Troy Landry Productions L L C v. Halpern Import Co et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: Troy Landry Productions L L C
Defendant: Halpern Import Co, National Cap & Sportswear Inc and Ripple Junction Design Co
Case Number: 6:2012cv00004
Filed: January 3, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Office: Lafayette Office
County: Acadia
Presiding Judge: Rebecca F Doherty
Presiding Judge: C Michael Hill
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2012. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 5, 2012 NOTICE of Corrective Action to Roy H Maughan, Jr on behalf of Troy Landry Productions L L C regarding 5 Summons Returned Executed, 6 Summons Returned Executed, 7 Summons Returned Executed. Action taken: Modified docket entries to reflect "service via Long Arm Statute" and to correct answer due dates accordingly to 2/6/2012. (crt,Dauterive, C)
January 4, 2012 Filing 3 AO 120 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark. (Attachments: # 1 Complaint, # 2 Docket Sheet) (crt,Thigpen, M)
January 3, 2012 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Troy Landry Productions L L C. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: (Jury demand requested in document 1 page 15 of Complaint. (crt,Thigpen, M)
January 3, 2012 CASE Assigned to Judge Rebecca F Doherty and Magistrate Judge C Michael Hill. (crt,Thigpen, M)
January 3, 2012 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Troy Landry Productions, LLC. (aty,Maughan, Roy)
January 3, 2012 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $350, receipt number 0536-1836573) filed by Troy Landry Productions, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Civil cover sheet, # 7 Proposed Summons Halpern Import Company, # 8 Proposed Summons National Cap and Sportswear, Inc., # 9 Proposed Summons Ripple Junction Design Co.)(aty,Maughan, Roy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Troy Landry Productions L L C v. Halpern Import Co et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Troy Landry Productions L L C
Represented By: Roy H Maughan, Jr
Represented By: Namisha D Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Halpern Import Co
Represented By: Mary Ellen Roy
Represented By: Dan Brian Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Cap & Sportswear Inc
Represented By: Mary Ellen Roy
Represented By: Dan Brian Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ripple Junction Design Co
Represented By: Mary Ellen Roy
Represented By: Dan Brian Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?