certain Solvent Underwriters at Lloyds London
Represented By: Kyle S Moran
Represented By: Jonathan B Womack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?