Sawyer v. WHC Maintenance Services, Inc. et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: Buford Sawyer
Defendant: W H C Maintenance Services Inc, Red Johnson, Crain Brothers Inc and John Doe
Case Number: 6:2012cv01435
Filed: May 31, 2012
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Lafayette Office
County: Lafayette
Referring Judge: Patrick J Hanna
Presiding Judge: Richard T Haik
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 5, 2012 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Buford Sawyer. Crain Brothers Inc served on 6/5/2012, answer due 6/26/2012; W H C Maintenance Services Inc served on 6/5/2012, answer due 6/26/2012. (aty,Moroux, Jerome)
June 4, 2012 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Crain Brothers Inc, John Doe, Red Johnson, W H C Maintenance Services Inc (crt,Kennedy, T)
May 31, 2012 CASE Assigned to Judge Richard T Haik, Sr and Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. (crt,Kennedy, T)
May 31, 2012 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $350, receipt number 0536-1962968) filed by Buford Sawyer. (Attachments: # 1 Civil cover sheet)(aty,Moroux, Jerome)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sawyer v. WHC Maintenance Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Buford Sawyer
Represented By: Jerome Harold Moroux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W H C Maintenance Services Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Red Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crain Brothers Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?